Luis Ramirez v. Charter Communications, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Luis Ramirez
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, inclusive, Charter Communications, LLC and Charter Communications Holding Company, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00108
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
0 Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
1 Judge: Manuel L Real
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ONLY SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real, The Court has determined that Motion to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Luis Ramirez #10 set for hearing on March 18, 2019 at 10:00 A.M. is suitable for a decision on the papers as filed by all parties without the need for oral argument. Therefore, the said motion is taken UNDER SUBMISSION on the papers as filed and the hearing date of March 18, 2019 is VACATED and TAKEN OFF CALENDAR. The Court will issue its ruling on the matter in due course. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dbu) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 13, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kathryn Teresa McGuigan counsel for Defendants Charter Communications Holding Company, LLC, Charter Communications, LLC. Lisa M. Rodriguez is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Charter Communications, LLC and Charter Communications Holding Company, LLC. (McGuigan, Kathryn)
March 13, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kathryn Teresa McGuigan counsel for Defendants Charter Communications Holding Company, LLC, Charter Communications, LLC. Adding Nicole L. Antonopoulos as counsel of record for Charter Communications, LLC and Charter Communications Holding Company, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Charter Communications, LLC and Charter Communications Holding Company, LLC. (McGuigan, Kathryn)
March 13, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY In Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court #10 filed by Plaintiff Luis Ramirez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nicole Pierson re: Late Filing of Reply)(Swift, Michael)
February 25, 2019 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Kathryn T. McGuigan in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court #10 filed by Defendants Charter Communications Holding Company, LLC, Charter Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - 02.07.19 email from Plaintiff's counsel, #3 Exhibit C1 - Redline First Amended Complaint to Complaint 02.19.19, #4 Exhibit C2 - Redline First Amended Complaint to Complaint 02.19.19)(McGuigan, Kathryn)
February 25, 2019 Filing 11 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court #10 filed by Defendants Charter Communications Holding Company, LLC, Charter Communications, LLC. (McGuigan, Kathryn)
February 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Luis Ramirez. Motion set for hearing on 3/18/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Swift in support of Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Michael Swift, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Michael Swift, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Michael Swift, #5 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Remand) (Swift, Michael)
February 1, 2019 Filing 9 SCHEDULING NOTICE RE: DUE DATE OF EARLY MEETING REPORT/JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT by Judge Manuel L. Real. The early meeting report/joint rule 26(f) report is due on or before April 1, 2019. Counsel shall comply with the rules set forth in the Court's Order Re: Notice to Counsel, Local Rules, and Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cch) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Manuel L. Real. READ CAREFULLY - FAILURE TO COMPLY MAY LEAD TO SANCTIONS. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (cch)
January 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 16-05, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Manuel L. Real. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:19-cv-00108 R (SHKx). (esa)
January 18, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendants Charter Communications Holding Company, LLC, Charter Communications, LLC. (Filed in state court 1/17/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 3)(esa)
January 18, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Charter Communications Holding Company, LLC, Charter Communications, LLC, Does 1 through 50, inclusive, Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Luis Ramirez. (Filed in state court 11/9/18, submitted as document 1, attachment 2) (esa)
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Charter Communications Holding Company, LLC, Charter Communications, LLC, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Related Case(s) #3 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #5 served on January 18, 2019. (McGuigan, Kathryn)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 Defendants' NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Charter Communications Holding Company, LLC, Charter Communications, LLC, identifying Charter Communications, LLC; Charter Communications Holding Company, LLC; Charter Communications, Inc.. (McGuigan, Kathryn)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Charter Communications Holding Company, LLC, Charter Communications, LLC identifying Charter Communications, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (McGuigan, Kathryn)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants Charter Communications Holding Company, LLC, Charter Communications, LLC. (McGuigan, Kathryn)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Charter Communications Holding Company, LLC, Charter Communications, LLC. (McGuigan, Kathryn)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside Superior Court, case number RIC 1823755 Receipt No: 0973-23066362 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Charter Communications Holding Company, LLC, Charter Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Attorney Kathryn Teresa McGuigan added to party Charter Communications Holding Company, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Kathryn Teresa McGuigan added to party Charter Communications, LLC(pty:dft))(McGuigan, Kathryn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luis Ramirez v. Charter Communications, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Communications, LLC
Represented By: Kathryn Teresa McGuigan
Represented By: Lisa Marie Rodriguez
Represented By: Nicole L Antonopoulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Communications Holding Company, LLC
Represented By: Kathryn Teresa McGuigan
Represented By: Lisa Marie Rodriguez
Represented By: Nicole L Antonopoulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Ramirez
Represented By: Kevin Mahoney
Represented By: Michael Andre Swift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?