Tonika Nadine Cora v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Tonika Nadine Cora
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo & Company, Does 1 through 10, inclusive and Wells Fargo and Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv00109
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
0 Judge: Terry J Hatter
1 Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Justin F Marquez counsel for Plaintiff Tonika Nadine Cora. Justin F. Marquez is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Tonika Nadine Cora. (Marquez, Justin)
February 28, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Allen Victor Feghali counsel for Plaintiff Tonika Nadine Cora. Adding H. Scott Leviant as counsel of record for Tonika Nadine Cora for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Tonika Nadine Cora. (Feghali, Allen)
January 28, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo and Company, re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,, #10 , Order,,, Set/Reset Hearing,, #11 served on January 28, 2019. (Frazier, Brianna)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING FINAL PRE=TRIAL CONFERENCE AND REFERRING DISCOVERY by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr. It is Ordered that all discovery matters which become at issue are referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for her consideration. Please contact the courtroom deputy clerk to the Magistrate Judge regarding these matters.It is Ordered, pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures andLocal Rule 16, that the Final Pre-Trial Conference is placed on the Courts calendar for APRIL 15, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom No. 9B in the U. S. Courthouse on First Street.See order for further details. (shb)
January 25, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE IN CHAMBERS -NEW CASE BEFORE JUDGE HATTER. COUNSEL: READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. This action has been assigned to the calendar of the HONORABLE TERRY J. HATTER, JR., United States District Judge. Please include the initials TJH in all documents pertaining to this case, as documents are routed using the judges initials, it is imperative that the correct initials TJH be used on all subsequent filings to prevent any delays in the processing of documents.Counsel shall not attempt to contact the Court or its chambers staff by telephone or by any other ex parte means, although counsel may contact the Courtroom Deputy, Yolanda Skipper, at: yolanda_skipper@cacd.uscourts.gov, with appropriate inquiries. She can be reached at (213) 894-5276. Judge Hatters courtroom is located on the 9th Floor, 350 W. 1st Street, United States Courthouse, Courtroom No. 9B. Additional information about Judge Hatters procedures and schedules can be found on the courts website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. See order for further details. (shb)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 16-05 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Case transferred from Judge Stephen V. Wilson to the calendar of Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 5:19-cv-00109 TJH(SPx). (rn)
January 22, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo and Company, re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #7 , Notice of Reassignment of Eastern Division Removal Case (CV-106) - optional html form, #6 served on January 22, 2019. (Frazier, Brianna)
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 16-05, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:19-cv-00109 SVW (SPx). (lh)
January 18, 2019 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant Wells Fargo and Company. #1 [SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL](lh)
January 18, 2019 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. [SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL](lh)
January 18, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Defendants Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo and Company, Does 1 through 10. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Tonika Nadine Cora. #1 [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 12/03/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL] (lh)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Request for Judicial Notice, #4 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on January 18, 2019. (Frazier, Brianna)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE In Support of Defendants Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s and Wells Fargo & Company's Notice of Removal of Action to United States District Court Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1332(d) and 1441 (Diversity) filed by Defendants Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Frazier, Brianna)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement and Notice of Interested Parties NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., identifying 1. Tonika Nadine Cora (Plaintiff); 2. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Defendant); 3. Wells Fargo & Company (Defendant); 4. Berkshire Hathaway Inc. owns ten percent (10%) or more of Wells Fargo & Companys stock. (Frazier, Brianna)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Frazier, Brianna)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino County Superior Court, case number CIVDS1831504 Receipt No: 0973-23066566 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attorney Brianna Leigh Frazier added to party Wells Fargo & Company(pty:dft), Attorney Brianna Leigh Frazier added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:dft))(Frazier, Brianna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tonika Nadine Cora v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Brianna Leigh Frazier
Represented By: Theresa A Kading
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Company
Represented By: Brianna Leigh Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo and Company
Represented By: Brianna Leigh Frazier
Represented By: Theresa A Kading
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonika Nadine Cora
Represented By: Kane Moon
Represented By: Justin F Marquez
Represented By: Allen Victor Feghali
Represented By: Howard Scott Leviant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?