James Rutherford et al v. Cho-Park LLC et al

Plaintiff: James Rutherford and The Association 4 Equal Access
Defendant: Cho-Park, LLC and Does
Case Number: 5:2017cv01888
Filed: September 15, 2017
Court: California Central District Court
Referring Judge: Shashi H. Kewalramani
Presiding Judge: George H. Wu
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 19, 2018 19 Opinion or Order of the Court (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT by Judge George H. Wu: On January 17, 2018, Plaintiffs filed a Notice of Settlement. The Court sets an Order to Show re: Settlement Hearing for February 22, 2018 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel for Plaintiff is advised the order to show cause will be vacated and no appearance will be required provided a Notice of Dismissal, is filed by February 21, 2018. The order to show cause issued on January 8, 2018 is DISCHARGED. (cr)
January 8, 2018 17 Opinion or Order of the Court (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge George H. Wu: The file in this case lacks the papers that would show it is being timely prosecuted, as reflected below. Accordingly, the Court, on its own motion, hereby orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing no later than January 22, 2018 why this action should not be dismissed as to all remaining defendants for lack of prosecution. Please refer to the Court's order for additional information. (cr)
December 14, 2017 14 Opinion or Order of the Court (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge George H. Wu: The file in this case lacks the papers that would show it is being timely prosecuted, as reflected below. Accordingly, the Court, o n its own motion, hereby orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing no later than December 28, 2017 why this action should not be dismissed as to all remaining defendants for lack of prosecution. Please refer to the Court's order for additional information. (cr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James Rutherford et al v. Cho-Park LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cho-Park, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Rutherford
Represented By: Babak Hashemi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Association 4 Equal Access
Represented By: Babak Hashemi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?