In Re Valley Health System
Defendant: Valley Health System
Appellant: Carol Petrich, Diana Agnello, Debbie Johnson, Peggy Fetchko, Rosemary Kotyuk, Michael Barrera, Teresa Booth, Michael Hougen, Blanca Reyes, T. Kraft, Pamela Carlos, Samuel Montes, Stephen Ewalt, Jill Krell, Shirley Calloway, Jean Harrison, Jennifer Goerl, Eileen Kuhn, Rosie De La Rosa, Matthew McComb, Debbie Ekwall, Aileen Grisham, Cindi Bailey, Denise Murdock, Barbara Chappell, Robert Miller, Mark Redmond, Peggy Kirton, Joseph Acosta, Annette Greenwood, Phyllis Abbondanza, Richard Byrne, Thomas Mathiesen, Kathleen Bonney, Lynne McElwee, Teri Harstad, Rajender Gill, Cynthia Nelthorpe, Dorothy Palmer, Lorene Pratt, Ronald Cox, Carol Killingsworth, Beatrice Massey, Linda McKenzie, Anna Cooper, Elizabeth Campion, Mildred Miller, Sandra Callin, Deborah Morgan, Debbie Bivians, James McKenzie, Jr., David Kleinhans, Linda Bassett, Maurine Dzikonski, Mary Burgner, Ghirmai Dree, Cheryl Fish, Janice Reichardt, LeeAnne Cripe, Catherine Bruce, Janette Davis, Keith Herbert, Samantha Redmond, Linda Dekiewiet, Jessica Lopez, Evelyn Riddle, Carol Scarbrough, Virginia Wiggins, Scott Seidman, Barbara Welshon, Dana Valenzuela, David Stuart, William Siqueiros, David Sanders, Patricia Veary, Margaret Shafer, Mark Sousa, Norma Sack, Maria Schleuniger, Donald Wilson, Judy Stevenson, Juanita Sualog, Randy Reynolds, Antonia Rodriguez, Caroline Root, Maria Zavala and Sandra Riley
Appellee: MetLife, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2017cv02556
Filed: December 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2019 Filing 28 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kari A Keidser counsel for Appellants Phyllis Abbondanza, Joseph Acosta, Diana Agnello, Cindi Bailey, Michael Barrera, Debbie Bivians, Kathleen Bonney, Teresa Booth, Catherine Bruce, Mary Burgner, Richard Byrne, Sandra Callin, Shirley Calloway, Elizabeth Campion, Pamela Carlos, Barbara Chappell, Anna Cooper, Ronald Cox, LeeAnne Cripe, Janette Davis, Rosie De La Rosa, Linda Dekiewiet, Ghirmai Dree, Cheryl Fish, Rajender Gill, Jennifer Goerl, Annette Greenwood, Aileen Grisham, Jean Harrison, Teri Harstad, Keith Herbert, Michael Hougen, Carol Killingsworth, Peggy Kirton, David Kleinhans, T. Kraft, Jessica Lopez, Beatrice Massey, Thomas Mathiesen, Matthew McComb, Linda McKenzie, James McKenzie, Jr., Samuel Montes, Deborah Morgan, Denise Murdock, Cynthia Nelthorpe, Dorothy Palmer, Carol Petrich, Lorene Pratt, Janice Reichardt, Blanca Reyes, Randy Reynolds, Evelyn Riddle, Antonia Rodriguez, Caroline Root, Norma Sack, David Sanders, Carol Scarbrough, Maria Schleuniger, Margaret Shafer, William Siqueiros, Mark Sousa, Judy Stevenson, Juanita Sualog, Dana Valenzuela, Patricia Veary, Barbara Welshon, Maria Zavala. Adding Kari A. Keidser as counsel of record for Abbodanza, Acosta, Agnello, Bailey, Barrera, Bivians, Bonney, Booth, Bruce, Brugner, Byrne, Callin, Calloway, campion, Carlos, Chappel, Cooper, Cox, Cripe, Davis, De La Rosa, Dekiewiet, Dree, Fish, Gill, Goerl, Greenwood, Gresham, Griffiths, Harrison, Harstad, Herbert, Hougen, Killingsworth, Kirton, Kleinhans, Kraft, Lopez, Massey, Mathieson, McComb, L. McKenzie, J. McKenzie, Montes, Morgan, Murdock, Nelthorpe, Palmer, Petrich, Pratt, Reichardt, Reyes, Reynolds, Riddle, Rodriguez, Root, Sack, Sanders, Scarbrough, Schleuniger, Shafer, Siqueiros, Sousa, Stevenson, Sualog, Valenzuela, Veary, Weiand, Welshon, and Zavala for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs-Appellants Abbondanza, Acosta, Agnello, Bailey, Barrera, Bassett, Bivians, Bonney, Bruce, Booth, Burgner, Byrne, Callin, Calloway, Campion, Carlos, Chappell, Cooper, Cox, Cripe, Davis, De La Rosa, Dekiewiet, Dree, Fish, Gill, Goerl, Greenwood, Grisham, Harrison, Harstad, Herbert, Hougen, Killingsworth, Kirton, Kleinhans, Kraft, Lopez, Massey, Mathiesen, McComb, McKenzie, Jr., McKenzie, Miller, Montes, Morgan, Murdock, Nelthorpe, Palmer, Petrich, Pratt, Reichardt, Reyes, Reynolds, Riddle, Rodriguez, Root, Sack, Sanders, Scarbrough, Schleuniger, Shafer, Siqueiros, Sousa, Stevenson, Sualog, Valenzuela, Veary, Welshon, Wiggins, and Zavala. (Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Phyllis Abbondanza(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Joseph Acosta(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Diana Agnello(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Cindi Bailey(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Michael Barrera(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Debbie Bivians(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Kathleen Bonney(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Teresa Booth(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Catherine Bruce(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Mary Burgner(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Richard Byrne(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Sandra Callin(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Shirley Calloway(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Elizabeth Campion(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Pamela Carlos(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Barbara Chappell(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Anna Cooper(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Ronald Cox (pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party LeeAnne Cripe(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Janette Davis(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Rosie De La Rosa(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Linda Dekiewiet(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Ghirmai Dree(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Cheryl Fish(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Rajender Gill(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Jennifer Goerl(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Annette Greenwood(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Aileen Grisham(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Jean Harrison(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Teri Harstad(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Keith Herbert(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Michael Hougen(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Carol Killingsworth(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Peggy Kirton(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party David Kleinhans(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party T. Kraft(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Jessica Lopez(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Beatrice Massey(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Thomas Mathiesen(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Matthew McComb(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Linda McKenzie(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party James McKenzie, Jr.(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Samuel Montes(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Deborah Morgan(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Denise Murdock(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Cynthia Nelthorpe(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Dorothy Palmer(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Carol Petrich(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Lorene Pratt(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Janice Reichardt(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Blanca Reyes(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Randy Reynolds(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Evelyn Riddle(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Antonia Rodriguez(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Caroline Root(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Norma Sack(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party David Sanders(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Carol Scarbrough(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Maria Schleuniger(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Margaret Shafer(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party William Siqueiros(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Mark Sousa(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Judy Stevenson(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Juanita Sualog(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Dana Valenzuela(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Patricia Veary(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Barbara Welshon(pty:a), Attorney Kari A Keidser added to party Maria Zavala(pty:a))(Keidser, Kari)
January 11, 2019 Filing 27 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Appellee MetLife, Inc., re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,,,,, Case Stayed,,,,,, #26 served on January 10, 2019. (Hess, Robert)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: STATUS REPORT AND WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court has received attorney Robert M. Crissman's Status Report regarding whether he will continue to represent the Plaintiffs in this matter after the passing of attorney Gregory G. Peterson #25 . In light of all of the circumstances in this case reflected on the docket and in Mr. Crissman's Status Report, the Court GRANTS Mr. Crissman's request to withdraw as counsel of record, and further ORDERS as follows: (1) The Clerk shall TERMINATE attorneys Gregory G. Petersen and Robert M. Crissman as counsel of record for all appellants and list all appellants as proceeding pro se. Appellants shall have until 2/8/2019 to either file a Notice of Change of Address, or to retain new counsel. Appellants are advised that failure to timely comply with this Order or with the continuing obligation to keep the court apprised of a current mailing address, may result in dismissal of this appeal for lack of prosecution. (2) The case is STAYED until the earlier of either 2/8/2019, or the filing of a notice of appearance by appellants' new counsel. For any appellant who has not filed a Notice of Change of Address or for whom counsel has not appeared by 2/8/2019, the appeal will be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (3) If counsel for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company has a home or work address for any of the appellants, then counsel shall serve this Order on appellants and file a proof of service no later than 1/11/2019. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
November 20, 2018 Filing 25 STATUS REPORT Robert M. Crissman filed by Appellant Phyllis Abbondanza. (Crissman, Robert)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: STATUS REPORT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: On 8/23/2018, the Court stayed this case for 60 days in light of the passing of Plaintiffs' counsel Mr. Peterson, as reported by Defendant at the request of one of Mr. Peterson's colleagues #21 , #22 . In its recent status report, Defendant states that none of the Plaintiffs has contacted it regarding future representation in this appeal #23 . However, the Court notes that the docket reflects that Robert Crissman is also counsel of record for Plaintiffs. Mr. Crissman shall remain counsel of record unless and until he seeks and is granted withdrawal. The Court therefore ORDERS Plaintiffs, who remain represented by Mr. Crissman, to file a Status Report no later than 11/21/2018, indicating whether Mr. Crissman will continue to represent Plaintiffs, and whether they will proceed with this case, and reporting any other information germane to proceeding. If Plaintiffs intend to proceed, the parties are ORDERED to meet and confer on an appropriate schedule and Plaintiffs shall file with their report a proposed Order setting agreed-upon dates. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
October 19, 2018 Filing 23 STATUS REPORT Pursuant to Court Order Dated August 21, 2018 (Docket #21) filed by Appellee MetLife, Inc.. (Hess, Robert)
August 23, 2018 Filing 22 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Robert E Hess counsel for Appellee MetLife, Inc.. Adding Robert E. Hess as counsel of record for Defendants-Appellees MetLife, Inc. and Metropolitan Life Insurance Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants-Appellees MetLife, Inc. and Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attorney Robert E Hess added to party MetLife, Inc.(pty:e))(Hess, Robert)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER STAYING CASE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: In light of the Notice of Death of Appellant's Counsel filed by Appellee #20 , the Court hereby STAYS this case for 60 days. The Court requests that a Status Report be filed by the last day of the stay. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
August 14, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Death of Appellants' Counsel filed by Defendant-Appellee MetLife, Inc.. (Murray, Misty)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order To Show Cause Regarding Bankruptcy Appeal by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The docket reflects that a bankruptcy appeal has been filed in the above-entitled action, but that appellant has not filed the required F.R.B.P. Rule 8003 and 8009 records #18 . Appellant is Ordered to Show Cause no later than 8/3/2018, why the appeal should not be dismissed for these deficiencies. The Court may consider Appellant's filing of the missing required documents and fees, along with a declaration of good cause for the delay, sufficient response to the order to show cause. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
July 18, 2018 Filing 18 BANKRUPTCY COURT'S SECOND APPEAL DEFICIENCY NOTICE regarding Notice of Transcript and Transcript(s) not filed as required by FRBP 8003 and 8009, forwarded to Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (gk)
June 19, 2018 Filing 17 STATEMENT of Issues to be Presented on Appeal re Sanctions filed by Appellants Phyllis Abbondanza, Joseph Acosta, Diana Agnello, Cindi Bailey, Michael Barrera, Linda Bassett, Debbie Bivians, Kathleen Bonney, Teresa Booth, Catherine Bruce, Mary Burgner, Richard Byrne, Sandra Callin, Shirley Calloway, Elizabeth Campion, Pamela Carlos, Barbara Chappell, Anna Cooper, Ronald Cox, LeeAnne Cripe, Janette Davis, Rosie De La Rosa, Linda Dekiewiet, Ghirmai Dree, Maurine Dzikonski, Debbie Ekwall, Stephen Ewalt, Peggy Fetchko, Cheryl Fish, Rajender Gill, Jennifer Goerl, Annette Greenwood, Aileen Grisham, Jean Harrison, Teri Harstad, Keith Herbert, Michael Hougen, Debbie Johnson, Carol Killingsworth, Peggy Kirton, David Kleinhans, Rosemary Kotyuk, T. Kraft, Jill Krell, Eileen Kuhn, Jessica Lopez, Beatrice Massey, Thomas Mathiesen, Matthew McComb, Lynne McElwee, Linda McKenzie, James McKenzie, Jr., Mildred Miller, Robert Miller, Samuel Montes, Deborah Morgan, Denise Murdock, Cynthia Nelthorpe, Dorothy Palmer, Carol Petrich, Lorene Pratt, Mark Redmond, Samantha Redmond, Janice Reichardt, Blanca Reyes, Randy Reynolds, Evelyn Riddle, Sandra Riley, Antonia Rodriguez, Caroline Root, Norma Sack, David Sanders, Carol Scarbrough, Maria Schleuniger, Scott Seidman, Margaret Shafer, William Siqueiros, Mark Sousa, Judy Stevenson, David Stuart, Juanita Sualog, Dana Valenzuela, Patricia Veary, Barbara Welshon, Virginia Wiggins, Donald Wilson, Maria Zavala (Petersen, Gregory)
June 19, 2018 Filing 16 DESIGNATION OF RECORD filed by Appellants Phyllis Abbondanza, Joseph Acosta, Diana Agnello, Cindi Bailey, Michael Barrera, Linda Bassett, Debbie Bivians, Kathleen Bonney, Teresa Booth, Catherine Bruce, Mary Burgner, Richard Byrne, Sandra Callin, Shirley Calloway, Elizabeth Campion, Pamela Carlos, Barbara Chappell, Anna Cooper, Ronald Cox, LeeAnne Cripe, Janette Davis, Rosie De La Rosa, Linda Dekiewiet, Ghirmai Dree, Maurine Dzikonski, Debbie Ekwall, Stephen Ewalt, Peggy Fetchko, Cheryl Fish, Rajender Gill, Jennifer Goerl, Annette Greenwood, Aileen Grisham, Jean Harrison, Teri Harstad, Keith Herbert, Michael Hougen, Debbie Johnson, Carol Killingsworth, Peggy Kirton, David Kleinhans, Rosemary Kotyuk, T. Kraft, Jill Krell, Eileen Kuhn, Jessica Lopez, Beatrice Massey, Thomas Mathiesen, Matthew McComb, Lynne McElwee, Linda McKenzie, James McKenzie, Jr., Mildred Miller, Robert Miller, Samuel Montes, Deborah Morgan, Denise Murdock, Cynthia Nelthorpe, Dorothy Palmer, Carol Petrich, Lorene Pratt, Mark Redmond, Samantha Redmond, Janice Reichardt, Blanca Reyes, Randy Reynolds, Evelyn Riddle, Sandra Riley, Antonia Rodriguez, Caroline Root, Norma Sack, David Sanders, Carol Scarbrough, Maria Schleuniger, Scott Seidman, Margaret Shafer, William Siqueiros, Mark Sousa, Judy Stevenson, David Stuart, Juanita Sualog, Dana Valenzuela, Patricia Veary, Barbara Welshon, Virginia Wiggins, Donald Wilson, Maria Zavala. (Petersen, Gregory)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING DEADLINES FOR FILING DESIGNATION OF RECORD AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #14 , IT IS SO ORDERED that the Deadline to file Designation of Record is 6/15/2018. Appellants Opening Brief due by 7/25/2018. Appellee Brief due by 8/24/2018. Appellants Reply Brief due by 9/14/2018. (gk)
June 13, 2018 Filing 14 STIPULATION for Order SETTING DEADLINES FOR FILING THE DESIGNATION OF RECORD AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE filed by Appellant Phyllis Abbondanza, Joseph Acosta, Diana Agnello, Cindi Bailey, Michael Barrera, Linda Bassett, Debbie Bivians, Kathleen Bonney, Teresa Booth, Catherine Bruce, Mary Burgner, Richard Byrne, Sandra Callin, Shirley Calloway, Elizabeth Campion, Pamela Carlos, Barbara Chappell, Anna Cooper, Ronald Cox, LeeAnne Cripe, Janette Davis, Rosie De La Rosa, Linda Dekiewiet, Ghirmai Dree, Maurine Dzikonski, Debbie Ekwall, Stephen Ewalt, Peggy Fetchko, Cheryl Fish, Rajender Gill, Jennifer Goerl, Annette Greenwood, Aileen Grisham, Jean Harrison, Teri Harstad, Keith Herbert, Michael Hougen, Debbie Johnson, Carol Killingsworth, Peggy Kirton, David Kleinhans, Rosemary Kotyuk, T. Kraft, Jill Krell, Eileen Kuhn, Jessica Lopez, Beatrice Massey, Thomas Mathiesen, Matthew McComb, Lynne McElwee, Linda McKenzie, James McKenzie, Jr., Mildred Miller, Robert Miller, Samuel Montes, Deborah Morgan, Denise Murdock, Cynthia Nelthorpe, Dorothy Palmer, Carol Petrich, Lorene Pratt, Mark Redmond, Samantha Redmond, Janice Reichardt, Blanca Reyes, Randy Reynolds, Evelyn Riddle, Sandra Riley, Antonia Rodriguez, Caroline Root, Norma Sack, David Sanders, Carol Scarbrough, Maria Schleuniger, Scott Seidman, Margaret Shafer, William Siqueiros, Mark Sousa, Judy Stevenson, David Stuart, Juanita Sualog, Dana Valenzuela, Patricia Veary, Barbara Welshon, Virginia Wiggins, Donald Wilson, Maria Zavala. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Edward Chung, #2 Proposed Order)(Petersen, Gregory)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING COUNSEL PETERSEN'S MOTION TO VACATE THE ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Counsel Petersen's unopposed motion to vacate the order of dismissal for lack of prosecution without prejudice and set aside the judgment #10 is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to reopen the case. Counsel Petersen's request for leave to file portions of his declaration under seal is hereby GRANTED. The 6/8/2018 hearing is VACATED. The parties are ORDERED to meet and confer on a deadline for filing the Designation of Record and on a brief schedule; a Stipulation and Proposed Order are due filed by 6/11/2018. (gk)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING MOTION TO VACATE THE ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND SET ASIDE JUDGMENT AND REOPEN ACTION #11 HEARING DATE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. If the Monday or Friday in a given week is a holiday, the Court will NOT have a Friday calendar. The next available hearing date is the following Friday. Because Monday, May 28, 2018, is a holiday, the Court will not have a Friday calendar on June 1, 2018. The hearing date on the Motion is CONTINUED to Friday, June 8, 2018, at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 8, 2018 Filing 11 Corrected NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to file document MOTION TO VACATE THE ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND SET ASIDE JUDGMENT AND REOPEN ACTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF GREGORY G. PETERSEN; REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE PORTIONS OF THE DECLARATION OF GREGORY G. PETERSEN UNDER SEAL; [PROPOSED] ORDER under seal filed by Appellants Phyllis Abbondanza, Joseph Acosta, Diana Agnello, Cindi Bailey, Michael Barrera, Linda Bassett, Debbie Bivians, Kathleen Bonney, Teresa Booth, Catherine Bruce, Mary Burgner, Richard Byrne, Sandra Callin, Shirley Calloway, Elizabeth Campion, Pamela Carlos, Barbara Chappell, Anna Cooper, Ronald Cox, LeeAnne Cripe, Janette Davis, Rosie De La Rosa, Linda Dekiewiet, Ghirmai Dree, Maurine Dzikonski, Debbie Ekwall, Stephen Ewalt, Peggy Fetchko, Cheryl Fish, Rajender Gill, Jennifer Goerl, Annette Greenwood, Aileen Grisham, Jean Harrison, Teri Harstad, Keith Herbert, Michael Hougen, Debbie Johnson, Carol Killingsworth, Peggy Kirton, David Kleinhans, Rosemary Kotyuk, T. Kraft, Jill Krell, Eileen Kuhn, Jessica Lopez, Beatrice Massey, Thomas Mathiesen, Matthew McComb, Lynne McElwee, Linda McKenzie, James McKenzie, Jr., Mildred Miller, Robert Miller, Samuel Montes, Deborah Morgan, Denise Murdock, Cynthia Nelthorpe, Dorothy Palmer, Carol Petrich, Lorene Pratt, Mark Redmond, Samantha Redmond, Janice Reichardt, Blanca Reyes, Randy Reynolds, Evelyn Riddle, Sandra Riley, Antonia Rodriguez, Caroline Root, Norma Sack, David Sanders, Carol Scarbrough, Maria Schleuniger, Scott Seidman, Margaret Shafer, William Siqueiros, Mark Sousa, Judy Stevenson, David Stuart, Juanita Sualog, Dana Valenzuela, Patricia Veary, Barbara Welshon, Virginia Wiggins, Donald Wilson, Maria Zavala. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Redacted Declaration of Gregory G. Petersen in support, #3 Unredacted Document Declaration proposed to be filed under seal)(Petersen, Gregory)
May 8, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to file document MOTION TO VACATE THE ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND SET ASIDE JUDGMENT AND REOPEN ACTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF GREGORY G. PETERSEN; REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE PORTIONS OF THE DECLARATION OF GREGORY G. PETERSEN UNDER SEAL; [PROPOSED] ORDER under seal filed by Appellants Phyllis Abbondanza, Joseph Acosta, Diana Agnello, Cindi Bailey, Michael Barrera, Linda Bassett, Debbie Bivians, Kathleen Bonney, Teresa Booth, Catherine Bruce, Mary Burgner, Richard Byrne, Sandra Callin, Shirley Calloway, Elizabeth Campion, Pamela Carlos, Barbara Chappell, Anna Cooper, Ronald Cox, LeeAnne Cripe, Janette Davis, Rosie De La Rosa, Linda Dekiewiet, Ghirmai Dree, Maurine Dzikonski, Debbie Ekwall, Stephen Ewalt, Peggy Fetchko, Cheryl Fish, Rajender Gill, Jennifer Goerl, Annette Greenwood, Aileen Grisham, Jean Harrison, Teri Harstad, Keith Herbert, Michael Hougen, Debbie Johnson, Carol Killingsworth, Peggy Kirton, David Kleinhans, Rosemary Kotyuk, T. Kraft, Jill Krell, Eileen Kuhn, Jessica Lopez, Beatrice Massey, Thomas Mathiesen, Matthew McComb, Lynne McElwee, Linda McKenzie, James McKenzie, Jr., Mildred Miller, Robert Miller, Samuel Montes, Deborah Morgan, Denise Murdock, Cynthia Nelthorpe, Dorothy Palmer, Carol Petrich, Lorene Pratt, Mark Redmond, Samantha Redmond, Janice Reichardt, Blanca Reyes, Randy Reynolds, Evelyn Riddle, Sandra Riley, Antonia Rodriguez, Caroline Root, Norma Sack, David Sanders, Carol Scarbrough, Maria Schleuniger, Scott Seidman, Margaret Shafer, William Siqueiros, Mark Sousa, Judy Stevenson, David Stuart, Juanita Sualog, Dana Valenzuela, Patricia Veary, Barbara Welshon, Virginia Wiggins, Donald Wilson, Maria Zavala. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Redacted Declaration of Gregory G. Petersen in support)(Petersen, Gregory)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: On 2/14/2018, the Court issued an Order to Show Cause why this case should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution #8 . A written response to the Order to Show Cause was ordered to be filed no later than 3/1/2018. No response having been filed to the Court's Order to Show Cause, IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the case is dismissed, without prejudice, for lack of prosecution and for failure to comply with the orders of the Court, pursuant to Local Rule 41. ( Case Terminated. Made JS-6. ) (gk)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order To Show Cause Regarding Bankruptcy Appeal by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The docket reflects that a bankruptcy appeal has been filed in the action, but that appellant has not filed the required F.R.B.P. Rule 8009 records. Appellant is ORDERED to show cause no later than 3/1/2018, why the appeal should not be dismissed for these deficiencies. The Court may consider Appellant's filing of the missing required documents and fees, along with a declaration of good cause for the delay, sufficient response to the order to show cause. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
February 13, 2018 Filing 7 BANKRUPTCY COURT'S APPEAL DEFICIENCY NOTICE regarding Statement of Issues and Designation of Record were not filed as required by FRBP 8003 and 8009, forwarded to Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (gk)
January 2, 2018 Filing 6 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL and Statement of Election #1 filed by Appellants Phyllis Abbondanza, et al. Re: Order Denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Suggestion of and Request for Dismissal for Lack of Federal Jurisdiction, Abstention and Change of Venue Filed and Entered 12/7/2017 (copy attached). Bankruptcy Court case number: 6:07-BK-18293, Adversary number: 6:17-ap-01155-PC.(gk)
December 28, 2017 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
December 28, 2017 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEAL DEFICIENCY regarding Does not include entered stamped copy of order, judgment, or decree forwarded to Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (car)
December 28, 2017 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REFERRAL OF APPEAL (ADVERSARY) prepared by the United States Bankruptcy Court on 12/27/2017. (car)
December 28, 2017 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. One of the parties having so requested, this appeal from the U.S. Bankruptcy Court is assigned to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The District Court Case No. 5:17-cv-02556-AB must appear on all documents filed in this appeal, along with any Bankruptcy Court and adversary proceeding case numbers. Bankruptcy Court Case No. 6:07-BK-18293, Adversary Case No. 6:17-ap-0155-PC, and Bankruptcy Appellate No. NONE. The parties are responsible for reading and complying with all requirements provided in this notice and applicable rules of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure. Failure to comply with the time requirements stated in this notice and applicable rules may result in the dismissal of the appeal or the right to oppose the appeal. (car)
December 28, 2017 Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL AND STATEMENT OF ELECTION: Re: [ORDER OR JUDGMENT NOT INCLUDED] Bankruptcy Court case number: 6:07-BK-18293, Adversary number: 6:17-ap-01155-PC, BAP case number: NONE, filed by Appellants. [See USBC Court Docket for all Appellants]. (Attachments: #1 USBC Court Docket Sheet) (car)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re Valley Health System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley Health System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Carol Petrich
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Diana Agnello
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Debbie Johnson
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Peggy Fetchko
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Rosemary Kotyuk
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Michael Barrera
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Teresa Booth
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Michael Hougen
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Blanca Reyes
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: T. Kraft
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Pamela Carlos
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Samuel Montes
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Stephen Ewalt
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Jill Krell
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Shirley Calloway
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Jean Harrison
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Jennifer Goerl
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Eileen Kuhn
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Rosie De La Rosa
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Matthew McComb
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Debbie Ekwall
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Aileen Grisham
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Cindi Bailey
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Denise Murdock
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Barbara Chappell
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Robert Miller
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Mark Redmond
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Peggy Kirton
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Joseph Acosta
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Annette Greenwood
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Phyllis Abbondanza
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Richard Byrne
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Thomas Mathiesen
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Kathleen Bonney
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Lynne McElwee
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Teri Harstad
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Rajender Gill
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Cynthia Nelthorpe
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Dorothy Palmer
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Lorene Pratt
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Ronald Cox
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Carol Killingsworth
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Beatrice Massey
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Linda McKenzie
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Anna Cooper
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Elizabeth Campion
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Mildred Miller
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Sandra Callin
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Deborah Morgan
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Debbie Bivians
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: James McKenzie, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: David Kleinhans
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Linda Bassett
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Maurine Dzikonski
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Mary Burgner
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Ghirmai Dree
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Cheryl Fish
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Janice Reichardt
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: LeeAnne Cripe
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Catherine Bruce
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Janette Davis
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Keith Herbert
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Samantha Redmond
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Linda Dekiewiet
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Jessica Lopez
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Evelyn Riddle
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Carol Scarbrough
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Virginia Wiggins
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Scott Seidman
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Barbara Welshon
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Dana Valenzuela
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: David Stuart
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: William Siqueiros
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: David Sanders
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Patricia Veary
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Margaret Shafer
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Mark Sousa
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Norma Sack
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Maria Schleuniger
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Donald Wilson
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Judy Stevenson
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Juanita Sualog
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Randy Reynolds
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Antonia Rodriguez
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Caroline Root
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Maria Zavala
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Represented By: Kari A Keidser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Sandra Riley
Represented By: Robert Crissman
Represented By: Gregory G Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MetLife, Inc.
Represented By: George W Shaeffer, Jr
Represented By: Robert E Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?