Staci Chester et al v. The TJX Companies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Staci Chester and Daniel Friedman
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive, TJ Maxx of CA, LLC and The TJX Companies, Inc.
Petitioner: Steven Helfand
Consolidated Plaintiff: Theresa Metoyer and Robin Berkoff
Not Classified By Court: Kevan Peters, Patrick S Sweeney, Barbara S Cochran, Jessie R Parker and Rhadiante Van de Voorde
Consolidated Defendant: Marshalls of CA, LLC and Homegoods, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2015cv01437
Filed: July 17, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David T Bristow
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #130 filed by Patrick S Sweeney. CCA # 18-55786. This appeal is dismissed. This order served on the district court shall act as and for the mandate of this court. (lom)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #132 filed by Rhadiante Van de Voorde. CCA # 18-55787. This appeal is dismissed. This order served on the district court shall act as and for the mandate of this court. (lom)
August 6, 2018 Filing 152 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: On July 19, 2018, Plaintiffs filed a Motion for an Appeal Bond ("Motion") requesting that Objector, Barbara S. Cochran, file an Appeal Bond pursuant to Fed. R. App. 7 and 39(e) in the amount of $563,250. (ECF No. 147.) On July 24, 2018, Objector voluntarily withdrew her notice of appeal. (ECF No. 148.) On August 2, 2018, Plaintiffs withdrew their Motion. (ECF No. 150.) Accordingly, the Court VACATES the hearing currently set for August 20, 2018, and denies the Motion as MOOT. (bm)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #138 filed by Barbara S Cochran. CCA # 18-55817. The appellant's unopposed motion for voluntary dismissal, which was electronically filed by the appellees, is granted. This appeal is dismissed. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). A copy of this order sent to the district court shall act as and for the mandate of this court. (bm)
August 2, 2018 Filing 150 PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE MOTION FOR APPEAL BOND AND NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Bond appeal #147 filed by Consol Plaintiffs Robin Berkoff, Theresa Metoyer, Plaintiffs Staci Chester, Daniel Friedman. (Morosoff, Christopher)
July 30, 2018 Filing 149 MINUTE IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: On 7/19/2018, Plaintiffs moved for an appeal bond against objector Barbara S. Cochran. (ECF No. #147 ) On 7/24/2018, Cochran filed a Notice of Withdrawal of her appeal. (ECF No. #148 ) Therefore, The Court ORDERS Plaintiffs to SHOW CAUSE, in writing only, no later than 8/6/2018, as to why their pending Motion is not moot. No hearing will be held. (jp)
July 24, 2018 Filing 148 Notice of Withdrawal of Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #138 filed by Objector Barbara S Cochran. (Caiafa, Douglas)
July 19, 2018 Filing 147 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Bond appeal filed by plaintiff Robin Berkoff, Staci Chester, Daniel Friedman, Theresa Metoyer. Motion set for hearing on 8/20/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for An Appeal Bond) (Hafif, Greg)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #133 filed by Steven Helfand. CCA # 18-55788. Appellants motion for voluntary dismissal of this appeal is granted. This appeal is DISMISSED. This orders shall act as MANDATE of this Court.(lc)
July 17, 2018 Filing 145 Notice of Withdrawal of Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #133 Steven Helfand. (Helfand, Steven)
July 9, 2018 Filing 144 TRANSCRIPT ORDER re: Court of Appeals case number 18-55787, as to Objector Rhadiante Van de Voorde for Court Reporter. Court will contact Caroline Tucker, Esq. at ctucker@tuckerpollard.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Tucker, Caroline)
July 9, 2018 APPEAL FEE PAID: re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #138 as to Objector Barbara S Cochran; Receipt Number: LA174182 in the amount of $200. (ek)
July 2, 2018 APPEAL FEE PAID: re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #138 as to Objector Barbara S Cochran; Receipt Number: LA173789 in the amount of $305.00 on 07/02/18, remaining balance of $200.00 still due. (jo)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #138 filed by Barbara S Cochran. CCA # 18-55817. A review of this court's docket reflects that the filing and docketing fees for this appeal remain due. Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall pay to the district court or file in this court a motion to proceed informa pauperis. [See document for all details.] (mat)
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #130 filed by Patrick S Sweeney. CCA # 18-55786. A review of this court's docket reflects that the filing and docketing fees for this appeal remain due. Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall [See document] If appellant fails to comply with this order, this appeal will be dismissed automatically by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. [See document for details.] (mat)
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #133 filed by Steven Helfand. CCA # 18-55788. A review of this court's docket reflects that the filing and docketing fees for this appeal remain due. Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall [See document] If appellant fails to comply with this order, this appeal will be dismissed automatically by the 9th CCA Clerk for failure to prosecute. [See document for all details.] (mat)
June 20, 2018 Filing 142 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 18-55817 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #138 as to Objector Barbara S Cochran. (mat)
June 20, 2018 Filing 139 FILING FEE LETTER issued as to Objector Barbara S Cochran, re Notice of Appeal.to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #138 . (mat)
June 14, 2018 Filing 137 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 18-55788 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #133 as to Objector Steven Helfand. (lc)
June 14, 2018 Filing 136 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 18-55787 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #132 as to Objector Rhadiante Van de Voorde. (lc)
June 14, 2018 Filing 135 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 18-55786 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #130 as to Objector Patrick S Sweeney. (lc)
June 13, 2018 Filing 134 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by movant /objector Steven Helfand. Appeal of Order on Motion for Attorney Fees,,, Order on Motion for Settlement,,, Motion Hearing,, #128 , Judgment,,,, #129 . (Appeal Fee - In Forma Pauperis Request.) (Helfand, Steven)
June 12, 2018 Filing 133 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Objector Steven Helfand. Appeal of Order on Motion for Attorney Fees,,, Order on Motion for Settlement,,, Motion Hearing,, #128 , Judgment,,,, #129 . (Appeal Fee - In Forma Pauperis Request.) (Helfand, Steven)
June 12, 2018 Filing 132 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Objector Rhadiante Van de Voorde. Appeal of Judgment,,,, #129 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21911575.) (Tucker, Caroline)
June 11, 2018 Filing 138 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by plaintiff Barbara S Cochran. Appeal of Judgment, #129 Filed On: 5/14/18; Entered On: 5/15/18; Filing fee $ 505 Billed. (mat)
June 8, 2018 Filing 131 FILING FEE LETTER issued as to Objector Patrick S Sweeney, re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #130 . (mat)
June 5, 2018 Filing 130 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Objector Patrick S Sweeney. Appeal of Judgment, #129 Filed On: 5/14/18; Entered On: 5/15/18; Filing fee $ 505 billed. (mat)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER AND JUDGMENT: (1) CONFIRMING CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT CLASS;(2) GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT (3) APPROVING CLASSREPRESENTATIVE ENHANCMENT PAYMENTS (4) AWARDING CLASS COUNSEL FEES AND COSTS (5) APPROVING SETTLEMENT ADMINISTRATOR FEES (6) ENTERING FINAL JUDGMENT by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFICS). JND is awarded $1,000,000 for their services as Settlement Administrator. Class Representatives Staci Chester, Daniel Friedman, Robin Berkoff and Theresa Metoyer are each awarded the sum of $7,500 as a Class Representative. Class Counsel is awarded $2,125,000, as attorneys' fees, and $35,497.97 as costs. By means of this Final Order and Judgment, this Court hereby enters Final Judgment in this action, as defined in Rule 54, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. 10. This action is dismissed with prejudice, each side to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees except as provided by the Settlement Agreementand this Final Order and Judgment.(MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (lc)
May 14, 2018 Filing 128 MINUTES OF MOTION for Settlement Approval #123 ; MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs #116 Hearing held before Judge Otis D. Wright, II. Case called, appearances made. The Court grants the order confirming certification of settlement class, granting final approval of class action settlement, approves class representative enhancement payments, awards class counsel fees and costs, approves settlement administrator fees and enters final judgment [123-7]. The order will issue. All objections filed by the objectors are overruled. The Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs #116 , is GRANTED. Court Reporter: Terri Hourigan. (lom)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: re: On April 4, 2018, Steven Helfand objected to the class settlement in this case and requested to appear telephonically at the May 14, 2018 hearing on Plaintiffs Motion forAttorneys Fees and Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement #117 The Court GRANTS Helfands request to appear telephonically and orders him to contact the Courts Courtroom Deputy Clerk, Sheila English (Sheila_English@cacd.uscourts.gov), to receive details for the conference call. (lc)
April 23, 2018 Filing 126 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Final Approval of Class Action Settlement #123 PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS TO SETTLEMENT filed by Consol Plaintiffs Robin Berkoff, Theresa Metoyer, Plaintiffs Staci Chester, Daniel Friedman. (Morosoff, Christopher)
April 23, 2018 Filing 125 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Caroline V Tucker on behalf of Objector Rhadiante Van de Voorde (Attorney Caroline V Tucker added to party Rhadiante Van de Voorde(pty:obj))(Tucker, Caroline)
April 16, 2018 Filing 123 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Plaintiffs Robin Berkoff, Staci Chester, Daniel Friedman, Theresa Metoyer. Motion set for hearing on 5/14/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points & Authorities ISO Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement, #2 Declaration of Douglas Caiafa ISO Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement, #3 Declaration of Jennifer Keough regarding Notice Administration, #4 Declaration of Christopher J. Morosoff ISO Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement, #5 Declaration of Greg Hafif ISO Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement, #6 Declaration of Jennifer A. Peoples ISO Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement, #7 Proposed Order and Judgment) (Morosoff, Christopher)
April 13, 2018 Filing 124 OBJECTIONS filed by Objector Kevan Peters. (lc)
April 11, 2018 Filing 122 OBJECTIONS to proposed settlement filed by Objector Jessie R Parker. (lc)
April 11, 2018 Filing 121 OBJECTIONS TO THE PROPOSED SETTLEMENT AND NOTICE OF INTENT NOT TO APPEAR filed by Objector Patrick S Sweeney. (lc)
April 9, 2018 Filing 120 OBJECTIONS TO SETTLEMENT AND FEE MOTION filed by Objector Barbara S Cochran. (lc)
April 9, 2018 Filing 119 OBJECTIONS filed by Objector Rhadiante Van de Voorde. (Tucker, Caroline)
April 4, 2018 Filing 118 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Steven Helfand Objection #117 . The following error(s) was/were found: Title page is missing. Objection was in Letter format not permitted by LR 83-2.5. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
April 4, 2018 Filing 117 OBJECTIONS to settlement and attorneys fees filed by Movant Steven Helfand. (Helfand, Steven)
March 13, 2018 Filing 116 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs, Costs of Administration, and Representative Enhancement Payments filed by Plaintiffs Robin Berkoff, Staci Chester, Daniel Friedman, Theresa Metoyer. Motion set for hearing on 5/14/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Motion, #2 Declaration of Douglas Caiafa ISO Motion, #3 Declaration of Christopher J. Morosoff ISO Motion, #4 Declaration of Greg Hafif ISO Motion, #5 Declaration of Michael G. Dawson ISO Motion, #6 Declaration of Jennifer M. Keough re Costs of Administration, #7 Declaration of Staci Chester ISO Motion, #8 Declaration of Daniel Friedman ISO Motion, #9 Declaration of Theresa Metoyer ISO Motion, #10 Declaration of Robin Berkoff ISO Motion, #11 Proposed Order) (Morosoff, Christopher)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER ESTABLISHING QUALIFIED SETTLEMENT FUND #114 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc)
December 21, 2017 Filing 114 STIPULATION for Order ESTABLISHING QUALIFIED SETTLEMENT FUND filed by Defendants TJ Maxx of CA, LLC, The TJX Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cardon, P)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT CLASS #112 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement and conditionally certifies the Settlement Class. The hearing on the Motion is VACATED. A hearing on the final approval of the class action certification and settlement, as well as Class Counsels motion for fees and costs, shall be held on May 14, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. at the United States Courthouse, 350 West First Street, Courtroom 5D, Los Angeles, CA 90012. (lc), Modified on 12/6/2017. (lc).
November 13, 2017 Filing 112 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Amended Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement and Certification of Settlement Class filed by Plaintiffs Robin Berkoff, Staci Chester, Daniel Friedman, Theresa Metoyer. Motion set for hearing on 12/11/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Plaintiffs' Unopposed Amended Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement and Certification of Settlement Class, #2 Declaration of Christopher J. Morosoff ISO Plaintiffs' Unopposed Amended Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement and Certification of Settlement Class, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Christopher J. Morosoff (Settlement Agreement w/ revised notices), #4 Declaration of Jennifer M. Keough Regarding Proposed Notice Plan, #5 Declaration -- Supplemental Declaration of Jennifer M. Keough Regarding Proposed Notice Plan, #6 Declaration of Douglas Caiafa, #7 Declaration of Robin Berkoff, #8 Declaration of Staci Chester, #9 Declaration of Daniel Friedman, #10 Declaration of Theresa Metoyer, #11 Proposed Order) (Morosoff, Christopher)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT #109 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: The Court is inclined to preliminarily approve the parties proposed Settlement Agreement (ECF No. 109-3), if the proposed notice was amended to conform to the format addressed in this Order. For these reasons, Plaintiffs Motion is DENIED without prejudice. The Court directs the parties to submit a new Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, should they wish to do so, no later than November 13, 2017. (lc). Modified on 10/20/2017 .(lc).
October 10, 2017 Filing 110 The hearing on the MOTION for Settlement #109 , scheduled for October 16, 2017 at 1:30 P.M., is hereby VACATED and taken off calendar. No appearances are necessary. The matter stands submitted, and will be decided upon without oral argument. An order will issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sce) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 18, 2017 Filing 109 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement and Certification of Settlement Class filed by Plaintiffs Robin Berkoff, Staci Chester, Daniel Friedman, Theresa Metoyer. Motion set for hearing on 10/16/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points & Authorities, #2 Declaration of Christopher J. Morosoff, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Christopher J. Morosoff, #4 Declaration of Douglas Caiafa, #5 Declaration of Jennifer M. Keough, #6 Declaration of Staci Chester, #7 Declaration of Robin Berkoff, #8 Declaration of Theresa Metoyer, #9 Declaration of Daniel Friedman, #10 Proposed Order) (Morosoff, Christopher)
September 1, 2017 Filing 108 STATUS REPORT Regarding the Status of Settlement Negotiations filed by Consol Plaintiffs Robin Berkoff, Theresa Metoyer, Plaintiffs Staci Chester, Daniel Friedman. (Morosoff, Christopher)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER VACATING DATES AND DEADLINES #106 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Pursuant to the parties notice of settlement, the Court vacatesall dates and deadlines. The pending motions for summary judgment and classcertification #82 , #93 are hereby DISMISSED as MOOT. The parties shalleither file a motion for preliminary approval of class settlement, or in the alternative, a status report regarding the progress of settlement negotiations on or before September 1, 2017. (lc)
July 13, 2017 Filing 106 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Staci Chester et al. Staci Chester. (Caiafa, Douglas)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION MODIFYING SCHEDULING ORDER AND CONTINUING HEARING AND RELATED DATES #104 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Plaintiffs Deadline to Make Its Rebuttal Expert Witnesses Available for Deposition: July 18, 2017; Hearing Date on Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification and Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment #82 , #93 : August 7, 2017, 1:30 PM. (lc)
May 24, 2017 Filing 104 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Modifying Scheduling Order and Continuing Hearing and Related Dates filed by Defendants The TJX Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ramsey, Jay)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER RE HEARING SCHEDULE by Judge Otis D. Wright, II:On March 9, 2017, the Court issued a supplemental scheduling order setting June 19, 2017, as the final day to hear motions for class certification. (ECF No. 87.) This order clarifies that both Plaintiffs motion for class certification (ECF No. 82)and Defendants motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 93) shall be heard onJune 19, 2017. (lc)
May 15, 2017 Filing 102 OPPOSITION to Defendants' Objection and Motion to Strike in Support of re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class #82 filed by Consol Plaintiffs Robin Berkoff, Theresa Metoyer, Plaintiffs Staci Chester, Daniel Friedman. (Morosoff, Christopher)
May 15, 2017 Filing 101 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class #82 filed by Consol Plaintiffs Robin Berkoff, Theresa Metoyer, Plaintiffs Staci Chester, Daniel Friedman. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Douglas Caiafa, #2 Declaration of Christopher J. Morosoff, #3 Declaration of Christian Tregillis)(Morosoff, Christopher)
May 4, 2017 Filing 100 MINUTES OF Telephone Conference held before Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow: Followingdiscussion between the Court and counsel, the Court allowed plaintiffs to conduct afurther deposition of defendant pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6), on the limited issueof the plaintiffs 41 purchases from defendant made prior to the filing of the Complaint.The deposition is to be held in either Boston or Framingham, Ma., or remotely via video,and shall not exceed three hours in length. The Court instructed the parties to meet andconfer to schedule the deposition within the next 15 days. Court Recorder: Court Smart. (dc)
April 26, 2017 Filing 99 SEALED DOCUMENT per Court Order (No. 98) re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #98 filed by Consol Defendants Homegoods, Inc., Marshalls of CA, LLC, Defendants TJ Maxx of CA, LLC, The TJX Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document, #2 Unredacted Document, #3 Unredacted Document, #4 Unredacted Document, #5 Unredacted Document, #6 Unredacted Document, #7 Unredacted Document, #8 Unredacted Document, #9 Unredacted Document, #10 Unredacted Document, #11 Unredacted Document, #12 Unredacted Document, #13 Unredacted Document, #14 Unredacted Document, #15 Unredacted Document, #16 Unredacted Document, #17 Unredacted Document, #18 Unredacted Document, #19 Unredacted Document, #20 Unredacted Document, #21 Unredacted Document, #22 Unredacted Document, #23 Unredacted Document)(Ramsey, Jay)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER TO DEFENDANTS APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL CERTAIN PORTIONS OF THE EXPERT REPORT OF KRISTOFER BUCHAN, THE EXPERT REPORT OF CAROL A.SCOTT, PH.D., PLAINTIFF METOYERS DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT, AND THE ENTIRETY OF PLAINTIFF BERKOFFS AND METOYERS FINANCIAL RECORDS #94 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc)
April 24, 2017 Filing 97 NOTICE OF LODGING filed of Proposed Order on Application to Seal re APPLICATION to file document Exhibits from Defendants MSJ and Class Certification Opposition under seal #94 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ramsey, Jay)
April 24, 2017 Filing 96 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION to file document Exhibits from Defendants MSJ and Class Certification Opposition under seal #94 , Sealed Declaration in Support Declaration,,, [ docket no 95]. The following error(s) was found:Missing proposed order was not submitted as separate attachment (not found attached to either filing). In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc)
April 21, 2017 Filing 95 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Exhibits from Defendants MSJ and Class Certification Opposition under seal #94 filed by Consol Defendants Homegoods, Inc., Marshalls of CA, LLC, Defendants TJ Maxx of CA, LLC, The TJX Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document, #2 Unredacted Document, #3 Unredacted Document, #4 Unredacted Document, #5 Unredacted Document, #6 Unredacted Document, #7 Unredacted Document, #8 Unredacted Document, #9 Unredacted Document, #10 Unredacted Document, #11 Unredacted Document, #12 Unredacted Document, #13 Unredacted Document, #14 Unredacted Document, #15 Unredacted Document, #16 Unredacted Document, #17 Unredacted Document, #18 Unredacted Document, #19 Unredacted Document, #20 Unredacted Document, #21 Unredacted Document, #22 Unredacted Document, #23 Unredacted Document, #24 Unredacted Document)(Ramsey, Jay)
April 21, 2017 Filing 94 APPLICATION to file document Exhibits from Defendants MSJ and Class Certification Opposition under seal filed by Consol Defendants Homegoods, Inc., Marshalls of CA, LLC, Defendants TJ Maxx of CA, LLC, The TJX Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document, #2 Redacted Document, #3 Redacted Document, #4 Redacted Document, #5 Redacted Document, #6 Redacted Document, #7 Redacted Document, #8 Redacted Document, #9 Redacted Document, #10 Redacted Document, #11 Redacted Document, #12 Redacted Document, #13 Redacted Document, #14 Redacted Document, #15 Redacted Document, #16 Redacted Document, #17 Redacted Document, #18 Redacted Document, #19 Redacted Document)(Ramsey, Jay)
April 21, 2017 Filing 93 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs Consolidated Complaint filed by Defendants Homegoods, Inc., Marshalls of CA, LLC, TJ Maxx of CA, LLC, The TJX Companies, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 6/19/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Points and Authorities, #2 Supplement Separate Statement, #3 Declaration Bueker Declaration, #4 Declaration Sofis Declaration, #5 Exhibit 1-12, #6 Exhibit 13-25, #7 Exhibit 26-35, #8 Exhibit 36-39, #9 Proposed Order) (Ramsey, Jay)
April 21, 2017 Filing 92 Objection to Evidence and Motion to Strike re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class #82 filed by Consol Defendants Homegoods, Inc., Marshalls of CA, LLC, Defendants TJ Maxx of CA, LLC, The TJX Companies, Inc.. (Ramsey, Jay)
April 21, 2017 Filing 91 Opposition Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class #82 filed by Consol Defendants Homegoods, Inc., Marshalls of CA, LLC, Defendants TJ Maxx of CA, LLC, The TJX Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Bueker Decl., #2 Declaration Sofis Decl., #3 Exhibit A, Part I, #4 Exhibit A, Part II, #5 Exhibit A, Part III, #6 Exhibit B-C, #7 Exhibit D-M, #8 Exhibit N-Z, #9 Exhibit Q-T)(Ramsey, Jay)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow: The Court andcounsel discussed the deponents confidential agreements as to whether the questions being asked of counsel in the deposition may or not be answered. The Court addressed the issue raised with the Court and advised counsel that the deponent is ordered to respond to the questions posed. (dc)
March 28, 2017 Filing 89 MINUTES OF Telephone Conference held before Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow: The Court discussed the pending discovery disputes outlined inthe motion that have yet to be resolved, specifically the production of documents as to the credit and debit card statements and deposition scheduling issues. In addition, the Court and counsel discussed the new outstanding discovery issue as to the responses to the supplemental interrogatories that have not been received from plaintiffs. The Court directed counsel to further meet and confer as to interrogatory number five, and discuss when requested information will be provided to defendants. The Court reminded counsel should any further disputes arise, counsel are to contact the Court Clerk. Court Recorder: Court Smart. (dc)
March 27, 2017 Filing 88 SCHEDULING NOTICE: Telephone Conference set for 3/28/2017 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow. Call-in Number:(213) 894-0800 Please follow the prompts and enter the codes below. Meeting ID: 7002#User Password:0631#THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 SUPPLEMENTAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Otis D. Wright, II, re Stipulation to Continue #84 . Based on the parties stipulation, the Court reschedules the remaining dates and deadlines as follows: Discovery cut-off 4/11/2017, Last date to conduct settlement conference is 5/22/2017, Last Date for Hearing Motions 6/19/2017. The remaining pre-trial dates and the trial date will be set after adjudication of the motion for class certification. See document for details. (smo)
March 7, 2017 Filing 84 STIPULATION to Continue Various Pre-Trial and Trial Dates filed by Defendants Homegoods, Inc., Marshalls of CA, LLC, TJ Maxx of CA, LLC, The TJX Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ramsey, Jay)
March 6, 2017 Filing 86 MINUTES OF Follow-Up Telephone Conference held before Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow: Counsel informed the Court that they have reached a resolution as to the receipts and credit card statements and, as such, will be provided or counsel will confirm that they no longer exist. In addition, the deposition location has been confirmed and agreed upon and counsel have requested that the deposition be held at a later date after all documents have been produced and after the deponents surgery and recovery time. The Court reminded counsel that this Court cannot alter or change the scheduling order of a District Judge but counsel may submit a proposed stipulation to District Judge Wright requesting a brief extension, specifically, extending the dates of the expert disclosuresand dispositive motions. This Court will contact District Judge Wright to provide statusand discuss the merits of the parties proposed stipulation. Court Recorder: Court Smart. (dc)
March 6, 2017 Filing 85 MINUTES OF Telephone Conference held before Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow: The Court instructed counsel that they are to further meet and confer to come to a resolution as to complying with the discovery requests prior to the deposition that is scheduled for tomorrow, March 7, 2017, and also confer as to the location of the deposition. Plaintiff's counsel is to provide or forwardthe email of receipts to plaintiffs that was previously sent to defendants or provide the copies of the receipt that were referenced in the email. Furthermore, counsel are to discuss the status of the credit card statements as to when they will be provided or whether the statements exist. The Court will hold a second follow up status conference as to the status of the discovery dispute. Court Recorder: Court Smart. (dc)
March 2, 2017 Filing 83 DECLARATION of Greg K. Hafif In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class #82 filed by Consol Plaintiffs Robin Berkoff, Theresa Metoyer, Plaintiffs Staci Chester, Daniel Friedman. (Hafif, Greg)
March 1, 2017 Filing 82 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class filed by Plaintiffs Robin Berkoff, Staci Chester, Daniel Friedman, Theresa Metoyer. Motion set for hearing on 5/22/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points & Authorities, #2 Declaration of Christopher J. Morosoff, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Christopher J. Morosoff, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Christopher J. Morosoff, #5 Exhibit C to Declaration of Christopher J. Morosoff, #6 Exhibit E to Declaration of Christopher J. Morosoff, #7 Exhibit F to Declaration of Christopher J. Morosoff, #8 Declaration of Douglas Caiafa, #9 Declaration of Staci Chester, #10 Declaration of Daniel Friedman, #11 Declaration Robin Berkoff, #12 Declaration of Theresa Metoyer, #13 Proposed Order) (Morosoff, Christopher)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: granting #80 Non-Resident Attorney Aliki Sofis APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Homegoods, Inc., Marshalls of CA, LLC, Defendants TJ Maxx of CA, LLC, The TJX Companies, Inc., designating Jay T Ramsey as local counsel. (lc)
February 22, 2017 Filing 80 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Aliki Sofis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Consol Defendants Homegoods, Inc., Marshalls of CA, LLC, Defendants TJ Maxx of CA, LLC, The TJX Companies, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973 -19401912) filed by Defendants Homegoods, Inc., Marshalls of CA, LLC, TJ Maxx of CA, LLC, The TJX Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ramsey, Jay)
February 16, 2017 Filing 79 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE RE DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS' TO PROVIDE WRITTEN RESPONSES AND DOCUMENTS RESPONSIVE TO FIRST SETS OF DISCOVERY WITHOUT OBJECTION AND REQUESTS FOR ATTORNEYS FEES [DKT. #77]held before Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow: The Court ordered the parties to meet and confer immediately after the call and provide a status to the Court by the end of the day. If the parties are unable to resolve the pending disputes, the Court will take the Motion under submission and rule on the papers submitted. The hearing date of March 09, 2017 is taken off calendar. Court Recorder: Court Smart. (dc)
February 10, 2017 Filing 78 SCHEDULING NOTICE re: MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Provide Written Responses and Documents Responsive to First Sets of Discovery Without Objection; and Requests for Attorneys' Fees #77 Telephone Conference set for 2/16/2017 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 8, 2017 Filing 77 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Provide Written Responses and Documents Responsive to First Sets of Discovery Without Objection; and Requests for Attorneys' Fees filed by Defendants Homegoods, Inc., Marshalls of CA, LLC, TJ Maxx of CA, LLC, The TJX Companies, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 3/9/2017 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow. (Attachments: #1 Joint Stipulation, #2 Declaration of P. Craig Cardon, #3 Proposed Order)(Cardon, P)
February 1, 2017 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Benjamin O Aigboboh on behalf of Consol Defendants Homegoods, Inc., Marshalls of CA, LLC, Defendants TJ Maxx of CA, LLC, The TJX Companies, Inc. (Attorney Benjamin O Aigboboh added to party Homegoods, Inc.(pty:condft), Attorney Benjamin O Aigboboh added to party Marshalls of CA, LLC(pty:condft), Attorney Benjamin O Aigboboh added to party TJ Maxx of CA, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin O Aigboboh added to party The TJX Companies, Inc.(pty:dft))(Aigboboh, Benjamin)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER MODIFYING EXPERT DISCOVERY DEADLINES SET BY SCHEDULING AND CASEMANAGEMENT ORDER #74 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Plaintiffs Deadline to Designate Affirmative Experts and Provide Affirmative Expert Reports:3/01/17; Defendants Deadline to Designate Affirmative Experts and ProvideAffirmative Expert Reports and to Designate Rebuttal Expert Witnesses andProvide Rebuttal Expert Reports: 4/01/17; Plaintiffs Deadline to Designate Rebuttal Expert Witnesses and Provide Rebuttal Expert Reports: 5/01/17. (lc)
January 31, 2017 Filing 74 STIPULATION to Amend/Modify Scheduling Order,,,, Terminate Hearings,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,, #71 filed by Defendants Homegoods, Inc., Marshalls of CA, LLC, TJ Maxx of CA, LLC, The TJX Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cardon, P)
December 22, 2016 Filing 73 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDERby Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow, re Stipulation for Protective Order #72 (SEE ORDER) (dc)
December 20, 2016 Filing 72 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendants Homegoods, Inc., Marshalls of CA, LLC, TJ Maxx of CA, LLC, The TJX Companies, Inc..(Ramsey, Jay)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (JURY TRIALS) by Judge Otis D Wright II: THE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE IS VACATED. SEE THE LAST PAGE OF THIS ORDER FOR THE SPECIFIED DATES. Jury trial: 7/11/17 9:00 AM; File final trial exhibit stipulation: 7/6/17; hearing on motions in limine: 7/3/17 1:30 PM; Final Pretrial Conference: 6/26/17 1:30 PM; motions in limine, proposed voir dire questions and proposed voir dire questions and agreed to statement of case: 6/26/17; lodge Pretrial conference order and pretrial exhibit stipulation, file trial briefs, contentions of fact and law, exhibit and witness lists, status report regarding settlement, agreed upon set of instructions and verdict forms, joint statement regarding disputed instructions verdicts etc: 6/12/17; last day for hearing motions: 5/22/17; last date to conduct settlement conference: 5/15/17; discovery cutoff: 4/11/17; last date to amend pleadings or add parties: 1/3/17. (lc)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. (lc)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 SUPPLEMENTAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: On November 15, 2016, the Court issued a scheduling order in this case. In addition to the dates listed in that order, the court requires that any motion for class certification filed by March 1, 2017. Further, any opposition to the motion for class certification shall be filed by April 7, 2017, and any reply to the motion for class certification shall be filed by May 1, 2017. Depending on the outcome of the motion for class certification, the Court may choose at that time to amend the schedule. Lastly, discovery shall not be conducted in phases. (lc) Modified on 11/15/2016. (lc).
November 14, 2016 Filing 68 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan SCHEDULING CONFERENCE REPORT ; estimated length of trial 10-15 days, filed by Defendant TJ Maxx of CA, LLC.. (Cardon, P)
October 31, 2016 Filing 67 NOTICE TO PARTIES by District Judge Otis D. Wright. Effective November 7, 2016, Judge Wright will be located at the 1st Street Courthouse, COURTROOM 5D on the 5th floor, located at 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 5D of the 1st Street Courthouse, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box outside the Clerk's Office on the 4th floor of the 1st Street Courthouse. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for 11/21/16 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II (lc)
September 12, 2016 Filing 65 ANSWER to Consolidated Complaint #28 ANSWER TO CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by Defendants Homegoods, Inc., Marshalls of CA, LLC, TJ Maxx of CA, LLC, The TJX Companies, Inc..(Cardon, P)
August 31, 2016 Filing 63 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to TJ Maxx of CA, LLC answer now due 9/12/2016; The TJX Companies, Inc. answer now due 9/12/2016; Marshalls of CA, LLC answer now due 9/12/2016; Homegoods, Inc. answer now due 9/12/2016, filed by Defendant TJ Maxx of CA, LLC; The TJX Companies, Inc.; Marshalls of CA, LLC; Homegoods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ramsey, Jay)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION EXTENDING DEFENDANTS TIME TO ANSWER PLAINTIFFS CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT #63 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Defendants The TJX Companies, Inc., T.J. Maxx of CA, LLC, HomeGoods, Inc., and Marshalls of CA, LLC time to answer the CAC to September 12, 2016. (lc)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS #36 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. (lc). Modified on 8/18/2016 (lc).
March 24, 2016 Filing 61 NOTICE of Decision: Order Denying Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint in Sperling v. Stein Mart, Inc., et al., 5:15-cv-01411-BRO-KKx filed by Plaintiffs Robin Berkoff, Staci Chester, Daniel Friedman, Theresa Metoyer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Morosoff, Christopher)
January 29, 2016 Filing 60 NOTICE of Recent Authority filed by Defendant TJ Maxx of CA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ramsey, Jay)
January 26, 2016 Filing 59 NOTICE of Recent Authority filed by Defendant The TJX Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ramsey, Jay)
January 22, 2016 Filing 58 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 01-11-2016 @ 1:28 P.M. re Transcript #57 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 22, 2016 Filing 57 TRANSCRIPT for MOTION TO DISMISS CASE proceedings held on Monday, January 11, 2016, at 1:28 P.M. Court Reporter: Debi Read, CSR at Readit3949@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 2/12/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/22/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/21/2016. (rd)
January 14, 2016 Filing 56 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jay T Ramsey counsel for Consol Defendants Homegoods, Inc., Marshalls of CA, LLC, Defendants TJ Maxx of CA, LLC, The TJX Companies, Inc.. Jesse M. Boodoo is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants THE TJX COMPANIES, INC.,. (Ramsey, Jay)
January 12, 2016 Filing 55 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant The TJX Companies, Inc. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Xavier Maurice at xmaurice@sheppardmullin.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Ramsey, Jay)
January 11, 2016 Filing 54 MINUTES OF MOTION to Dismiss Case #36 held before Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Case called, appearances made. The Court hears oral argument from counsel.The matter stands submitted. An order will issue.Court Reporter: Debra Read. (vv)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC FILING REQUIREMENTS AND INFORMATION; AND REFER TO JUDGES PROCEDURES AND SCHEDULES FOR DETAILED INSTRUCTIONS RE SUBMISSION OF SEALED DOCUMENTS, EXCLUDING THOSE SUBMITTED BY PRO SE PARTIES AND IN CAMERA FILINGS) (lc)
December 4, 2015 Filing 52 COUNSEL ARE NOTIFIED, the Motion to Dismiss #36 set for hearing on 1/11/2016 at 01:30 PM will be heard before Judge Otis D. Wright II. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sce) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 14-03 by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Case transferred from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright, II for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as EDCV15-01437 ODW (DTBx). (mg)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dean D. Pregerson:COUNSEL ARE NOTIFIED, on the Court's own motion, the MOTION TO DISMISS CASE TO DISMISS CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT #36 is hereby continued from December 7, 2015 to January 11, 2016 at 10:00 AM. (lc)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER RELIEVING PLAINTIFFS FROM REQUIREMENTS OF LOCAL RULE 23-3 #46 by Judge Dean D. Pregerson (lc)
December 1, 2015 Filing 48 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: REQUEST for Relief from Requirements of Local Rule 23-3 (Proposed Order) re Miscellaneous Document #43 Request for Relief from Local Rule 23-3 #46 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry. Pdf is the proposed order. Missing the formal Request for relief as the main document. The proposed order should have been submitted as a separate attachment to the missing request. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc)
November 30, 2015 Filing 47 Opposition Opposition re: REQUEST for Relief from Requirements of Local Rule 23-3 (Proposed Order) re Miscellaneous Document #43 Request for Relief from Local Rule 23-3 #46 filed by Consol Defendants Homegoods, Inc., Marshalls of CA, LLC, Defendants TJ Maxx of CA, LLC, The TJX Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ramsey, Jay)
November 30, 2015 Filing 46 REQUEST for Relief from Requirements of Local Rule 23-3 (Proposed Order) re Miscellaneous Document #43 Request for Relief from Local Rule 23-3 filed by Plaintiffs Robin Berkoff, Staci Chester, Daniel Friedman, Theresa Metoyer. (Morosoff, Christopher)
November 30, 2015 Filing 45 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: plaintiffs Miscellaneous Document #43 ,. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Request: Relief. Missing proposed order which was not submitted as a separate attachment. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc)
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: COUNSEL ARE NOTIFIED, on the Court's own motion, the MOTION TO DISMISS CASE TO DISMISS CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANTS HOMEGOODS, INC., MARSHALLS OF CA, LLC, TJ MAXX OF CA, LLC, THE TJX COMPANIES, INC. #36 is hereby continued fromNovember 30, 2015 to December 7, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. (lc)
November 25, 2015 Filing 43 Request for Relief From Local Rule 23-3 filed by Plaintiffs Staci Chester, Daniel Friedman (Hafif, Greg)
November 23, 2015 Filing 42 NOTICE of Decision: Recent Authority Relevant to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Homegoods, Inc., Marshalls of CA, LLC, TJ Maxx of CA, LLC, The TJX Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ramsey, Jay)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: COUNSEL ARE NOTIFIED, on the Court's own motion, the MOTION TO DISMISS CASE TO DISMISS CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANTS HOMEGOODS, INC., MARSHALLS OF CA, LLC, TJ MAXX OF CA, LLC, THE TJX COMPANIES, INC. #36 is hereby continued from November 16, 2015 to November 30, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. (lc)
November 2, 2015 Filing 40 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Complaint #36 filed by Consol Defendants Homegoods, Inc., Marshalls of CA, LLC, Defendants TJ Maxx of CA, LLC, The TJX Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Objection to RJN)(Ramsey, Jay)
October 26, 2015 Filing 39 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Complaint #36 filed by Consol Plaintiffs Robin Berkoff, Theresa Metoyer, Plaintiffs Staci Chester, Daniel Friedman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Morosoff, Christopher)
October 26, 2015 Filing 38 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Complaint #36 Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Consol Plaintiffs Robin Berkoff, Theresa Metoyer, Plaintiffs Staci Chester, Daniel Friedman. (Morosoff, Christopher)
October 19, 2015 Filing 37 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Complaint #36 filed by Consol Defendants Homegoods, Inc., Marshalls of CA, LLC, Defendants TJ Maxx of CA, LLC, The TJX Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D)(Ramsey, Jay)
October 19, 2015 Filing 36 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Homegoods, Inc., Marshalls of CA, LLC, TJ Maxx of CA, LLC, The TJX Companies, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 11/16/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ramsey, Jay)
October 15, 2015 Filing 35 STIPULATION for Hearing re Requesting Initial Scheduling Conference filed by Defendant TJ Maxx of CA, LLC, The TJX Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ramsey, Jay)
October 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: granting #33 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jesse M. Boodoo on behalf of Defendants, designating Jay T. Ramsey as local counsel. (lt)
October 7, 2015 Filing 33 APPLICATION for attorney Jesse M. Boodoo to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-16575685 paid.) filed by Defendants Homegoods, Inc., Marshalls of CA, LLC, TJ Maxx of CA, LLC, The TJX Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ramsey, Jay)
September 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER RELIEVING PLAINTIFFS FROM REQUIREMENTS OF LOCAL RULE 23-3 #31 by Judge Dean D. Pregerson (lc)
September 15, 2015 Filing 31 STIPULATION for Relief from Requirements of Local Rule 23-3 re Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #10 filed by Plaintiffs Robin Berkoff, Staci Chester, Daniel Friedman, Theresa Metoyer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Morosoff, Christopher)
September 4, 2015 Filing 30 NOTICE re Case Caption for All Future Filings filed by Plaintiffs Robin Berkoff, Staci Chester, Daniel Friedman, Theresa Metoyer. (Morosoff, Christopher)
September 4, 2015 Filing 29 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Consolidated Complaint #28 . The following error(s) was found: Caption of document is incomplete/incorrect. Instead of one caption identifying the parties, first page reads "RE TJX Companies", with 3 separate case captions. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc)
September 3, 2015 Filing 28 CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint related to: #1 Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), filed by Plaintiffs Staci Chester, Daniel Friedman (Morosoff, Christopher)
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: granting #25 Motion for Leave to Appear of Jay T. Ramsey as Pro Hac Vice for Defendants TJ Maxx of CA, LLC, The TJX Companies, Inc.; granting #25 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John P. Bueker on behalf of Defendants, designating Jay T. Ramsey as local counsel. (lt)
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson, GRANTING Stipulation to File Consolidated Complaint and Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) #24 . Plaintiffs in Chester et al. v. The TJX Companies, Inc. et al., Central District Case No. 5:15-cv-01437-DDP-DTB (the Chester Action); Berkoff v. The TJX Companies, Inc., et al., Central District Case No. 5:15-cv-01475 (the Berkoff Action); and Metoyer v. The TJX Companies, Inc., et al., Central District CaliforniaNo. 5:15-cv-01480 (the Metoyer Action) shall file a Consolidated AmendedComplaint in ED CV 15-01437 DDP (DTBx) within 15 days of the date of thisorder. Upon filing the Consolidated Amended Complaint, the Court shall dismiss the other two actions. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to theConsolidated Complaint within 45 days of its filing. (shb)
August 19, 2015 Filing 25 APPLICATION for Leave of John Bueker to Appear , APPLICATION for attorney John P. Bueker to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-16296036 paid.) filed by Defendant TJ Maxx of CA, LLC, The TJX Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ramsey, Jay)
August 14, 2015 Filing 24 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to TJ Maxx of CA, LLC answer now due 9/16/2015; The TJX Companies, Inc. answer now due 9/16/2015, filed by Defendant TJ Maxx of CA, LLC; The TJX Companies, Inc..(Ramsey, Jay)
August 12, 2015 Filing 23 STIPULATION to Consolidate Cases filed by Defendant TJ Maxx of CA, LLC, The TJX Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ramsey, Jay)
August 7, 2015 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Anne Johnson Palmer on behalf of Defendants TJ Maxx of CA, LLC, The TJX Companies, Inc. (Attorney Anne Johnson Palmer added to party TJ Maxx of CA, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Johnson Palmer added to party The TJX Companies, Inc.(pty:dft))(Palmer, Anne)
August 7, 2015 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney P Craig Cardon on behalf of Defendants TJ Maxx of CA, LLC, The TJX Companies, Inc. (Attorney P Craig Cardon added to party TJ Maxx of CA, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney P Craig Cardon added to party The TJX Companies, Inc.(pty:dft))(Cardon, P)
August 5, 2015 Filing 20 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiffs Staci Chester, Daniel Friedman. and request for transfer of related cases to Hon. Dean D. Pregreson Related Case(s): 5:15-cv-01475 5:15-cv-01480 (Morosoff, Christopher)
August 5, 2015 Filing 19 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant TJ Maxx of CA, LLC, The TJX Companies, Inc., (Attorney Jay T Ramsey added to party TJ Maxx of CA, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jay T Ramsey added to party The TJX Companies, Inc.(pty:dft))(Ramsey, Jay)
August 5, 2015 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants TJ Maxx of CA, LLC, The TJX Companies, Inc. (Ramsey, Jay)
August 5, 2015 Filing 17 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant TJ Maxx of CA, LLC, The TJX Companies, Inc.. (Ramsey, Jay)
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 14-03 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Margaret M. Morrow, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. CV15-04701 MMM (AGRx). (mg)
July 29, 2015 Filing 15 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #14 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (ak)
July 29, 2015 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Douglas Caiafa counsel for Plaintiff Staci Chester. Adding Douglas Caiafa as counsel of record for Staci Chester and Daniel Friedman for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Attorneys for Plaintiffs Douglas Caiafa. (Caiafa, Douglas)
July 29, 2015 Filing 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #11 . The following error(s) was found: Case number is incorrect or missing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (ak)
July 29, 2015 Filing 12 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Staci Chester. Related Case(s): 2:15-cv-04701, 2:15-cv-05005, 5:15-cv-01366, 5:15-cv-01411, 5:15-cv-01475, 5:15-cv-01480 (Hafif, Greg)
July 29, 2015 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Greg K Hafif on behalf of Plaintiffs Staci Chester, Daniel Friedman (Attorney Greg K Hafif added to party Staci Chester(pty:pla), Attorney Greg K Hafif added to party Daniel Friedman(pty:pla))(Hafif, Greg)
July 28, 2015 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Staci Chester, Daniel Friedman, upon Defendant TJ Maxx of CA, LLC served on 7/27/2015, answer due 8/17/2015. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corp agent for service of process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (Morosoff, Christopher)
July 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Counsel are encouraged to review the Central District's website for additional information. The address is "http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov". (See attached document for other requirements.) (lom)
July 20, 2015 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to DEFENDANTS TJ Maxx of CA, LLC, The TJX Companies, Inc.. (aco)
July 20, 2015 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (aco)
July 20, 2015 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow. (aco)
July 17, 2015 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiffs Staci Chester, Daniel Friedman. (Morosoff, Christopher)
July 17, 2015 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiffs Staci Chester, Daniel Friedman. (Morosoff, Christopher)
July 17, 2015 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Attorney Christopher J Morosoff added to party Daniel Friedman(pty:pla))(Morosoff, Christopher)
July 17, 2015 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Staci Chester, Daniel Friedman. (Morosoff, Christopher)
July 17, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-16107655 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Staci Chester. (Attorney Christopher J Morosoff added to party Staci Chester(pty:pla))(Morosoff, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Staci Chester et al v. The TJX Companies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Theresa Metoyer
Represented By: Michael G Dawson
Represented By: Greg K Hafif
Represented By: Douglas Caiafa
Represented By: Christopher J Morosoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Robin Berkoff
Represented By: Michael G Dawson
Represented By: Greg K Hafif
Represented By: Douglas Caiafa
Represented By: Christopher J Morosoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Kevan Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Patrick S Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Barbara S Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Jessie R Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Rhadiante Van de Voorde
Represented By: Caroline V Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TJ Maxx of CA, LLC
Represented By: Jesse M Boodoo
Represented By: Jay T Ramsey
Represented By: John P Bueker
Represented By: P Craig Cardon
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Represented By: Aliki Sofis
Represented By: Benjamin O Aigboboh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The TJX Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Jesse M Boodoo
Represented By: Jay T Ramsey
Represented By: John P Bueker
Represented By: P Craig Cardon
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Represented By: Aliki Sofis
Represented By: Benjamin O Aigboboh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Staci Chester
Represented By: Michael G Dawson
Represented By: Greg K Hafif
Represented By: Douglas Caiafa
Represented By: Christopher J Morosoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Friedman
Represented By: Michael G Dawson
Represented By: Greg K Hafif
Represented By: Douglas Caiafa
Represented By: Christopher J Morosoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steven Helfand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Marshalls of CA, LLC
Represented By: Jesse M Boodoo
Represented By: Jay T Ramsey
Represented By: P Craig Cardon
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Represented By: Aliki Sofis
Represented By: Benjamin O Aigboboh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Homegoods, Inc.
Represented By: Jesse M Boodoo
Represented By: Jay T Ramsey
Represented By: P Craig Cardon
Represented By: Anne Johnson Palmer
Represented By: Aliki Sofis
Represented By: Benjamin O Aigboboh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?