Damon Anderson et al v. County of Riverside et al

Plaintiff: Damon Anderson
Defendant: Stanley Sniff, Riverside County, Clayton Palmer, Samesh Sawires, Andrew Pascoe, Does 1-100, Sameh Sawires, County of Riverside, Dr. Victor Laus and Does 1 through 25, inclusive
Petitioner: MD Victor Laus
Case Number: 5:2019cv00296
Filed: February 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Sheri Pym
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants County of Riverside, Victor Laus(Riverside County Correction Healthcare Medical Director, in his official capacity), Victor Laus(Riverside County Correction Healthcare Medical Director, in his individual capacity), Clayton Palmer, Andrew Pascoe (RN, Supervisory Institutional Nurse at Southwest Detention Center, in his individual capacity ), Andrew Pascoe (RN, Supervisory Institutional Nurse at Southwest Detention Center, in his official capacity ), Sameh Sawires(MD, Chief Medical Officer of Southwest Detention Center, in his official capacity), Sameh Sawires(MD, Chief Medical Officer of Southwest Detention Center, in his individual capacity ), Stanley Sniff, Stanley Sniff, (Moran, Kelly)
March 27, 2019 Filing 15 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Stanley Sniff answer now due 4/19/2019; Victor Laus(Riverside County Correction Healthcare Medical Director, in his official capacity) answer now due 4/19/2019; County of Riverside answer now due 4/19/2019; Sameh Sawires(MD, Chief Medical Officer of Southwest Detention Center, in his individual capacity ) answer now due 4/19/2019; Sameh Sawires(MD, Chief Medical Officer of Southwest Detention Center, in his official capacity) answer now due 4/19/2019; Clayton Palmer answer now due 4/19/2019; Andrew Pascoe (RN, Supervisory Institutional Nurse at Southwest Detention Center, in his individual capacity ) answer now due 4/19/2019; Stanley Sniff answer now due 4/19/2019; Victor Laus(Riverside County Correction Healthcare Medical Director, in his individual capacity) answer now due 4/19/2019; Andrew Pascoe (RN, Supervisory Institutional Nurse at Southwest Detention Center, in his official capacity ) answer now due 4/19/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Stanley Sniff; Victor Laus(Riverside County Correction Healthcare Medical Director, in his official capacity); County of Riverside; Sameh Sawires(MD, Chief Medical Officer of Southwest Detention Center, in his individual capacity ); Sameh Sawires(MD, Chief Medical Officer of Southwest Detention Center, in his official capacity); Clayton Palmer; Andrew Pascoe (RN, Supervisory Institutional Nurse at Southwest Detention Center, in his individual capacity ); Stanley Sniff; Victor Laus(Riverside County Correction Healthcare Medical Director, in his individual capacity); Andrew Pascoe (RN, Supervisory Institutional Nurse at Southwest Detention Center, in his official capacity ). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Kelly Anne Moran added to party County of Riverside(pty:dft), Attorney Kelly Anne Moran added to party Victor Laus(pty:dft), Attorney Kelly Anne Moran added to party Victor Laus(pty:dft), Attorney Kelly Anne Moran added to party Clayton Palmer(pty:dft), Attorney Kelly Anne Moran added to party Andrew Pascoe (pty:dft), Attorney Kelly Anne Moran added to party Andrew Pascoe (pty:dft), Attorney Kelly Anne Moran added to party Sameh Sawires(pty:dft), Attorney Kelly Anne Moran added to party Sameh Sawires(pty:dft), Attorney Kelly Anne Moran added to party Stanley Sniff(pty:dft), Attorney Kelly Anne Moran added to party Stanley Sniff(pty:dft))(Moran, Kelly)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo)
February 20, 2019 Filing 13 Certificate and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Damon Anderson, (McKernan, Robert)
February 19, 2019 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant County of Riverside. (car)
February 19, 2019 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Stanley Sniff (individually), Stanley Sniff (as Sheriff for the Riverside Sheriff's Department). (car)
February 19, 2019 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Sameh Sawires(MD, Chief Medical Officer of Southwest Detention Center, in his official capacity), Sameh Sawires(MD, Chief Medical Officer of Southwest Detention Center, in his individual capacity ). (car)
February 19, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Andrew Pascoe (RN, Supervisory Institutional Nurse at Southwest Detention Center, in his individual capacity ), Andrew Pascoe (RN, Supervisory Institutional Nurse at Southwest Detention Center, in his official capacity ). (car)
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Clayton Palmer. (car)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Victor Laus(Riverside County Correction Healthcare Medical Director, in his official capacity), Victor Laus(Riverside County Correction Healthcare Medical Director, in his individual capacity). (car)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (car)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (car)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Damon Anderson. (Attachments: #1 SUMMONS, #2 SUMMONS, #3 SUMMONS, #4 SUMMONS, #5 SUMMONS, #6 SUMMONS)(McKernan, Robert)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Damon Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet COVER SHEET)(McKernan, Robert)
February 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23230056 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Damon Anderson, Does 1-100.(McKernan, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Damon Anderson et al v. County of Riverside et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MD Victor Laus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Sniff
Represented By: Kelly Anne Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverside County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clayton Palmer
Represented By: Kelly Anne Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samesh Sawires
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Pascoe
Represented By: Kelly Anne Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sameh Sawires
Represented By: Kelly Anne Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Riverside
Represented By: Kelly Anne Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Victor Laus
Represented By: Kelly Anne Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damon Anderson
Represented By: Robert K McKernan
Represented By: Marc Steven Colen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?