Luis Licea, et al v. J and P Acquisitions, Inc., et al

Plaintiff: Luis Licea and Dominick Martin
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive and J and Park Acquisitions, Inc.
Petitioner: Dominick Martinez and J&P Park Acquisitions
Case Number: 5:2019cv00068
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Referring Judge: Manuel L Real
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 14 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3-4 days, filed by Plaintiffs Luis Licea, Dominick Martin.. (Ferrell, Scott)
March 4, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to San Bernardino Superior Court #10 filed by Plaintiffs Luis Licea, Dominick Martin. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of S. Ferrell, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Declaration of D. Reid)(Ferrell, Scott)
February 25, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant J and Park Acquisitions, Inc., re MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion,, #11 served on 2/25/19. (Buddingh, Jan)
February 25, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to San Bernardino Superior Court #10 filed by Defendant J and Park Acquisitions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of J Buddingh, Jr. In Support Opposition to Motion to Remand Action, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Jan Buddingh, Jr. In Support Opposition to Motion to Remand Action, #3 Declaration Declaration of Roger Mansukhani in Support of Opposition to Motion to Remand Action, #4 Declaration Declaration of Jillian Fairchild In Support Opposition to Motion to Remand Action)(Buddingh, Jan)
February 11, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to San Bernardino Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Luis Licea, Dominick Martin. Motion set for hearing on 3/18/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit 1 to RFJN, #4 Exhibit 2 to RFJN, #5 Exhibit 3 to RFJN, #6 Exhibit 4 to RFJN, #7 Proposed Order) (Ferrell, Scott)
January 25, 2019 Filing 9 Text Only Notice Re Due Date of Early Meeting Report/Joint Rule 26(f) Report. Pursuant to the Court's Order Re: Notice to Counsel, the early meeting report/joint rule 26(f) report is due on or before March 8, 2019. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cch) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Manuel L. Real. READ CAREFULLY - FAILURE TO COMPLY MAY LEAD TO SANCTIONS. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (cch)
January 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato to Judge Manuel L. Real for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 5:19-cv-00068 R(SHKx). (rn)
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant J and Park Acquisitions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Fairchild, Jillian)
January 15, 2019 Filing 5 REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (dts)
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): The Civil Cover Sheet and Notice of Interested Parties are attached to the Notice of Removal. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (esa)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (esa)
January 10, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does 1-10, inclusive, J and Park Acquisitions, Inc., Jury Demand, filed by plaintiffs Luis Licea, Dominick Martin. (Filed in state court 12/10/18, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant J&P Park Acquisitions, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 served on 1/10/19. (Buddingh, Jan)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of CA San Bernardino, case number CIVDS1831901 Receipt No: 0973-23025250 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant J&P Park Acquisitions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ISO Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit ISO Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate of Interested Parties, #5 Declaration of Jan Buddingh Jr ISO Notice of Removal, #6 Defendant's Notice of Removal to Federal Court) (Attorney Jan K Buddingh, Jr added to party J&P Park Acquisitions(pty:bkmov))(Buddingh, Jan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luis Licea, et al v. J and P Acquisitions, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dominick Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: J&P Park Acquisitions
Represented By: Jan K Buddingh, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Licea
Represented By: Scott J Ferrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominick Martin
Represented By: Scott J Ferrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J and Park Acquisitions, Inc.
Represented By: Jan K Buddingh, Jr
Represented By: Jillian Marie Fairchild
Represented By: Roger M Mansukhani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?