Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P. v. I-10 Towing and Recovery, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P.
Defendant: I-10 Towing and Recovery, Inc., Department of Motor Vehicles State of California and Does 1 through 22, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2018cv02547
Filed: December 4, 2018
Court: California Central District Court
0 Judge: Jesus G Bernal
1 Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 20 APPLICATION for Default Judgment against Defendant I-10 Towing and Recovery, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P.. Application set for hearing on 2/25/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Application for Entry of Default Judgment, #2 Declaration of Nicholas D. Brauns in Support of Application for Entry of Default Judgment, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Nicholas D. Brauns, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Nicholas D. Brauns, #5 Exhibit C to Declaration of Nicholas D. Brauns, #6 Declaration of Art Narmi in Support of Application for Entry of Default Judgment, #7 Exhibit A to Declaration of Art Narmi, #8 Exhibit B to Declaration of Art Narmi, #9 Exhibit C to Declaration of Art Narmi, #10 Exhibit D to Declaration of Art Narmi, #11 Exhibit E to Declaration of Art Narmi, #12 Exhibit F to Declaration of Art Narmi, #13 Exhibit G to Declaration of Art Narmi, #14 Proposed Judgment on Application for Entry of Default Judgment, #15 Proof of Service) (Brauns, Nicholas)
January 9, 2019 19 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to I-10 Towing and Recovery Inc, a California corporation. (ad)
January 8, 2019 18 Amended APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant I-10 Towing and Recovery, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P.. Application set for hearing on 2/11/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proof of Service) (Brauns, Nicholas)
January 8, 2019 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P., upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon I-10 Towing and Recovery, Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brauns, Nicholas)
January 4, 2019 16 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: Amended APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant I-10 Towing and Recovery, Inc. #15 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: Proof of Service is lacking required information. Proof of service summons and complaint (no address shown for service of the proof). The Business Search shows Agent for Service of Process which is not the person named in the proof of service (Agent for Service of Process). Requesting party shall file a new Request/Application with noted deficiencies corrected in order to have default reconsidered. (twdb)
January 3, 2019 15 Amended APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant I-10 Towing and Recovery, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P.. Application set for hearing on 2/4/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Amended Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proof of Service) (Brauns, Nicholas)
January 3, 2019 14 APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant I-10 Towing and Recovery, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P.. Application set for hearing on 2/4/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proof of Service) (Brauns, Nicholas)
December 17, 2018 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P., upon Defendant Department of Motor Vehicles State of California served on 12/7/2018, answer due 12/28/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Juan Jarrett in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Brauns, Nicholas)
December 17, 2018 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P., upon Defendant I-10 Towing and Recovery, Inc. served on 12/7/2018, answer due 12/28/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jose Fuentes (Manager) in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Brauns, Nicholas)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order 11 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
December 6, 2018 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendants Department of Motor Vehicles State of California, I-10 Towing and Recovery, Inc. (iva)
December 5, 2018 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P.. (Brauns, Nicholas)
December 4, 2018 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #3 . The following error(s) was found: Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendants name must appear in the To:section of the summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (et)
December 4, 2018 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
December 4, 2018 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (et)
December 4, 2018 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P., (Brauns, Nicholas)
December 4, 2018 4 **CIVIL COVER SHEET filed as NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P., (Brauns, Nicholas) Modified on 12/4/2018 (et).
December 4, 2018 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P.. (Brauns, Nicholas)
December 4, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P.. (Brauns, Nicholas)
December 4, 2018 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22838866 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3) (Attorney Nicholas Dmitri Brauns added to party Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P.(pty:pla))(Brauns, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P. v. I-10 Towing and Recovery, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I-10 Towing and Recovery, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Motor Vehicles State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 22, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P.
Represented By: Edwin M Boniske
Represented By: Nicholas Dmitri Brauns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?