Daniel Lopez v. Halle Properties, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Lopez
Defendant: Does 1-10, Southern California Discount Tire Co., Inc. and Halle Properties, L.L.C.
Case Number: 5:2018cv01857
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2018 Filing 12 Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to November 13, 2018 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Halle Properties, L.L.C., Southern California Discount Tire Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Eaves, Melissa)
September 19, 2018 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Daniel Lopez, upon Defendant Southern California Discount Tire Co., Inc. served on 9/6/2018, answer due 10/27/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: C T CORPORATION SYSTEM in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris)
September 19, 2018 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Southern California Discount Tire Co., Inc. answer now due 10/27/2018; Halle Properties, L.L.C. answer now due 10/27/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Southern California Discount Tire Co., Inc.; Halle Properties, L.L.C..(Attorney Melissa Kooistra Eaves added to party Halle Properties, L.L.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Melissa Kooistra Eaves added to party Southern California Discount Tire Co., Inc.(pty:dft))(Eaves, Melissa)
September 11, 2018 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Daniel Lopez, upon Defendant Halle Properties, L.L.C. served on 9/6/2018, answer due 9/27/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent of Service of Process: Robert J Solis in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris)
September 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (dp)
August 31, 2018 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Halle Properties, L.L.C., Southern California Discount Tire Co., Inc. (esa)
August 31, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
August 31, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (esa)
August 31, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Daniel Lopez. (Carson, Chris)
August 31, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Daniel Lopez, (Carson, Chris)
August 31, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Daniel Lopez. (Carson, Chris)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22349044 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Daniel Lopez. (Attorney Chris Carson added to party Daniel Lopez(pty:pla))(Carson, Chris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniel Lopez v. Halle Properties, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern California Discount Tire Co., Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Kooistra Eaves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halle Properties, L.L.C.
Represented By: Melissa Kooistra Eaves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Lopez
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Chris Carson
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?