Marcos Martinez-Sanchez v. Kirstjen Nielsen et al
Petitioner: Marco Martinez-Sanchez
Respondent: David Marin, Gabriel Valdez, Warden, Matthew Whitaker and Kirstjen Nielsen
Case Number: 5:2018cv02592
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian re: NOTICE OF TENTATIVE RULING; AND (2) ORDER DIRECTING RESPONDENT'S COUNSEL TO MAKE INQUIRY RE DISCOVERY CONTEMPLATED BY SAME #12 . (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (klg)
February 5, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO AUTHORIZE DISCOVERY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by Petitioner Marco Martinez-Sanchez. (Menninger, David)
January 29, 2019 Filing 15 OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for TO AUTHORIZE DISCOVERY #12 filed by Respondents David Marin, Kirstjen Nielsen, Gabriel Valdez, Matthew Whitaker. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Kollitz, Aaron)
January 28, 2019 Filing 14 OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for HOLDING MERITS IN ABEYANCE PENDING DISCOVERY MOTION #13 filed by Respondents David Marin, Kirstjen Nielsen, Gabriel Valdez, Matthew Whitaker. (Kollitz, Aaron)
January 25, 2019 Filing 13 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for HOLDING MERITS IN ABEYANCE PENDING DISCOVERY MOTION filed by Petitioner Marco Martinez-Sanchez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Menninger, David)
January 22, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for TO AUTHORIZE DISCOVERY filed by Petitioner Marco Martinez-Sanchez. Motion set for hearing on 2/12/2019 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B, #2 Proposed Order) (Menninger, David)
January 11, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN filed by respondents David Marin, Kirstjen Nielsen, Gabriel Valdez, Matthew Whitaker. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Kollitz, Aaron)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING RESPONDENTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STAY CASE (DOCKET NO. #7 ) by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. Respondents' Answer remains due by January 11, 2019. (See document for details.) (sbou)
January 4, 2019 Filing 9 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay Case pending THE LAPSE OF APPROPRIATIONS #7 filed by Petitioner Marco Martinez-Sanchez. (Menninger, David)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) DIRECTING PETITIONER TO FILE RESPONSE TORESPONDENTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STAY CASE by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioner shall file a response to Respondents' Ex ParteApplication for a Stay of the Entire Case Due to the Lapse of Appropriations by not later thanJanuary 7, 2019. #7 (klg)
December 26, 2018 Filing 7 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay Case pending THE LAPSE OF APPROPRIATIONS filed by respondents David Marin, Kirstjen Nielsen, Gabriel Valdez, Matthew Whitaker. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kollitz, Aaron)
December 26, 2018 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Aaron Kollitz counsel for Respondents David Marin, Kirstjen Nielsen, Gabriel Valdez, Matthew Whitaker. Adding Aaron Kollitz as counsel of record for USA for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by respondents USA. (Attorney Aaron Kollitz added to party David Marin(pty:res), Attorney Aaron Kollitz added to party Kirstjen Nielsen(pty:res), Attorney Aaron Kollitz added to party Gabriel Valdez(pty:res), Attorney Aaron Kollitz added to party Matthew Whitaker(pty:res))(Kollitz, Aaron)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING ANSWER TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. that Respondents file Answer to the Petition not later than 12/11/2018. Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the United States Attorneys Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (See document for details.) (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (sbou)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: granting #2 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Appointment of Counsel appointing David Menninger for petitioner Marcos Tulio Martinez-Sanchez. (sbou)
December 13, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (et)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order Appointing Federal Public Defender; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Counsel; Exhibits filed by Federal Public Defender on behalf of Petitioner Marco Martinez-Sanchez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (et)
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In Federal Custody (28:2241); Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Exhibits. Case assigned to Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (Filing fee $ 5 PAID.), filed by Petitioner Marco Martinez-Sanchez. (et)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marcos Martinez-Sanchez v. Kirstjen Nielsen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David Marin
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Aaron Kollitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gabriel Valdez
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Aaron Kollitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew Whitaker
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Aaron Kollitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kirstjen Nielsen
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Aaron Kollitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marco Martinez-Sanchez
Represented By: David Lee Menninger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?