Gary Northrup v. Covidien, LP. et al

Plaintiff: Gary Northrup
Defendant: Medtronic, Inc. and Covidien, LP.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00299
Filed: February 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Referring Judge: Consuelo B Marshall
2 Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT by Judge Fernando M. Olguin Re: Second Amended Complaint #18 . The following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order for the following reason(s): plaintiff did not seek leave of court prior to filing the amended complaint. (vdr)
April 9, 2019 Filing 18 **STRICKEN** SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Amended Complaint/Petition #13 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by plaintiff Gary Northrup(Arevalo, Kristy) Modified on 4/10/2019 (vdr).
March 22, 2019 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Gary Northrup, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky Degeorge of CSC Lawyers, Inc., Agent for Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Arevalo, Kristy)
March 20, 2019 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Gary Northrup, upon Defendant Medtronic, Inc. served on 2/26/2019, answer due 3/19/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Bernardo Montanez, Corporate Service Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Arevalo, Kristy)
March 18, 2019 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Gary Northrup, upon Defendant Covidien, LP. served on 2/26/2019, answer due 3/19/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky Degeorge of CSC Lawyers, Inc., Agent for Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Arevalo, Kristy)
March 18, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Gary Northrup, upon Defendant Medtronic, Inc. served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Bernardo Montanez, Corporate Service Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Arevalo, Kristy)
March 18, 2019 Filing 13 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by plaintiff Gary Northrup(Arevalo, Kristy)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 3/11/2019. (vdr)
February 25, 2019 Filing 11 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Consuelo B. Marshall to Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:19-cv-00299 FMO(KKx). (rn)
February 19, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Medtronic, Inc. (car)
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Covidien, LP. (car)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (car)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Eastern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Consuelo B. Marshall for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Kenly Kiya Kato. New Case Number 5:19-cv-00299-CBM-KKx. (car)
February 16, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Northrup Gary. (Arevalo, Kristy)
February 16, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Northrup Gary. (Arevalo, Kristy)
February 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Northrup Gary, identifying Covidien, LP. and Medtronic, Inc.. (Arevalo, Kristy)
February 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Northrup Gary. (Arevalo, Kristy)
February 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23229133 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Northrup Gary. (Attorney Kristy M Arevalo added to party Northrup Gary(pty:pla))(Arevalo, Kristy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gary Northrup v. Covidien, LP. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Northrup
Represented By: Kristy M Arevalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covidien, LP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?