Tomas Diarte Otanez v. Nancy A. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Tomas Diarte Otanez
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Nancy A. Berryhill and Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 5:2019cv00300
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John E McDermott
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott for all further proceedings. Please use the case number EDCV19-300 JEM on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
March 19, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attorney Jean M Turk added to party Nancy A. Berryhill(pty:dft))(Turk, Jean)
March 7, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Tomas Diarte Otanez. (Kalagian, Marc)
March 7, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Tomas Diarte Otanez, upon Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 3/7/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with statute not specified. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Kalagian, Marc)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. [See Order for details.] (san)
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (sbou)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott: granting #5 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (sbou)
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and referred to Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (lh)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Tomas Diarte Otanez. (Kalagian, Marc)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Tomas Diarte Otanez, (Kalagian, Marc)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Tomas Diarte Otanez. (Kalagian, Marc)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Tomas Diarte Otanez. (Kalagian, Marc)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Tomas Diarte Otanez. (Attorney Marc V Kalagian added to party Tomas Diarte Otanez(pty:pla))(Kalagian, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tomas Diarte Otanez v. Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Jean M Turk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tomas Diarte Otanez
Represented By: Marc V Kalagian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?