Maersk Line v. Starmax Metal & Supply, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Maersk Line
Defendant: Lucy Yang, Starmax Metal & Supply, Inc. and Starmax Metal and Supply, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2018cv01541
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Sheri Pym
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:741
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 9/24/2018 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
August 16, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Lucy Yang, identifying Starmax Metal & Supply, Inc.. (Carter, Thomas)
August 16, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Lucy Yang.(Attorney Thomas Salazar Carter added to party Lucy Yang(pty:dft))(Carter, Thomas)
August 1, 2018 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Maersk Line, upon Defendant Lucy Yang served on 7/30/2018, answer due 8/20/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lucy Yang, Defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Uthoff, Stephen)
August 1, 2018 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Maersk Line, upon Defendant Starmax Metal and Supply, Inc. served on 7/30/2018, answer due 8/20/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lucy Yang, Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Uthoff, Stephen)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
July 23, 2018 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Starmax Metal and Supply, Inc. (jtil)
July 23, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
July 23, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (jtil)
July 19, 2018 Filing 5 AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Maersk Line. (Uthoff, Stephen)
July 19, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Maersk Line, identifying 1.Maersk Line A/S, a Denmark corporation trading as Maersk Line, Maersk Agency USA Inc. (Uthoff, Stephen)
July 19, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Maersk Line. (Uthoff, Stephen)
July 19, 2018 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Maersk Line. (Uthoff, Stephen)
July 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22119479 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Maersk Line. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Stephen M Uthoff added to party Maersk Line(pty:pla))(Uthoff, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maersk Line v. Starmax Metal & Supply, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maersk Line
Represented By: Stephen M Uthoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucy Yang
Represented By: Thomas Salazar Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starmax Metal & Supply, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starmax Metal and Supply, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?