Max Blu Technologies, LLC v. AVIC UMEDISC US, Inc.
Plaintiff: Max Blu Technologies, LLC
Defendant: AVIC UMEDISC (US), Inc. and AVIC UMEDISC US, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2018cv02431
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Filing 15 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REGARDING TRANSFER OF CASE TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A. Kronstadt: This action has been reassigned to the Honorable John A. Kronstadt, United States District Judge. The case number will now read: ED CV18-02431 JAK (RAOx). Because all pleadings are routed using the judge's initials, please be sure to use the initials JAK in place of the initials PSG on all future filings. Judge Kronstadt's Courtroom Deputy Clerk, Andrea Keifer, can be reached at 213.894.2156. #12 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 27, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James F. McDonough to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Max Blu Technologies, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22789904) #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed (lt)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:17-cv-08008 JAK (RAOx). Case transferred from Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato to Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:18-cv-02431 JAK (RAOx). Signed by Judge John A. Kronstadt (esa)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
November 26, 2018 Filing 10 EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James F. McDonough to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Max Blu Technologies, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22789904) filed by Plaintiff Max Blu Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Ritcheson, Steven)
November 20, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney James F. McDonough, III. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
November 20, 2018 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant AVIC UMEDISC US, Inc. (jtil)
November 20, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
November 20, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (jtil)
November 16, 2018 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Max Blu Technologies, LLC. (Ritcheson, Steven)
November 16, 2018 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Max Blu Technologies, LLC. (Ritcheson, Steven)
November 16, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Max Blu Technologies, LLC identifying Max Blu Technologies, LLC as Corporate Parent. (Ritcheson, Steven)
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Max Blu Technologies, LLC. (Ritcheson, Steven)
November 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22756786 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Max Blu Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit) (Attorney Steven W Ritcheson added to party Max Blu Technologies, LLC (pty:pla))(Ritcheson, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Max Blu Technologies, LLC v. AVIC UMEDISC US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVIC UMEDISC (US), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVIC UMEDISC US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Max Blu Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Steven W Ritcheson
Represented By: James F McDonough, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?