Gurpreet Singh v. Nielsen et al
Petitioner: Gurpreet Singh
Respondent: David Marin, Ronald D. Vitiello, David Shinn, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions and Kirstjen Nielsen
Case Number: 5:2018cv01806
Filed: August 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: R Gary Klausner
2 Judge: Christina A Snyder
3 Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF SECTION 2241 HABEAS PETITION (FILED IN LIEU OF FORM CV-09); DECLARATION OF COUNSEL filed by petitioner Gurpreet Singh. (Menninger, David)
October 15, 2018 Filing 9 MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner.The Court conferred with the parties regarding the status of the case. The Court sets a further status conference on November 14, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. Court Recorder: CS 10/15/2018. (vm)
September 24, 2018 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Aaron Kollitz counsel for Respondents David Marin, Kirstjen Nielsen, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, David Shinn, Ronald D. Vitiello. Adding AARON KOLLITZ as counsel of record for USA for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by respondents USA. (Attorney Aaron Kollitz added to party David Marin(pty:res), Attorney Aaron Kollitz added to party Kirstjen Nielsen(pty:res), Attorney Aaron Kollitz added to party Jefferson Beauregard Sessions(pty:res), Attorney Aaron Kollitz added to party David Shinn(pty:res), Attorney Aaron Kollitz added to party Ronald D. Vitiello(pty:res))(Kollitz, Aaron)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. It is hereby ORDERED that David Menninger and Elena Sadowsky of the Office of the Federal Public Defender be appointed to represent Petitioner Gurpreet Singh in the above-captioned matter. granting #2 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Appointment of Counsel (vm)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:18-cv-01568 CAS(MRW). Case transferred from Judge R. Gary Klausner to Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:18-cv-01806 CAS(MRW). Signed by Judge Christina A. Snyder (rn)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO Local Rule 83-1.3.1 and General Order 16-05 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:18-cv-01568 CAS(MRW). Case referred from Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner for 194. The case number will now read as follows: 5:18-cv-01806 RGK(MRW). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (rn)
August 27, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge R. Gary Klausner and referred to Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (et)
August 27, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Petitioner Gurpreet Singh. Related Case(s): 5:18-cv-01568-CAS (MRW); EDCV18-1569 CAS (MRW) and EDCV18-1570-CAS (MRW),(See Notice of Related Case for further details). (et)
August 27, 2018 Filing 2 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order Appointing Federal Public Defender; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Counsel; Exhibit filed by Federal Public Defender on behalf of Petitioner Gurpreet Singh. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (et)
August 27, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In Federal Custody (28:2241) Case assigned to Judge R. Gary Klausner and referred to Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (Filing fee $ 5 PAID.), filed by Petitioner Gurpreet Singh. (et)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gurpreet Singh v. Nielsen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David Marin
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Aaron Kollitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ronald D. Vitiello
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Aaron Kollitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David Shinn
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Aaron Kollitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jefferson Beauregard Sessions
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Aaron Kollitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kirstjen Nielsen
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Aaron Kollitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gurpreet Singh
Represented By: David Lee Menninger
Represented By: Elena Rose Sadowsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?