Water For Living,LLC et al v. Richard Staack, et al

Plaintiff: Cellular Bio Delivery Living, Inc. and Water For Living,LLC
Defendant: Richard Staack and Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2018cv01588
Filed: July 27, 2018
Court: California Central District Court
0 Judge: Sheri Pym
1 Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 12, 2018 37 REFUND OF $400.00 made payable on 09/12/2018 to Theodore K Stream for payment made on 07/27/2018 Re: APPLICATION for Refund of Fees Paid Re: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 #28 . (rdj)
September 12, 2018 36 REFUND OF $400.00 made payable on 09/12/2018 to Theodore K Stream for payment made on 08/01/2018 Re: APPLICATION for Refund of Fees Paid Re: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael John Raiz to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Richard Staack (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22181321) #15 #27 . (rdj)
September 12, 2018 35 REFUND OF $400.00 made payable on 09/12/2018 to Eugene Kim for payment made on 08/01/2018 Re: APPLICATION for Refund of Fees Paid Re: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael John Raiz to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Richard Staack (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22181321) #15 , Notice of Deficiency #26 . (rdj)
August 29, 2018 34 Featured Case CIVIL TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
August 27, 2018 33 MINUTES OF NEW CASE STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The Court sets the following dates: Discovery cut-off 12/14/2018. Jury Trial set for 2/5/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Pretrial Conference set for 1/28/2019 at 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Court Reporter: N/A. (mrgo)
August 22, 2018 32 SUPPLEMENT to Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form,,, #10 filed by Plaintiffs Cellular Bio Delivery Living, Inc., Water For Living,LLC. (Yoo, S)
August 20, 2018 31 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: APPLICATION to Supplement Application of Non-Resident Attorney Anderson J. Duff to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice re APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Anderson J. Duff to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Water For Living,LLC #29 by Clerk of Court. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by 8/27/18. L.R. 83-2.5 Communications with the Judge. Attorneys or parties to any action or proceeding shall refrain from writing letters to the judge, sending e-mail messages to the judge, making telephone calls to chambers, or otherwise communicating with a judge in a pending matter unless opposing counsel is present. All matters must be called to a judge's attention by appropriate application or motion filed in compliance with these Local Rules. (mrgo)
August 20, 2018 30 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION to Supplement Application of Non-Resident Attorney Anderson J. Duff to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice re APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Anderson J. Duff to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Water For Living,LLC #29 . The following error(s) was/were found: Title page is missing. Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Motions and Related Filings > Responses/Replies/Other Motion Related Documents > Supplement (Motion related). Other error(s) with document(s): Title page is missing. (L.R. 11-3.8). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo)
August 17, 2018 29 [DOCUMENT ORDERED STRICKEN PER DOC. NO. 31] APPLICATION to Supplement Application of Non-Resident Attorney Anderson J. Duff to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice re APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Anderson J. Duff to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Water For Living,LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22205656) #21 filed by Plaintiffs Cellular Bio Delivery Living, Inc., Water For Living,LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Duff, Anderson) Modified on 8/20/2018 (mrgo).
August 9, 2018 28 APPLICATION for Refund of Fees Paid Re: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Richard Staack. (Kim, Eugene)
August 9, 2018 27 APPLICATION for Refund of Fees Paid Re: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael John Raiz to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Richard Staack (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22181321) #15 filed by Defendant Richard Staack. (Kim, Eugene)
August 9, 2018 26 APPLICATION for Refund of Fees Paid Re: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael John Raiz to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Richard Staack (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22181321) #15 , Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form, #18 filed by Defendant Richard Staack. (Kim, Eugene)
August 8, 2018 25 NOTICE OF INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE filed by Plaintiffs Cellular Bio Delivery Living, Inc., Water For Living,LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Yoo, S)
August 7, 2018 24 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #22 Non-Resident Attorney Michael John Raiz APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendant Richard Staack, designating Eugene Kim as local counsel. (mrgo)
August 7, 2018 23 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #21 Non-Resident Attorney Anderson J. Duff APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiffs Water for Living, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company, and Cellular Bio Delivery Living, Inc., designating S. Christopher Yoo as local counsel. (mrgo)
August 6, 2018 22 Amended APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael John Raiz to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Richard Staack (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22207750) filed by Defendant Richard Staack. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Letter of Good Standing) (Kim, Eugene)
August 6, 2018 21 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Anderson J. Duff to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Water For Living,LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22205656) filed by Plaintiff Water For Living,LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Yoo, S)
August 3, 2018 20 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Richard Staack.(Kim, Eugene)
August 2, 2018 19 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #16 Non-Resident Attorney Lesley Riego de Dios Arca APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendant Richard Staack, designating Eugene Kim as local counsel. (mrgo)
August 1, 2018 18 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael John Raiz to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Richard Staack (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22181321) #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Other error(s) with document(s): Indiana missing. (lt)
August 1, 2018 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Richard Staack, re APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lesley Riego de Dios Arca to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Richard Staack (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22181410) #16 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael John Raiz to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Richard Staack (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22181321) #15 served on 08/01/2018. (Kim, Eugene)
August 1, 2018 16 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lesley Riego de Dios Arca to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Richard Staack (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22181410) filed by Defendant Richard Staack. (Attachments: #1 Letter Of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order To Application of Non-Resident Attorney (Pro Hac Vice)) (Kim, Eugene)
August 1, 2018 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael John Raiz to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Richard Staack (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22181321) filed by Defendant Richard Staack. (Attachments: #1 Letter Of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order Application of Non-Resident Attorney (Pro Hac Vice)) (Kim, Eugene)
July 31, 2018 14 Featured Case ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 8/27/2018 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
July 31, 2018 13 Featured Case NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
July 31, 2018 12 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiff Cellular Bio Delivery Living, Inc., Water For Living,LLC.. (Yoo, S)
July 31, 2018 11 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, identifying None. (Yoo, S)
July 30, 2018 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Anderson J. Duff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
July 30, 2018 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Lesley R. Arca. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
July 30, 2018 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Michael J. Raiz. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
July 30, 2018 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
July 30, 2018 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 16-05, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:18-cv-1588 SVW (SPx). (esa)
July 27, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does 1 through 20, inclusive, Richard Staack, Jury Demand, filed by plaintiffs Water For Living,LLC, Cellular Bio Delivery Living, Inc. (Filed in state court 6/20/2018, submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p. 7) (esa)
July 27, 2018 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Richard Staack, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 served on 07/27/2018. (Kim, Eugene)
July 27, 2018 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Richard Staack, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 served on 07/27/2018. (Kim, Eugene)
July 27, 2018 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Richard Staack, (Kim, Eugene)
July 27, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Richard Staack. (Kim, Eugene)
July 27, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside County Superior Court, case number RIC 1812395 Receipt No: 0973-22161865 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Richard Staack. (Attorney Eugene Kim added to party Richard Staack(pty:dft))(Kim, Eugene)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Water For Living,LLC et al v. Richard Staack, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Staack
Represented By: Eugene Kim
Represented By: Lesley R Arca
Represented By: Michael J Raiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cellular Bio Delivery Living, Inc.
Represented By: Anderson J Duff
Represented By: S Christopher Yoo
Represented By: Jacob M Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Water For Living,LLC
Represented By: Anderson J Duff
Represented By: S Christopher Yoo
Represented By: Jacob M Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?