Hanan Megalla et al v. Twitter, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiffs sued Defendants Twitter, Inc., Google, Inc. and Facebook, Inc. for knowingly and recklessly providing ISIS with social network accounts, which were used to spread extremist propaganda, raise funds, attract new recruits, and launch terrorist attacks, including the San Bernardino massacre.

Plaintiff: Abel Martinez, Veronica Martinez, Hanan Megalla and Osama Megalla
Defendant: Facebook, Inc., Google, Inc. and Twitter, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2017cv02404
Filed: November 30, 2017
Court: California Central District Court
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 5, 2017 10 NOTICE of Related Actions filed by Plaintiffs Abel Martinez, Veronica Martinez, Hanan Megalla, Osama Megalla. (Casillas, Arnoldo)
December 4, 2017 9 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. Plaintiffs are ordered to show cause why they should not file a Notice of Related Case as required by Local Rule 83-1.3 indicating that this action is related to Gregory Clayborn, et al. v. Twitter, Inc., et al., Case No. CV 17-3344 JFW (MRWx). Plaintiffs' response to the order to show cause shall be filed no later than December 11, 2017. The filing of a Notice of Related Case shall be deemed a sufficient response to the order to show cause. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom)
December 3, 2017 8 Featured Case STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (lom)
November 30, 2017 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to Defendants Facebook, Inc., Google, Inc., Twitter, Inc. (et)
November 30, 2017 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
November 30, 2017 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (et)
November 30, 2017 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Plaintiffs Abel Martinez, Veronica Martinez, Hanan Megalla, Osama Megalla. (Casillas, Arnoldo)
November 30, 2017 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Abel Martinez, Veronica Martinez, Hanan Megalla, Osama Megalla, (Casillas, Arnoldo)
November 30, 2017 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Abel Martinez, Veronica Martinez, Hanan Megalla, Osama Megalla. (Casillas, Arnoldo)
November 30, 2017 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-20898463 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Hanan Megalla, Abel Martinez, Veronica Martinez, Osama Megalla. (Attorney Arnoldo Casillas added to party Abel Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Arnoldo Casillas added to party Veronica Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Arnoldo Casillas added to party Hanan Megalla(pty:pla), Attorney Arnoldo Casillas added to party Osama Megalla(pty:pla))(Casillas, Arnoldo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hanan Megalla et al v. Twitter, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twitter, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abel Martinez
Represented By: Arnoldo Casillas
Represented By: Daniel W Gillette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Martinez
Represented By: Arnoldo Casillas
Represented By: Daniel W Gillette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hanan Megalla
Represented By: Arnoldo Casillas
Represented By: Daniel W Gillette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Osama Megalla
Represented By: Arnoldo Casillas
Represented By: Daniel W Gillette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?