Gisele Fournier et al v. Diamond Resorts International Club, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: All others Similarly Situated, Gisele Fournier and Rejean Fournier
Defendant: Diamond Resorts International Club, Inc., DOES 1 through 10, inclusive, and DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2017cv00911
Filed: May 10, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Office: Eastern Division - Riverside Office
Presiding Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Referring Judge: R Gary Klausner
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATIONOF DISMISSAL #22 by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The action is dismissed with prejudice and without costs to either party. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (ah)
August 24, 2017 Filing 22 STIPULATION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiffs Gisele Fournier, Rejean Fournier. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Amir)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Defendants Motion to Compel Arbitration (Dkt. 12 ), calendared for hearing on August 28, 2017, has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submitted pleadings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ah) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge R. Gary Klausner: re: Order to Show Cause,, #14 . The Order to Show Cause re Lack of Prosecution (DE 14), filed on July 20, 2017, is hereby DISCHARGED. (ah)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 DENYING ORDER TO DISMISS WITH THE RIGHT TO REOPEN #17 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (ah)
July 28, 2017 Filing 18 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Response #17 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Amir)
July 27, 2017 Filing 17 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs Gisele Fournier, Rejean Fournierto Order to Show Cause,, #14 and Notice of Settlement (Goldstein, Amir)
July 26, 2017 Filing 16 RESPONSE filed by Defendant Diamond Resorts International Club, Inc. to Order to Show Cause and Confirmation that Motion Seeking Dismissal Under Rule 12(b)(6) Was Filed on July 3, 2017, in Lieu of Answer (Wahlquist, Rebecca)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO CONTINUETHE HEARING DATE ONDEFENDANTS MOTION TOCOMPEL ARBITRATION by Judge R. Gary Klausner, #13 . The Court continues the hearing date on Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration to August 28, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. (pso)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 [In Chambers] Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge R. Gary Klausner.The court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing on or before July 27, 2017 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the court finds that this matter is appropriate for submission without oral argument. The Order To Show Cause will stand submitted upon the filing of plaintiff's response. REFER TO THE COURT'S ORDER FOR DETAILS. (pso)
July 14, 2017 Filing 13 STIPULATION to Continue the Hearing Date on Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration from August 7, 2017 to August 28, 2017 or at a later date most convenient for the Court filed by Plaintiffs Gisele Fournier, Rejean Fournier. (Attachments: #1 Declaration by Amir J. Goldstein, Esq., #2 Exhibit A - email correspondence, #3 Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Amir)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration #11 , noticed for hearing on 08/28/2017 at 9:00 am, HAS BEEN ADVANCED TO 08/07/2017 at 9:00 am. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 3, 2017 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Diamond Resorts International Club, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/28/2017 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion To Compel Arbitration, #2 Declaration Declaration of Corrine Gaxiola In Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Corrine Gaxiola In Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration of Corrine Gaxiola In Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration, #5 Proposed Order, #6 Supplement Proof of Service) (Attorney Rebecca J Wahlquist added to party Diamond Resorts International Club, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Wahlquist, Rebecca)
July 3, 2017 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES (L.R. 7.1-1) filed by Defendant Diamond Resorts International Club, Inc. identifying Defendant as Corporate Parent. (Wahlquist, Rebecca)
June 6, 2017 Filing 9 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Diamond Resorts International Club, Inc. answer now due 7/3/2017, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Diamond Resorts International Club, Inc..(Attorney Patrick W Kelly added to party Diamond Resorts International Club, Inc.(pty:dft))(Kelly, Patrick)
May 25, 2017 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Gisele Fournier, Rejean Fournier, upon Defendant Diamond Resorts International Club, Inc. served on 5/12/2017, answer due 6/2/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gabriela Sanchez, Corporate Operations Specialist in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Goldstein, Amir)
May 12, 2017 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Diamond Resorts International Club, Inc. (jtil)
May 11, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
May 11, 2017 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (jtil)
May 10, 2017 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs All others Similarly Situated, Gisele Fournier, Rejean Fournier. (Goldstein, Amir)
May 10, 2017 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Goldstein, Amir)
May 10, 2017 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs All others Similarly Situated, Gisele Fournier, Rejean Fournier. (Goldstein, Amir)
May 10, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19832026 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Gisele Fournier, All others Similarly Situated, Rejean Fournier. (Attorney Amir J Goldstein added to party All others Similarly Situated(pty:pla), Attorney Amir J Goldstein added to party Gisele Fournier(pty:pla), Attorney Amir J Goldstein added to party Rejean Fournier(pty:pla))(Goldstein, Amir)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gisele Fournier et al v. Diamond Resorts International Club, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Resorts International Club, Inc.
Represented By: Rebecca J Wahlquist
Represented By: Patrick W Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: All others Similarly Situated
Represented By: Amir J Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gisele Fournier
Represented By: Amir J Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rejean Fournier
Represented By: Amir J Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?