Janos Hamori v. United States Postal Service

Plaintiff: Janos Hamori
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Case Number: 5:2018cv02466
Filed: November 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER by Judge George H. Wu. To determine whether Plaintiff explicitly consents to dismissing this action, the Court would order that the parties appear on January 28, 2019 at 8:30 am. If Plaintiff fails to show up, the Court will consider Plaintiff's representations in his filing as explicit consent to the dismissal of this action. If Plaintiff does appear and echoes his wish to dismiss his own action, the Court would of course oblige. (lom)
January 4, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant United States Postal Service, re Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan #12 served on 1/4/2019. (Park, Grace)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge George H. Wu re: #7 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Dismiss ; and #11 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay Case. The Court denies without prejudice Defendant's Ex Parte Application for a Stay of the Entire Case Due to the Lapse of Appropriations, Docket No. 11, and it orders Plaintiff to file a response to the Motion to Dismiss, Docket No. 7 by no later than January 18, 2019 at noon. (mrgo)
January 3, 2019 Filing 12 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 0.5 days, filed by Defendant United States Postal Service.. (Park, Grace)
January 2, 2019 Filing 11 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay Case pending DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A STAY OF THE ENTIRE CASE DUE TO THE LAPSE OF APPROPRIATIONS; [PROPOSED] ORDER AND DECLARATION OF GRACE Y. PARK filed by Defendant United States Postal Service. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service) (Park, Grace)
December 21, 2018 Filing 10 REPLY in support of Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed by Defendant United States Postal Service. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Park, Grace)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. (Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/3/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 1/10/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (mrgo)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo)
November 30, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by defendant United States Postal Service. Motion set for hearing on 1/10/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Herbst, #2 Declaration of Park, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Proof of Service) (Park, Grace)
November 28, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed by defendant United States Postal Service. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Herbst, #2 Declaration G. Park, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Proof of Service)(Park, Grace)
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant United States Postal Service. (Park, Grace)
November 26, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (car)
November 26, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
November 26, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 16-05, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge George H. Wu. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:18-CV-02466 GW (SHKx). (car)
November 21, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF SMALL CLAIMS COURT COMPLAINT against Defendant United States Postal Service, filed by plaintiff Janos Hamori. Filed in State Court on 9/14/18 Submitted with attachment 1 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) Modified on 11/26/2018 (car).
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino, case number SMCBS1801738 No Fee Required - US Government, filed by defendant United States Postal Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Proof of Service) (Attorney Grace Y Park added to party United States Postal Service(pty:dft))(Park, Grace)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Janos Hamori v. United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Represented By: Grace Y Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janos Hamori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?