Steve G. Hopkins et al v. Ford Motor Company, et al
Plaintiff: Steve G. Hopkins and Lynn Hopkins
Defendant: Ford Motor Company, Warren Anderson Ford, Does 1 through 10, inclusive and Warren Anderson Ford a California Corporation doing business as Fritts Ford
Case Number: 5:2019cv00288
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Charles F Eick
2 Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
3 Judge: Christina A Snyder
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 6/21/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
March 20, 2019 Filing 12 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. On March 18, 2019, the Court issued an Order to Show Cause why it should not dismiss this action for lack of prosecution. Plaintiff has filed a response to the Order to Show Cause re Lack of Prosecution on March 19, 2019. The Court deems that response satisfactory, and orders the Order to Show Cause discharged. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 19, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE filed by Defendants Ford Motor Company, Warren Anderson Fordto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Deadlines, #10 (Efstratis, Harry)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Andre Birotte Jr: Order to Show Cause Regarding Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution. It appears a response from defendant(s) has not been filed. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Show Cause Response due by 4/1/2019. (twdb)
March 4, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant Ford Motor Company, Warren Anderson Ford, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #8 served on 3/04/2019. (Efstratis, Harry)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:18-cv-07190 AB(Ex). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani and Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:19-cv-00288 AB(Ex). Signed by Judge Andre Birotte Jr (rn)
February 22, 2019 (CONFORMED COPY) ANSWER to Complaint #1 filed by Defendants Ford Motor Company and Warren Anderson Ford d/b/a Fritts Ford. [Filed stamped on 2/13/2019 by Riverside Superior Court, Case No. RIC 1900500] (gk)
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF LODGING filed State Court Answer re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 (Efstratis, Harry)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 16-05, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Christina A. Snyder. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:19-cv-00288 CAS (SHKx). (esa)
February 15, 2019 COPY OF SERVICE OF PROCESS TRANSMITTAL executed by Plaintiffs Steve G. Hopkins, Lynn Hopkins, upon Defendant Ford Motor Company served on 1/17/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Agent for Process of Service by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 2, p. 1) (esa)
February 15, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does 1 through 10, inclusive, Ford Motor Company, Warren Anderson Ford, Jury Demand, filed by plaintiffs Steve G. Hopkins, Lynn Hopkins. (Filed in state court 12/31/18, submitted as document 1, attachment 2, p. 8) (esa)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company, A Delaware Coporation, Warren-Anderson Ford, California Corporation, D/B/A Fritts Ford, (Efstratis, Harry)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Ford Motor Company, A Delaware Coporation, Warren-Anderson Ford, California Corporation, D/B/A Fritts Ford. (Efstratis, Harry)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverisde, case number RIC1900500 Receipt No: 0973-23223171 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant Warren-Anderson Ford, California Corporation, D/B/A Fritts Ford, Ford Motor Company, A Delaware Coporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Taylor Sullivan, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Declaration of H. Paul Efstratis, #7 Certificate of Service) (Attorney Harry Paul Efstratis added to party Ford Motor Company, A Delaware Coporation(pty:dft), Attorney Harry Paul Efstratis added to party Warren-Anderson Ford, California Corporation, D/B/A Fritts Ford(pty:dft))(Efstratis, Harry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steve G. Hopkins et al v. Ford Motor Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Taylor Ford Sullivan
Represented By: Erica Isabel De La Sierra
Represented By: Harry Paul Efstratis
Represented By: Brian C Vanderhoof
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Anderson Ford
Represented By: Taylor Ford Sullivan
Represented By: Erica Isabel De La Sierra
Represented By: Harry Paul Efstratis
Represented By: Brian C Vanderhoof
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Anderson Ford a California Corporation doing business as Fritts Ford
Represented By: Taylor Ford Sullivan
Represented By: Erica Isabel De La Sierra
Represented By: Harry Paul Efstratis
Represented By: Brian C Vanderhoof
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve G. Hopkins
Represented By: Steve Mikhov
Represented By: Kristina Praskovia Stephenson-Cheang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Hopkins
Represented By: Steve Mikhov
Represented By: Kristina Praskovia Stephenson-Cheang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?