Navin Kumar Sharma v. Nancy A. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Navin Kumar Sharma
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 5:2018cv02676
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver for all further proceedings. Please use the case number EDCV18-2676 RAO on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
January 30, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Navin Kumar Sharma. (Kuntz, William)
January 29, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attorney In Seon Jeong added to party Nancy A. Berryhill(pty:dft))(Jeong, In)
January 21, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Navin Kumar Sharma, upon Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 1/7/2019, answer due 5/7/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to G. Ortega, Title Unknown,. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Carley Sase, Title Unknown,. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Yania Llamas, Title Unknown, on behalf of General Counsel. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. Case Management Orders were also served along with Complaint Documents (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipts)(Kuntz, William)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. Plaintiff will promptly serve the summons and complaint on the government in accordance with Rule 4(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Plaintiff will file1 an appropriate proof of service within 30 days of the date of this Order. Government counsel must file a notice of appearance within 30 days of service of the action. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (dml)
January 2, 2019 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (dml)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver: granting #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (dml)
December 28, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and referred to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (et)
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Navin Kumar Sharma. (Kuntz, William)
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Navin Kumar Sharma, identifying United States of America and Social Security Administration. (Kuntz, William)
December 28, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Navin Kumar Sharma. (Kuntz, William)
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Navin Kumar Sharma. (Kuntz, William)
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Navin Kumar Sharma. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney William M Kuntz added to party Navin Kumar Sharma(pty:pla))(Kuntz, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Navin Kumar Sharma v. Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Navin Kumar Sharma
Represented By: William M Kuntz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: In Seon Jeong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?