Stephenson Awah Teneng et al v. Donald J. Trump et al
Plaintiff: Atinder Paul Singh, Gurjinder Singh, Noe Mauricio Granados Aquino, Stephenson Awah Teneng, Marcel Ngwa and Ankush Kumar
Defendant: Kirstjen M. Nielsen, David Marin, Ronald D. Vitiello, Hugh J. Hurwitz, Jefferson B. Sessions, David Shinn, Donald J. Trump, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III and Kirstjen Nielsen
Case Number: 5:2018cv01609
Filed: August 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2018 Filing 49 OPPOSITION in Opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class #34 , Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Defendants Hugh J. Hurwitz, David Marin, Kirstjen Nielsen, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, David Shinn, Donald J. Trump, Ronald D. Vitiello. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ian Herrera, #2 Declaration of Tae D. Johnson, #3 Declaration of Jess Pino, #4 Exhibit "A" - "G")(Pinchas, David)
September 21, 2018 Filing 48 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Oppositions to Plaintiffs' Motions for Class Certification, Preliminary Injunction and For Expedited Discovery filed by Defendants Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joanne Osinoff, #2 Proposed Order)(Attorney Joanne I Osinoff added to party Donald J. Trump(pty:dft))(Osinoff, Joanne)
September 20, 2018 Filing 47 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David E Pinchas counsel for Defendants Hugh J. Hurwitz, David Marin, Kirstjen Nielsen, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, David Shinn, Donald J. Trump, Ronald D. Vitiello. Adding David Pinchas as counsel of record for Donald J. Trump; Kirstjen Nielsen; Ronald D. Vitiello; David Marin; Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III; Hugh J. Hurwitz; David Shinn for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Donald J. Trump; Kirstjen Nielsen; Ronald D. Vitiello; David Marin; Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III; Hugh J. Hurwitz; and David Shinn. (Attorney David E Pinchas added to party Hugh J. Hurwitz(pty:dft), Attorney David E Pinchas added to party David Marin(pty:dft), Attorney David E Pinchas added to party Kirstjen Nielsen(pty:dft), Attorney David E Pinchas added to party Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III(pty:dft), Attorney David E Pinchas added to party David Shinn(pty:dft), Attorney David E Pinchas added to party Donald J. Trump(pty:dft), Attorney David E Pinchas added to party Ronald D. Vitiello(pty:dft))(Pinchas, David)
September 11, 2018 Filing 46 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for allowing limited expedited discovery filed by plaintiffs Noe Mauricio Granados Aquino, Ankush Kumar, Marcel Ngwa, Atinder Paul Singh, Gurjinder Singh, Stephenson Awah Teneng. Motion set for hearing on 10/15/2018 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ana Diaz, #2 Proposed Order Limited Expedited Discovery)(Mendelson, Margot)
September 11, 2018 Filing 45 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Granting Plaintiffs Constitutional rights and accompanying Memorandum of Points and Authorities. Motion filed by Plaintiff Noe Mauricio Granados Aquino, Ankush Kumar, Marcel Ngwa, Atinder Paul Singh, Gurjinder Singh, Stephenson Awah Teneng. Motion set for hearing on 10/15/2018 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Declaration Mendelson Declaration ISO Motion, #11 Proposed Order Granting Motion) (Mendelson, Margot)
September 6, 2018 Filing 44 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Order GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART Plaintiffs' Motion to Exceed the Twenty Five Page Limit for Memoranda of Points and Authority #42 . (twdb)
September 6, 2018 Filing 43 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation Memoranda of Points and Authority to PI Motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exceed the 25-page limit #42 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ad)
September 5, 2018 Filing 42 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation Memoranda of Points and Authority to PI Motion, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exceed the 25-page limit filed by Plaintiffs Noe Mauricio Granados Aquino, Ankush Kumar, Marcel Ngwa, Atinder Paul Singh, Gurjinder Singh, Stephenson Awah Teneng. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Donald Specter ISO Motion for Leave to Exceed, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limits) (Mendelson, Margot)
September 5, 2018 Filing 41 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class #34 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
September 5, 2018 Filing 40 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Rekha Elaine Arulanantham counsel for Plaintiffs Noe Mauricio Granados Aquino, Ankush Kumar, Marcel Ngwa, Atinder Paul Singh, Gurjinder Singh, Stephenson Awah Teneng. Rekha Arulanantham is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Attorney Rekha Arulanantham. (Arulanantham, Rekha)
September 4, 2018 Filing 39 DECLARATION of Nancy Harris in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class #34 filed by Plaintiffs Noe Mauricio Granados Aquino, Ankush Kumar, Marcel Ngwa, Atinder Paul Singh, Gurjinder Singh, Stephenson Awah Teneng. (Kendrick, Corene)
September 4, 2018 Filing 38 DECLARATION of Timothy Fox in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class #34 filed by Plaintiffs Noe Mauricio Granados Aquino, Ankush Kumar, Marcel Ngwa, Atinder Paul Singh, Gurjinder Singh, Stephenson Awah Teneng. (Kendrick, Corene)
September 4, 2018 Filing 37 DECLARATION of David C. Fathi in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class #34 filed by Plaintiffs Noe Mauricio Granados Aquino, Ankush Kumar, Marcel Ngwa, Atinder Paul Singh, Gurjinder Singh, Stephenson Awah Teneng. (Kendrick, Corene)
September 4, 2018 Filing 36 DECLARATION of Donald Specter in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class #34 filed by Plaintiffs Noe Mauricio Granados Aquino, Ankush Kumar, Marcel Ngwa, Atinder Paul Singh, Gurjinder Singh, Stephenson Awah Teneng. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-3)(Kendrick, Corene)
September 4, 2018 Filing 35 DECLARATION of Corene Kendrick in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class #34 filed by Plaintiffs Noe Mauricio Granados Aquino, Ankush Kumar, Marcel Ngwa, Atinder Paul Singh, Gurjinder Singh, Stephenson Awah Teneng. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kendrick, Corene)
September 4, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class filed by Plaintiff Noe Mauricio Granados Aquino, Ankush Kumar, Marcel Ngwa, Atinder Paul Singh, Gurjinder Singh, Stephenson Awah Teneng. Motion set for hearing on 10/9/2018 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kendrick, Corene)
September 4, 2018 Filing 33 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Anne Elizabeth Smiddy counsel for Plaintiffs Noe Mauricio Granados Aquino, Ankush Kumar, Marcel Ngwa, Atinder Paul Singh, Gurjinder Singh, Stephenson Awah Teneng. Adding Anne E. Smiddy as counsel of record for Noe Mauricio Granados Aquino, Ankush Kumar, Marcel Ngwa, Atinder Paul Singh, Gurjinder Singh, Stephenson Awah Teneng for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Noe Mauricio Granados Aquino, Ankush Kumar, Marcel Ngwa, Atinder Paul Singh, Gurjinder Singh, Stephenson Awah Teneng. (Attorney Anne Elizabeth Smiddy added to party Noe Mauricio Granados Aquino(pty:pla), Attorney Anne Elizabeth Smiddy added to party Ankush Kumar(pty:pla), Attorney Anne Elizabeth Smiddy added to party Marcel Ngwa(pty:pla), Attorney Anne Elizabeth Smiddy added to party Atinder Paul Singh(pty:pla), Attorney Anne Elizabeth Smiddy added to party Gurjinder Singh(pty:pla), Attorney Anne Elizabeth Smiddy added to party Stephenson Awah Teneng(pty:pla))(Smiddy, Anne)
August 31, 2018 Filing 32 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Nancy E Harris counsel for Plaintiffs Noe Mauricio Granados Aquino, Ankush Kumar, Marcel Ngwa, Atinder Paul Singh, Gurjinder Singh, Stephenson Awah Teneng. Adding Nancy E. Harris as counsel of record for Noe Mauricio Granados Aquino, Ankush Kumar, Marcel Ngwa, Atinder Paul Singh, Gurjinder Singh, Stephenson Awah Teneng for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Noe Mauricio Granados Aquino, Ankush Kumar, Marcel Ngwa, Atinder Paul Singh, Gurjinder Singh, Stephenson Awah Teneng. (Attorney Nancy E Harris added to party Noe Mauricio Granados Aquino(pty:pla), Attorney Nancy E Harris added to party Ankush Kumar(pty:pla), Attorney Nancy E Harris added to party Marcel Ngwa(pty:pla), Attorney Nancy E Harris added to party Atinder Paul Singh(pty:pla), Attorney Nancy E Harris added to party Gurjinder Singh(pty:pla), Attorney Nancy E Harris added to party Stephenson Awah Teneng(pty:pla))(Harris, Nancy)
August 31, 2018 Filing 31 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ellyn Moscowitz counsel for Plaintiffs Noe Mauricio Granados Aquino, Ankush Kumar, Marcel Ngwa, Atinder Paul Singh, Gurjinder Singh, Stephenson Awah Teneng. Adding Ellyn L. Moscowitz as counsel of record for Noe Mauricio Granados Aquino, Ankush Kumar, Marcel Ngwa, Atinder Paul Singh, Gurjinder Singh, Stephenson Awah Teneng for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Noe Mauricio Granados Aquino, Ankush Kumar, Marcel Ngwa, Atinder Paul Singh, Gurjinder Singh, Stephenson Awah Teneng. (Attorney Ellyn Moscowitz added to party Noe Mauricio Granados Aquino(pty:pla), Attorney Ellyn Moscowitz added to party Ankush Kumar(pty:pla), Attorney Ellyn Moscowitz added to party Marcel Ngwa(pty:pla), Attorney Ellyn Moscowitz added to party Atinder Paul Singh(pty:pla), Attorney Ellyn Moscowitz added to party Gurjinder Singh(pty:pla), Attorney Ellyn Moscowitz added to party Stephenson Awah Teneng(pty:pla))(Moscowitz, Ellyn)
August 31, 2018 Filing 30 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Lori J Barker counsel for Plaintiffs Noe Mauricio Granados Aquino, Ankush Kumar, Marcel Ngwa, Atinder Paul Singh, Gurjinder Singh, Stephenson Awah Teneng. Adding Lori J Barker as counsel of record for Noe Mauricio Granados Aquino, Ankush Kumar, Marcel Ngwa, Atinder Paul Singh, Gurjinder Singh, Stephenson Awah Teneng for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Noe Mauricio Granados Aquino, Ankush Kumar, Marcel Ngwa, Atinder Paul Singh, Gurjinder Singh, Stephenson Awah Teneng. (Attorney Lori J Barker added to party Noe Mauricio Granados Aquino(pty:pla), Attorney Lori J Barker added to party Ankush Kumar(pty:pla), Attorney Lori J Barker added to party Marcel Ngwa(pty:pla), Attorney Lori J Barker added to party Atinder Paul Singh(pty:pla), Attorney Lori J Barker added to party Gurjinder Singh(pty:pla), Attorney Lori J Barker added to party Stephenson Awah Teneng(pty:pla))(Barker, Lori)
August 31, 2018 Filing 29 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jason Sherriff Rosenberg counsel for Plaintiffs Noe Mauricio Granados Aquino, Ankush Kumar, Marcel Ngwa, Atinder Paul Singh, Gurjinder Singh, Stephenson Awah Teneng. Adding Jason Sherriff Rosenberg as counsel of record for Noe Mauricio Granados Aquino, Ankush Kumar, Marcel Ngwa, Gurjinder Singh, Stephenson Awah Teneng, Atinder Paul Singh for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Noe Mauricio Granados Aquino, Ankush Kumar, Marcel Ngwa, Gurjinder Singh, Stephenson Awah Teneng, Atinder Paul Singh. (Attorney Jason Sherriff Rosenberg added to party Noe Mauricio Granados Aquino(pty:pla), Attorney Jason Sherriff Rosenberg added to party Ankush Kumar(pty:pla), Attorney Jason Sherriff Rosenberg added to party Marcel Ngwa(pty:pla), Attorney Jason Sherriff Rosenberg added to party Atinder Paul Singh(pty:pla), Attorney Jason Sherriff Rosenberg added to party Gurjinder Singh(pty:pla), Attorney Jason Sherriff Rosenberg added to party Stephenson Awah Teneng(pty:pla))(Rosenberg, Jason)
August 29, 2018 Filing 28 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Noe Mauricio Granados Aquino, Ankush Kumar, Marcel Ngwa, Gurjinder Singh, Stephenson Awah Teneng, Atinder Paul Singh, upon Defendant Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III served on 8/29/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Pay Myles, Civil Intake Clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Certified Mail. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Certified Mail. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons returned. Amended Proof of Service. (Fox, Timothy)
August 29, 2018 Filing 27 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Noe Mauricio Granados Aquino, Ankush Kumar, Marcel Ngwa, Gurjinder Singh, Stephenson Awah Teneng, Atinder Paul Singh, upon Defendant Hugh J. Hurwitz served on 8/27/2018, answer due 10/26/2018; David Marin served on 8/27/2018, answer due 10/26/2018; Kirstjen Nielsen served on 8/27/2018, answer due 10/26/2018; David Shinn served on 8/27/2018, answer due 10/26/2018; Ronald D. Vitiello served on 8/27/2018, answer due 10/26/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Pay Myles, Civil Intake Clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Certified Mail. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Certified Mail. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons returned. Amended Proof of Service. (Fox, Timothy)
August 29, 2018 Filing 26 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Noe Mauricio Granados Aquino, Ankush Kumar, Marcel Ngwa, Gurjinder Singh, Stephenson Awah Teneng, Atinder Paul Singh, upon Defendant Donald J. Trump served on 8/27/2018, answer due 10/26/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Pay Myles, Civil Intake Clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Certified Mail. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Certified Mail. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons returned. Amended Proof of Service. (Fox, Timothy)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: granting #23 Non-Resident Attorney Victoria A. Lopez APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Stephenson Awah Teneng, et al., Plaintiffs, designating Michael Kaufman as local counsel. (twdb)
August 22, 2018 Filing 24 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Noe Mauricio Granados Aquino, Ankush Kumar, Marcel Ngwa, Gurjinder Singh, Stephenson Awah Teneng, Atinder Paul Singh, upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Fabiola De La Rosa, Civil Clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Certified Mail. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Certified Mail. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Fox, Timothy)
August 17, 2018 Filing 23 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Victoria A. Lopez to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Noe Mauricio Granados Aquino, Ankush Kumar, Marcel Ngwa, Atinder Paul Singh, Gurjinder Singh, Stephenson Awah Teneng (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22273915) filed by Plaintiffs Noe Mauricio Granados Aquino, Ankush Kumar, Marcel Ngwa, Atinder Paul Singh, Gurjinder Singh, Stephenson Awah Teneng. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kaufman, Michael)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: granting #19 Non-Resident Attorney Elizabeth B. Jordan APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Stephenson Awah Teneng, et al., Plaintiffs, designating Michael Kaufman as local counsel. (twdb)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: granting #18 Non-Resident Attorney David C. Fathi APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Stephenson Awah Teneng, et al., designating Michael Kaufman as local counsel. (twdb)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: granting #17 Non-Resident Attorney Daniel I. Mach APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Teneng et al., Plaintiffs, designating Michael B. Kaufman as local counsel. (twdb)
August 8, 2018 Filing 19 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Elizabeth B. Jordan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Noe Mauricio Granados Aquino, Ankush Kumar, Marcel Ngwa, Atinder Paul Singh, Gurjinder Singh, Stephenson Awah Teneng (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22223000) filed by Plaintiffs Noe Mauricio Granados Aquino, Ankush Kumar, Marcel Ngwa, Atinder Paul Singh, Gurjinder Singh, Stephenson Awah Teneng. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kaufman, Michael)
August 8, 2018 Filing 18 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David C. Fathi to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Noe Mauricio Granados Aquino, Ankush Kumar, Marcel Ngwa, Atinder Paul Singh, Gurjinder Singh, Stephenson Awah Teneng (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22222930) filed by Plaintiffs Noe Mauricio Granados Aquino, Ankush Kumar, Marcel Ngwa, Atinder Paul Singh, Gurjinder Singh, Stephenson Awah Teneng. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kaufman, Michael)
August 8, 2018 Filing 17 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Daniel I. Mach to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Noe Mauricio Granados Aquino, Ankush Kumar, Marcel Ngwa, Atinder Paul Singh, Gurjinder Singh, Stephenson Awah Teneng (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22221868) filed by Plaintiffs Noe Mauricio Granados Aquino, Ankush Kumar, Marcel Ngwa, Atinder Paul Singh, Gurjinder Singh, Stephenson Awah Teneng. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Michael Bryan Kaufman added to party Noe Mauricio Granados Aquino(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Bryan Kaufman added to party Ankush Kumar(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Bryan Kaufman added to party Marcel Ngwa(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Bryan Kaufman added to party Atinder Paul Singh(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Bryan Kaufman added to party Gurjinder Singh(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Bryan Kaufman added to party Stephenson Awah Teneng(pty:pla)) (Kaufman, Michael)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
August 3, 2018 Filing 15 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Hugh J. Hurwitz, David Marin, Kirstjen Nielsen, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, David Shinn, Ronald D. Vitiello. (twdb)
August 3, 2018 Filing 14 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Donald J. Trump. (twdb)
August 2, 2018 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Noe Mauricio Granados Aquino, Ankush Kumar, Marcel Ngwa, Atinder Paul Singh, Gurjinder Singh, Stephenson Awah Teneng. (Mendelson, Margot)
August 2, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Elizabeth Jordan. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
August 2, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Victoria Lopez. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
August 2, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Daniel Mach. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
August 2, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney David C. Fathi. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
August 2, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #5 . The following error(s) was found: Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendants name must appear in the To:section of the summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lh)
August 2, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
August 2, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (lh)
August 1, 2018 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Noe Mauricio Granados Aquino, Ankush Kumar, Marcel Ngwa, Atinder Paul Singh, Gurjinder Singh, Stephenson Awah Teneng. (Mendelson, Margot)
August 1, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Noe Mauricio Granados Aquino, Ankush Kumar, Marcel Ngwa, Atinder Paul Singh, Gurjinder Singh, Stephenson Awah Teneng. (Mendelson, Margot)
August 1, 2018 Filing 3 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Mendelson, Margot)
August 1, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Noe Mauricio Granados Aquino, Ankush Kumar, Marcel Ngwa, Atinder Paul Singh, Gurjinder Singh, Stephenson Awah Teneng. (Mendelson, Margot)
August 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22182360 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Noe Mauricio Granados Aquino, Ankush Kumar, Marcel Ngwa, Gurjinder Singh, Stephenson Awah Teneng, Atinder Paul Singh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20) (Attorney Margot Knight Mendelson added to party Noe Mauricio Granados Aquino(pty:pla), Attorney Margot Knight Mendelson added to party Ankush Kumar(pty:pla), Attorney Margot Knight Mendelson added to party Marcel Ngwa(pty:pla), Attorney Margot Knight Mendelson added to party Atinder Paul Singh(pty:pla), Attorney Margot Knight Mendelson added to party Gurjinder Singh(pty:pla), Attorney Margot Knight Mendelson added to party Stephenson Awah Teneng(pty:pla))(Mendelson, Margot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stephenson Awah Teneng et al v. Donald J. Trump et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atinder Paul Singh
Represented By: Margot Knight Mendelson
Represented By: Rekha Elaine Arulanantham
Represented By: Anne Elizabeth Smiddy
Represented By: Timothy P Fox
Represented By: Daniel Mach
Represented By: Elizabeth B Jordan
Represented By: Jason Sherriff Rosenberg
Represented By: Lori J Barker
Represented By: Ellyn Moscowitz
Represented By: Michael Bryan Kaufman
Represented By: Donald Specter
Represented By: Corene Kendrick
Represented By: Heather L Weaver
Represented By: Nancy E Harris
Represented By: Victoria A Lopez
Represented By: David C Fathi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gurjinder Singh
Represented By: Margot Knight Mendelson
Represented By: Rekha Elaine Arulanantham
Represented By: Anne Elizabeth Smiddy
Represented By: Timothy P Fox
Represented By: Daniel Mach
Represented By: Elizabeth B Jordan
Represented By: Jason Sherriff Rosenberg
Represented By: Lori J Barker
Represented By: Ellyn Moscowitz
Represented By: Michael Bryan Kaufman
Represented By: Donald Specter
Represented By: Corene Kendrick
Represented By: Heather L Weaver
Represented By: Nancy E Harris
Represented By: Victoria A Lopez
Represented By: David C Fathi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noe Mauricio Granados Aquino
Represented By: Margot Knight Mendelson
Represented By: Rekha Elaine Arulanantham
Represented By: Anne Elizabeth Smiddy
Represented By: Timothy P Fox
Represented By: Daniel Mach
Represented By: Elizabeth B Jordan
Represented By: Jason Sherriff Rosenberg
Represented By: Lori J Barker
Represented By: Ellyn Moscowitz
Represented By: Michael Bryan Kaufman
Represented By: Donald Specter
Represented By: Corene Kendrick
Represented By: Heather L Weaver
Represented By: Nancy E Harris
Represented By: Victoria A Lopez
Represented By: David C Fathi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephenson Awah Teneng
Represented By: Margot Knight Mendelson
Represented By: Rekha Elaine Arulanantham
Represented By: Anne Elizabeth Smiddy
Represented By: Timothy P Fox
Represented By: Daniel Mach
Represented By: Elizabeth B Jordan
Represented By: Jason Sherriff Rosenberg
Represented By: Lori J Barker
Represented By: Ellyn Moscowitz
Represented By: Michael Bryan Kaufman
Represented By: Donald Specter
Represented By: Corene Kendrick
Represented By: Heather L Weaver
Represented By: Nancy E Harris
Represented By: Victoria A Lopez
Represented By: David C Fathi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcel Ngwa
Represented By: Margot Knight Mendelson
Represented By: Rekha Elaine Arulanantham
Represented By: Anne Elizabeth Smiddy
Represented By: Timothy P Fox
Represented By: Daniel Mach
Represented By: Elizabeth B Jordan
Represented By: Jason Sherriff Rosenberg
Represented By: Lori J Barker
Represented By: Ellyn Moscowitz
Represented By: Michael Bryan Kaufman
Represented By: Donald Specter
Represented By: Corene Kendrick
Represented By: Heather L Weaver
Represented By: Nancy E Harris
Represented By: Victoria A Lopez
Represented By: David C Fathi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ankush Kumar
Represented By: Margot Knight Mendelson
Represented By: Rekha Elaine Arulanantham
Represented By: Anne Elizabeth Smiddy
Represented By: Timothy P Fox
Represented By: Daniel Mach
Represented By: Elizabeth B Jordan
Represented By: Jason Sherriff Rosenberg
Represented By: Lori J Barker
Represented By: Ellyn Moscowitz
Represented By: Michael Bryan Kaufman
Represented By: Donald Specter
Represented By: Corene Kendrick
Represented By: Heather L Weaver
Represented By: Nancy E Harris
Represented By: Victoria A Lopez
Represented By: David C Fathi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen M. Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Marin
Represented By: David E Pinchas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald D. Vitiello
Represented By: David E Pinchas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hugh J. Hurwitz
Represented By: David E Pinchas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson B. Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Shinn
Represented By: David E Pinchas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald J. Trump
Represented By: David E Pinchas
Represented By: Joanne I Osinoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III
Represented By: David E Pinchas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen Nielsen
Represented By: David E Pinchas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?