Jose F. Alfaro v. Real Value Properties, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Jose F. Alfaro
Defendant: Justin Druian, Brandon Taitz, Alan Levy, Real Value Properties, LLC, Leonard Levy, Real Value Loans, LLC and Does 1 to 20
Case Number: 5:2018cv01756
Filed: August 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Sheri Pym
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Filing 27 REPLY Reply to Opposition to Motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #20 Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Defendants Justin Druian, Alan Levy, Leonard Levy, Real Value Loans, LLC, Real Value Properties, LLC, Brandon Taitz. (Clark, Jacob)
October 11, 2018 Filing 26 OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #20 filed by Plaintiff Jose F. Alfaro. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1")(Gerges, Motaz)
October 11, 2018 Filing 25 OPPOSITION in Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #20 filed by Plaintiff Jose F. Alfaro. (Gerges, Motaz)
September 20, 2018 Filing 24 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jacob M Clark counsel for Defendants Justin Druian, Alan Levy, Leonard Levy, Real Value Loans, LLC, Real Value Properties, LLC, Brandon Taitz. Adding Jacob M. Clark as counsel of record for Real Value Properties, LLC, Real Value Loans, LLC, Alan Levy, Leonard Levy, Brandon Taitz, Justin Druian for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Real Value Properties, LLC, Real Value Loans, LLC, Alan Levy, Leonard Levy, Brandon Taitz, Justin Druian. (Attorney Jacob M Clark added to party Justin Druian(pty:dft), Attorney Jacob M Clark added to party Alan Levy(pty:dft), Attorney Jacob M Clark added to party Leonard Levy(pty:dft), Attorney Jacob M Clark added to party Real Value Loans, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jacob M Clark added to party Real Value Properties, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jacob M Clark added to party Brandon Taitz(pty:dft))(Clark, Jacob)
September 19, 2018 Filing 23 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Justin Druian, Alan Levy, Leonard Levy, Real Value Loans, LLC, Real Value Properties, LLC, Brandon Taitz, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #20 , Request for Judicial Notice, #22 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #21 and Proposed Order served on 9/19/2018. (Clark, Jacob)
September 19, 2018 Filing 22 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #20 filed by Defendants Justin Druian, Alan Levy, Leonard Levy, Real Value Loans, LLC, Real Value Properties, LLC, Brandon Taitz. (Yoo, S)
September 19, 2018 Filing 21 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Justin Druian, Alan Levy, Leonard Levy, Real Value Loans, LLC, Real Value Properties, LLC, Brandon Taitz, (Yoo, S)
September 19, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Defendants Justin Druian, Alan Levy, Leonard Levy, Real Value Loans, LLC, Real Value Properties, LLC, Brandon Taitz. Motion set for hearing on 11/1/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney S Christopher Yoo added to party Justin Druian(pty:dft), Attorney S Christopher Yoo added to party Alan Levy(pty:dft), Attorney S Christopher Yoo added to party Leonard Levy(pty:dft), Attorney S Christopher Yoo added to party Real Value Loans, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney S Christopher Yoo added to party Real Value Properties, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney S Christopher Yoo added to party Brandon Taitz(pty:dft)) (Yoo, S)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge George H. Wu for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:18-cv-01756 GW(SPx). (rn)
August 22, 2018 Filing 17 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Justin Druian. (car)
August 22, 2018 Filing 16 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Brandon Taitz. (car)
August 22, 2018 Filing 15 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Leonard Levy. (car)
August 22, 2018 Filing 14 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Alan Levy. (car)
August 22, 2018 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Real Value Loans, LLC. (car)
August 22, 2018 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Real Value Properties, LLC. (car)
August 22, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
August 22, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (car)
August 21, 2018 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Jose F. Alfaro. (Gerges, Motaz)
August 21, 2018 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Jose F. Alfaro. (Gerges, Motaz)
August 21, 2018 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Jose F. Alfaro. (Gerges, Motaz)
August 21, 2018 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Jose F. Alfaro. (Gerges, Motaz)
August 21, 2018 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Jose F. Alfaro. (Gerges, Motaz)
August 21, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Jose F. Alfaro. (Gerges, Motaz)
August 21, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jose F. Alfaro, (Gerges, Motaz)
August 21, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jose F. Alfaro. (Gerges, Motaz)
August 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22290037 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Jose F. Alfaro. (Attorney Motaz M Gerges added to party Jose F. Alfaro(pty:pla))(Gerges, Motaz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jose F. Alfaro v. Real Value Properties, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Druian
Represented By: S Christopher Yoo
Represented By: Jacob M Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Taitz
Represented By: S Christopher Yoo
Represented By: Jacob M Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Levy
Represented By: S Christopher Yoo
Represented By: Jacob M Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Value Properties, LLC
Represented By: S Christopher Yoo
Represented By: Jacob M Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard Levy
Represented By: S Christopher Yoo
Represented By: Jacob M Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Value Loans, LLC
Represented By: S Christopher Yoo
Represented By: Jacob M Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose F. Alfaro
Represented By: Motaz M Gerges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?