Anita Kay Virden v. Nancy A. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Anita Kay Virden
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security and Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 5:2019cv00063
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver for all further proceedings. Please use the case number EDCV19-63 RAO on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
February 20, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attorney Amanda Schapel added to party Nancy A. Berryhill(pty:dft))(Schapel, Amanda)
January 28, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), (Holmberg, Matthew)
January 28, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Anita Kay Virden, upon Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 1/22/2019, answer due 5/22/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Holmberg, Matthew)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. Plaintiff will promptly serve the summons and complaint on the government in accordance with Rule 4(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Plaintiff will file1 an appropriate proof of service within 30 days of the date of this Order. Government counsel must file a notice of appearance within 30 days of service of the action. See Order for details. (dml)
January 15, 2019 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (dml)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver: granting #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (dml)
January 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and referred to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (ghap)
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Anita Kay Virden, (Holmberg, Matthew)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Anita Kay Virden. (Holmberg, Matthew)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Anita Kay Virden. (Holmberg, Matthew)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Anita Kay Virden. (Holmberg, Matthew)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Anita Kay Virden. (Attorney Matthew Franklin Holmberg added to party Anita Kay Virden(pty:pla))(Holmberg, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anita Kay Virden v. Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Kay Virden
Represented By: Matthew Franklin Holmberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Amanda Schapel
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?