Latoya Hill v. Duvera Billing Services, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Latoya Hill
Defendant: Does 1-25, Duvera Billing Systems, LLC, Duvera Billing Services, LLC and John Does
Case Number: 5:2019cv00062
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
0 Judge: Cormac J Carney
1 Judge: Sheri Pym
2 Judge: Christina A Snyder
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Duvera Billing Systems, LLC answer now due 3/11/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Duvera Billing Systems, LLC.(Attorney Ramin Ray Mahdavi added to party Duvera Billing Systems, LLC(pty:dft))(Mahdavi, Ramin)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Cormac J. Carney for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:19-cv-00062 CJC(SPx). (rn)
January 10, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Duvera Billing Systems, LLC. (et)
January 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (et)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Latoya Hill. (Stieglitz, Jonathan)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Latoya Hill, identifying Latoya Hill, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated. (Stieglitz, Jonathan)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Latoya Hill. (Stieglitz, Jonathan)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23018763 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Latoya Hill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Attorney Jonathan Aaron Stieglitz added to party Latoya Hill(pty:pla))(Stieglitz, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Latoya Hill v. Duvera Billing Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latoya Hill
Represented By: Jonathan Aaron Stieglitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duvera Billing Systems, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duvera Billing Services, LLC
Represented By: Harvey M Moore
Represented By: Ramin Ray Mahdavi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?