United Parcel Service, Inc. et al v. Brendon Kennedy et al

Plaintiff: United Parcel Service of America, Inc., a Delaware Corporation, United Parcel Service, Inc. (Delaware), United Parcel Service, Inc. and United Parcel Service of America, Inc.
Defendant: Mayumi Kennedy, Brendon Kennedy, UPS420, United Pot Smokers, THCPlant and Does 1-10
Case Number: 5:2019cv00284
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Court orders Plaintiffs to show cause why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. In response to this Order to Show Cause, the Court will accept the following no later than April 16, 2019: BY DEFENDANTS: RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT OR BY PLAINTIFFS: DEFAULT APPLICATION. Failure to respond to the Order to Show Cause will result in the dismissal of this action. (iv)
March 8, 2019 Filing 20 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: Defendants and their agents, servants, employees, and attorneys, and any other persons who are in active concert or participation with Defendants, who receive actual notice of this Preliminary Injunction through personal service or otherwise, are PRELIMINARILY ENJOINED pending the final hearing and determination of this action. (iv)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION #12 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The OSC is not discharged. A separate Preliminary Injunction will issue. The Clerk is ORDERED to mail a copy of this Order and the Preliminary Injunction to Defendants at 8774 Bajado Court, Rancho Cucamonga, California 91730. (iv)
March 7, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Defendant Brendon Kennedy. (iv)
March 7, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTES OF HEARING RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION held before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Court hears from counsel and the defendant. For reasons stated on the record, preliminary injunction will issue. Separate orders will issue. Court Reporter: Amy Diaz. (iv)
February 27, 2019 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff United Parcel Service, Inc., United Parcel Service of America, Inc., upon Defendant Mayumi Kennedy served on 2/22/2019, answer due 3/15/2019. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Taylor, Jennifer)
February 27, 2019 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff United Parcel Service, Inc., United Parcel Service of America, Inc., upon Defendant United Pot Smokers served on 2/24/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Taylor, Jennifer)
February 27, 2019 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff United Parcel Service, Inc., United Parcel Service of America, Inc., upon Defendant UPS420 served on 2/24/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Taylor, Jennifer)
February 27, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff United Parcel Service, Inc., United Parcel Service of America, Inc., upon Defendant THCPlant served on 2/24/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Taylor, Jennifer)
February 27, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff United Parcel Service, Inc., United Parcel Service of America, Inc., upon Defendant Brendon Kennedy served on 2/21/2019, answer due 3/14/2019. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Due Diligence, #2 Affidavit of Due Diligence)(Taylor, Jennifer)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION #5 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Application is DENIED in part and GRANTED in part. The request for a TRO is denied. The request for the OSC is granted. UPS is ORDERED to serve the Application and this Order on Defendants Brendon Kennedy, Mayumi Kennedy, United Pot Smokers, UPS420, and THCPlant by Friday, February 22, 2019. Defendant shall file the response to the OSC by Thursday, February 28, 2019; UPS may file an optional reply by Monday, March 4, 2019; The hearing on the OSC shall be held on Thursday, March 7, 2019, at 3:00 p.m (iv)
February 14, 2019 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 as to Defendant Brendon Kennedy. (ghap)
February 14, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
February 14, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (ghap)
February 13, 2019 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Niles A. Pierson in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Regarding Preliminary Injunction #5 filed by Plaintiffs United Parcel Service of America, Inc., a Delaware Corporation, United Parcel Service, Inc. (Delaware). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 54, #2 Exhibit 55)(Taylor, Jennifer)
February 13, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Wendy Ray in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Regarding Preliminary Injunction #5 filed by Plaintiffs United Parcel Service of America, Inc., a Delaware Corporation, United Parcel Service, Inc. (Delaware). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 20, #2 Exhibit 21, #3 Exhibit 22, #4 Exhibit 23, #5 Exhibit 24, #6 Exhibit 25, #7 Exhibit 26, #8 Exhibit 27, #9 Exhibit 28, #10 Exhibit 29, #11 Exhibit 30, #12 Exhibit 31, #13 Exhibit 32, #14 Exhibit 33, #15 Exhibit 34, #16 Exhibit 35, #17 Exhibit 36, #18 Exhibit 37, #19 Exhibit 38, #20 Exhibit 39, #21 Exhibit 40, #22 Exhibit 41, #23 Exhibit 42, #24 Exhibit 43, #25 Exhibit 44, #26 Exhibit 45, #27 Exhibit 46, #28 Exhibit 47, #29 Exhibit 48, #30 Exhibit 49, #31 Exhibit 50, #32 Exhibit 51, #33 Exhibit 52, #34 Exhibit 53)(Taylor, Jennifer)
February 13, 2019 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Betsy Wilson in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Regarding Preliminary Injunction #5 filed by Plaintiffs United Parcel Service of America, Inc., a Delaware Corporation, United Parcel Service, Inc. (Delaware). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19)(Taylor, Jennifer)
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Regarding Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff United Parcel Service of America, Inc., a Delaware Corporation, United Parcel Service, Inc. (Delaware). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order) (Taylor, Jennifer)
February 13, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by United Parcel Service of America, Inc., a Delaware Corporation, United Parcel Service, Inc. (Delaware). (Taylor, Jennifer)
February 13, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiffs United Parcel Service of America, Inc., a Delaware Corporation, United Parcel Service, Inc. (Delaware) (Taylor, Jennifer)
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiff United Parcel Service of America, Inc., a Delaware Corporation, United Parcel Service, Inc. (Delaware). (Taylor, Jennifer)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23211909 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff United Parcel Service, Inc. (Delaware), United Parcel Service of America, Inc., a Delaware Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Jennifer Lee Taylor added to party United Parcel Service of America, Inc., a Delaware Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Jennifer Lee Taylor added to party United Parcel Service, Inc. (Delaware)(pty:pla))(Taylor, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Parcel Service, Inc. et al v. Brendon Kennedy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayumi Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brendon Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UPS420
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Pot Smokers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THCPlant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Parcel Service of America, Inc., a Delaware Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Parcel Service, Inc. (Delaware)
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Parcel Service, Inc.
Represented By: Esther Kim Chang
Represented By: Wendy J Ray
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Taylor
Represented By: Gregory B Koltun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Parcel Service of America, Inc.
Represented By: Esther Kim Chang
Represented By: Wendy J Ray
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Taylor
Represented By: Gregory B Koltun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?