Securities and Exchange Commission v. Robert Yang et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: HealthPro Capital Partners, LLC, Claudia Kano, Suncor Care Lynwood, LLC, Suncor Care, Inc., Suncor Fontana, LLC, Suncor Hesperia, LLC, Robert Yang and Yanrob's Medical, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2015cv02387
Filed: November 19, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Presiding Judge: Stephen V. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 300 FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANTS SUNCOR FONTANA, LLC, SUNCOR HESPERIA, LLC, AND SUNCOR CARE LYNWOOD, LLC by Judge Stephen V. Wilson, in favor of Securities and Exchange Commission and against defendants, jointly and severally, in the principal amount of $16,429,756.00, interest in the amount of $1,795.970.00, attorneys fees of $0.00, costs of $0.00 for a total judgment of $18,225,726.00. Related to: Order on Motion for Order, 299 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Defendants are permanently restrained and enjoined from violating, directly or indirectly, Section 10(b) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 (the "Exchange Act") [15 U.S.C. § 78j(b)] and Rule lOb-5 promulgated thereun der [17 C.F.R. § 240.1Ob-5], by using any means or instrumentality of interstate commerce, or of the mails, or of any facility of any national securities exchange, in connection with the purchase or sale of any security: (see document for further details) (mrgo)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 259 FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO ROBERT YANG, CLAUDIA KANO, YANROB'S MEDICAL INC., HEALTHPRO CAPITAL PARTNERS LLC, AND SUNCOR CARE INC. by Judge Stephen V. Wilson, in favor of Securities and Exchange Commission. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Defendants Yang and Kano are permanently restrained and enjoined from violating, directly or indirectly, Section 10(b) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 (the "Exchange Act") [15 U.S.C. § 78j(b)] and Rule l0b-5 promulgated th ereunder [17 C.F.R. § 240.10b-5], by using any means or instrumentality of interstate commerce, or of the mails, or of any facility of any national securities exchange, in connection with the purchase or sale of any security: (see document for separate judgment amounts and additional details). (mrgo)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 106 JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT SUNCOR HESPERIA, LLC by Judge Stephen V. Wilson, in favor of Securities and Exchange Commission against Suncor Hesperia, LLC (bm)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 JUDGMENT by Judge Stephen V. Wilson, in favor of Securities and Exchange Commission against Claudia Kano. (cr)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, ORDER APPOINTING RECEIVER, FREEZING ASSETS, AND PROVIDING FOR OTHER ANCILLARY RELIEF by Judge Stephen V. Wilson, The parties in this matter have by stipulation agreed to the entry of this Order of Preliminary Injunction, Order Appointing Receiver, Freezing Assets, and Providing for Other Ancillary Relief. This Court has jurisdiction over the parties to, and the subject matter of,this action. Until further Order of this Court, Stephen J. Donell is hereby appointed to serve without bond as receiver (the Receiver) for the estates of the SuncorReceivership Entities (the Receivership Estates). (see attached for further details) (pj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Robert Yang et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HealthPro Capital Partners, LLC
Represented By: Mark T Hiraide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claudia Kano
Represented By: Mark T Hiraide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suncor Care Lynwood, LLC
Represented By: Mark T Hiraide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suncor Care, Inc.
Represented By: Mark T Hiraide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suncor Fontana, LLC
Represented By: Mark T Hiraide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suncor Hesperia, LLC
Represented By: Mark T Hiraide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Yang
Represented By: Mark T Hiraide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yanrob's Medical, Inc.
Represented By: Mark T Hiraide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Zachary T Carlyle
Represented By: David J Van Havermaat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?