Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Health and Welfare Trust Fund et al v. The Plumbers Connections Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Trustees of the Apprentice and Journeyman Training Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Pensioners and Surviving Spouses Health Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Defined Contribution Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Vacation and Holiday Trust Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Christmas Bonus Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Retirement Trust Fund and Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund
Defendant: Gary Garcia, Jr. and The Plumbers Connections Inc.
Case Number: 5:2018cv02176
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: California Central District Court
0 Judge: Jesus G Bernal
1 Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1145
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 3, 2018 11 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato to Judge Jesus G. Bernal for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 5:18-cv-02176 JGB(SPx). (esa)
November 27, 2018 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,, #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Gary Garcia, Jr., The Plumbers Connections Inc..(Attorney E Scott Holbrook, Jr added to party Gary Garcia, Jr.(pty:dft), Attorney E Scott Holbrook, Jr added to party The Plumbers Connections Inc.(pty:dft))(Holbrook, E)
November 1, 2018 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Christmas Bonus Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Retirement Trust Fund, Trustees of the Apprentice and Journeyman Training Trust Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Pensioners and Surviving Spouses Health Fund, Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Defined Contribution Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Vacation and Holiday Trust Fund, upon Defendant Gary Garcia, Jr. served on 11/1/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Selina Ochoa - Receptionist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Moorhead, J)
November 1, 2018 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Christmas Bonus Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Retirement Trust Fund, Trustees of the Apprentice and Journeyman Training Trust Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Pensioners and Surviving Spouses Health Fund, Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Defined Contribution Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Vacation and Holiday Trust Fund, upon Defendant The Plumbers Connections Inc. served on 11/1/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Selina Ochoa - Receptionist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Moorhead, J)
October 16, 2018 7 REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (dts)
October 15, 2018 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Gary Garcia, Jr., The Plumbers Connections Inc. (car)
October 15, 2018 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (car)
October 12, 2018 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Trustees of the Apprentice and Journeyman Training Trust Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund, Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Christmas Bonus Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Defined Contribution Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Pensioners and Surviving Spouses Health Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Retirement Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Vacation and Holiday Trust Fund, (Moorhead, J)
October 12, 2018 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Trustees of the Apprentice and Journeyman Training Trust Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund, Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Christmas Bonus Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Defined Contribution Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Pensioners and Surviving Spouses Health Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Retirement Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Vacation and Holiday Trust Fund. (Moorhead, J)
October 12, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Trustees of the Apprentice and Journeyman Training Trust Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund, Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Christmas Bonus Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Defined Contribution Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Pensioners and Surviving Spouses Health Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Retirement Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Vacation and Holiday Trust Fund. (Moorhead, J)
October 12, 2018 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22569859 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Christmas Bonus Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Retirement Trust Fund, Trustees of the Apprentice and Journeyman Training Trust Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Pensioners and Surviving Spouses Health Fund, Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Defined Contribution Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Vacation and Holiday Trust Fund. (Attorney J Paul Moorhead added to party Trustees of the Apprentice and Journeyman Training Trust Fund(pty:pla), Attorney J Paul Moorhead added to party Trustees of the International Training Fund(pty:pla), Attorney J Paul Moorhead added to party Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund(pty:pla), Attorney J Paul Moorhead added to party Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Christmas Bonus Fund(pty:pla), Attorney J Paul Moorhead added to party Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Defined Contribution Trust Fund(pty:pla), Attorney J Paul Moorhead added to party Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Health and Welfare Trust Fund(pty:pla), Attorney J Paul Moorhead added to party Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Pensioners and Surviving Spouses Health Fund(pty:pla), Attorney J Paul Moorhead added to party Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Retirement Trust Fund(pty:pla), Attorney J Paul Moorhead added to party Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Vacation and Holiday Trust Fund(pty:pla))(Moorhead, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Health and Welfare Trust Fund et al v. The Plumbers Connections Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Apprentice and Journeyman Training Trust Fund
Represented By: J Paul Moorhead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Pensioners and Surviving Spouses Health Fund
Represented By: J Paul Moorhead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Defined Contribution Trust Fund
Represented By: J Paul Moorhead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Health and Welfare Trust Fund
Represented By: J Paul Moorhead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Vacation and Holiday Trust Fund
Represented By: J Paul Moorhead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the International Training Fund
Represented By: J Paul Moorhead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Christmas Bonus Fund
Represented By: J Paul Moorhead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Southern California Pipe Trades Retirement Trust Fund
Represented By: J Paul Moorhead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund
Represented By: J Paul Moorhead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Garcia, Jr.
Represented By: E Scott Holbrook, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Plumbers Connections Inc.
Represented By: E Scott Holbrook, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?