Leandro Ascencio v. Arrow Financial Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Leandro Ascencio
Defendant: Arrow Financial Services, LLC and DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2018cv02412
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Referring Judge: Consuelo B Marshall
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND MAY DIFFER IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (see document for further details) (bm)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Consuelo B. Marshall for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:18-cv-2412 CBM (KKx). (esa)
November 19, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #8 . The following error(s) was found: Missing summons form for US District Court, Pdf is only partial state court form which cannot be issued by the clerk. Missing official case number as: 5:18-cv-02412-CAS-KK. Obtain form on court's website.. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lc)
November 19, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document #7 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice: Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties. Other error(s) with document(s): Note: To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
November 16, 2018 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Miscellaneous Document #7 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #6 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Leandro Ascencio. (Mesaros, Christopher)
November 16, 2018 Filing 7 Notice of Interested Parties re: Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #6 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 (Mesaros, Christopher)
November 16, 2018 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Leandro Ascencio. (Mesaros, Christopher)
November 16, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (jtil)
November 15, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
November 15, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (jtil)
November 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22739573 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Leandro Ascencio. (Attorney Christopher Paul Mesaros added to party Leandro Ascencio(pty:pla))(Mesaros, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leandro Ascencio v. Arrow Financial Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leandro Ascencio
Represented By: Christopher Paul Mesaros
Represented By: Eric Arthur Forstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arrow Financial Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?