Andy Hlavaj v. LG Electronics Alabama, Inc.
Plaintiff: Andy Hlavaj
Defendant: LG Electronics Alabama, Inc. and Does 1-50, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2016cv00232
Filed: February 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Beverly Reid O'Connell
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER EXTENDING STAY by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. At the request of counsel, the Court extends the stay of the action until November 7, 2016, to allow the parties to finalize the settlement documents and motion for preliminary approval. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ah) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 6, 2016 Filing 21 STATUS REPORT PER COURT'S ORDER OF MARCH 8, 2016 filed by Defendant LG Electronics Alabama, Inc.. (Samuel, Robin)
July 8, 2016 Filing 20 STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT PER COURT'S ORDER OF MARCH 8, 2016 filed by Defendant LG Electronics Alabama, Inc.. (Samuel, Robin)
June 9, 2016 Filing 19 STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT PER COURT'S ORDER OF MARCH 8, 2016 filed by Defendant LG Electronics Alabama, Inc.. (Samuel, Robin)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (kca)
May 23, 2016 Filing 17 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Order,,, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,,, Terminated Case,,, Case Stayed,, #15 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Stipulated Protective Order)(Samuel, Robin)
May 9, 2016 Filing 16 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) PER COURT'S ORDER OF MARCH 8, 2016 filed by Defendant LG Electronics Alabama, Inc.. (Samuel, Robin)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER STAYING ACTION PENDING EARLY MEDIATION AND SETTING DEADLINES by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell, re Stipulation to Stay Case. This action is stayed in its entirety, including all discovery and all other deadlines, effective immediately. The parties shall complete private mediation within four (4) months of the entry of this Order. IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is removed from the Court's active caseload until further application by the parties or Order of this Court. In order to permit the Court to monitor this action, the Court orders the parties to file periodic status reports. The first such report is to be filed on May 9, 2016, unless the stay is lifted sooner. #14 (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (rfi)
March 4, 2016 Filing 14 Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Early Mediation filed by Defendant LG Electronics Alabama, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Samuel, Robin)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES upon filing of the complaint by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (rfi)
February 19, 2016 Filing 12 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato to Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 5:16-cv-00232 BRO(SPx). (rn)
February 19, 2016 Filing 11 STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff Andy Hlavaj. (Benowitz, Louis)
February 18, 2016 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant LG Electronics Alabama, Inc., re Statement, #9 served on February 18, 2016. (Ward, James)
February 18, 2016 Filing 9 STATEMENT Of Consent To Proceed Before A United States Magistrate Judge (Form CV-11C) filed by Defendant LG Electronics Alabama, Inc. re: Reminder Notice to Counsel (CV-14) re MJ Civil Consent Pilot Project - optional html form, #7 , Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form #5 . (Samuel, Robin)
February 16, 2016 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant LG Electronics Alabama, Inc., re Reminder Notice to Counsel (CV-14) re MJ Civil Consent Pilot Project - optional html form, #7 , Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form #5 served on February 11, 2016; and February 12, 2016. (Ward, James)
February 10, 2016 Filing 7 REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (dts)
February 10, 2016 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Phoebe A. Wilkinson for Defendant LG Electronics Alabama, Inc. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (Attachments: #1 G-64, #2 G-64 Prop Ord) (vp)
February 10, 2016 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (Attachments: #1 CV-11c) (vp)
February 9, 2016 Filing 4 NOTICE Of Filing State Court Removal Notice filed by Defendant LG Electronics Alabama, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Samuel, Robin)
February 5, 2016 CONFORMED COPY OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT COMPLAINT against Defendant LG Electronics Alabama, Inc.(Filing fee $ 400), filed by plaintiff Andy Hlavaj. (vp)
February 5, 2016 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant LG Electronics Alabama, Inc.. (Samuel, Robin)
February 5, 2016 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant LG Electronics Alabama, Inc., (Samuel, Robin)
February 5, 2016 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino County Superior Court, case number CIV DS 1516085 Receipt No: 0973-17239738 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant LG Electronics Alabama, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint and related state court documents, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Jae Park) (Attorney Robin J Samuel added to party LG Electronics Alabama, Inc.(pty:dft))(Samuel, Robin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andy Hlavaj v. LG Electronics Alabama, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics Alabama, Inc.
Represented By: Phoebe A Wilkinson
Represented By: Jennifer Cecilia Won
Represented By: James J Ward
Represented By: Robin J Samuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andy Hlavaj
Represented By: David Pourati
Represented By: Louis Max Benowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?