Noel Salazar v. PODS Enterprises, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Noel Salazar
Defendant: DOES 1 through 50, inclusive and PODS Enterprises, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00260
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Filing 20 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to San Bernardino Superior Court #17 filed by Defendant PODS Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Laureen Druker, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Raquel Ramirez Jefferson, #3 Exhibit C - Fee Affidavits)(Russell, Reed)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING RELIEF FROM LOCAL RULE 23-3 #18 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff is relieved of the requirements in Local Rule 23-3. (iv)
April 4, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION for Relief from Local Rule 23-3 filed by Plaintiff Noel Salazar. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Rita Leong, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Leong, Rita)
March 11, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to San Bernardino Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Noel Salazar. Motion set for hearing on 4/29/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Rita Leong, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service) (Leong, Rita)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO VACATE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND ALL ASSOCIATED DEADLINES #15 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Court, having reviewed the Stipulation to Vacate Scheduling Conference and All Associated Deadlines and the Declaration of Rita Leong in support of the Stipulation and, for good cause shown, VACATES the Scheduling Conference currently scheduled for April 1, 2019. The Court will reschedule the Scheduling Conference and all associated deadlines if Plaintiffs Motion to Remand is denied. (iv)
March 6, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION to Vacate Scheduling Conference and all Associated Deadlines Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only, #14 filed by Plaintiff Noel Salazar. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Rita Leong, #2 Proposed Order)(Leong, Rita)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This case has been assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. This matter is set for a scheduling conference on 4/1/2019 at 11:00 AM. (iv)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Raquel R. Jefferson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant PODS Enterprises, LLC, designating David R. Krause-Leemon as local counsel #10 . (iv)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Reed L. Russell to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant PODS Enterprises, LLC, designating David R. Krause-Leemon as local counsel #9 . (iv)
February 14, 2019 Filing 11 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by plaintiff Noel Salazar.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Leong, Rita)
February 13, 2019 Filing 10 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Raquel R. Jefferson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant PODS Enterprises, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23204941) filed by Defendant PODS Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Jefferson, Raquel to appear pro hac vice) (Krause-Leemon, David)
February 13, 2019 Filing 9 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Reed L. Russell to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant PODS Enterprises, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23204773) filed by Defendant PODS Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Russell Reed to appear pro hac vice) (Krause-Leemon, David)
February 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Raquel R. Jefferson. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
February 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Reed L. Russell. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 16-05, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:19-cv-00260 MWF (KKx). (lh)
February 8, 2019 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant PODS Enterprises, LLC.(lh) [SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL]
February 8, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants PODS Enterprises, LLC, Does 1 through 50. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Noel Salazar. #1 [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/08/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL] (lh)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant PODS Enterprises, LLC identifying PODS, LLC as Corporate Parent. (Land, Jolee)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant PODS Enterprises, LLC, (Land, Jolee)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant PODS Enterprises, LLC. (Land, Jolee)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of San Bernardino County, case number CIVDS1900240 Receipt No: 0973-23182345 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant PODS Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Answer, #3 Exhibit C - Other State Court Filings, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Laureen Druker) (Attorney Jolee Land added to party PODS Enterprises, LLC(pty:dft))(Land, Jolee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noel Salazar v. PODS Enterprises, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noel Salazar
Represented By: Rita Leong
Represented By: Graham S P Hollis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PODS Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Jolee Land
Represented By: Reed L Russell
Represented By: Raquel R Jefferson
Represented By: David R Krause-Leemon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?