Danielle Mackey v. Lowe s Companies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Danielle Mackey
Defendant: Lowe s Companies, Inc., Lowe s Home Centers LLC, Highland Lowe s 27847 Greenspot Road and Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2019cv00491
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2019 Filing 26 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tessa King counsel for Plaintiff Danielle Mackey. Jared Irmas is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Plaintiff. (King, Tessa)
May 28, 2019 Filing 25 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tessa King counsel for Plaintiff Danielle Mackey. Adding Leona Bahnam as counsel of record for Plaintiff for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Plaintiff. (King, Tessa)
May 28, 2019 Filing 24 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tessa King counsel for Plaintiff Danielle Mackey. Adding Lauren Falk as counsel of record for Danielle Mackey for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Plaintiff. (King, Tessa)
May 23, 2019 Filing 23 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7, filed by Defendant Lowe s Home Centers LLC.. (Backlar, Roger)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 I. ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL SETTING DATES FOR: Discovery Cut-Off: Pre-Trial Conference: December 23, 2019 at 11:00 A.M. Trial: January 14, 2020 at 8:30 A.M. II. Order for Preparation for JURY TRIAL III. Order Governing Attorney & Party Conduct at Trial by Judge James V. Selna (es)
May 13, 2019 Filing 21 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge James V. Selna: The Court sets the case management dates with the agreement of counsel as follows: Jury Trial January 14, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. Final PreTrial Conference December 23, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. Counsel inform the Court that their selection for a settlement procedure pursuant to Local Rule 16-15 is ADR #3, private mediation. Within 7 days, Counsel shall meet and confer and submit a stipulation and proposed order with the balance of the case management dates as shown on Exhibit A to the Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference including the last date to conduct a settlement conference. At the request of counsel, the parties may propound up to 35 interrogatories. Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (es)
May 3, 2019 Filing 20 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Defendant Lowe s Home Centers LLC.. (Backlar, Roger)
April 12, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant Lowe s Home Centers LLC.(Forman, Stephanie)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ON STIPULATION TO AMEND PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #17 by Judge James V. Selna. Having considered the stipulation of the parties, and good cause appearing therefore, the Court ORDERS as follows: *See document for details.* Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6), presently set for hearing on April 29, 2019, at 1:30 p.m. is deemed withdrawn and the hearing date vacated. Defendant is ORDERED to Answer Plaintiff's FAC within 10 days of this Order. (es)
April 4, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION to AMEND Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant Lowe s Home Centers LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order On Stipulation To Amend Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint)(Backlar, Roger)
March 25, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM UPON WHICH RELIEF MAY BE GRANTED PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Lowe s Home Centers LLC. Motion set for hearing on 4/29/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Roger W. Backlar In Support Of Motion To Dismiss, #2 Exhibit "C", #3 Exhibit "D", #4 Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Motion To Dismiss For Failure To State A Claim Upon Which Relief May Be Granted Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6);, #5 Exhibit "A", #6 Exhibit "B", #7 Proposed Order, #8 Proof of Service) (Backlar, Roger)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani, re Stipulation for Protective Order #14 (dc)
March 22, 2019 Filing 14 Joint STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendant Lowe s Home Centers LLC. (Attachments: #1 [PROPOSED] PROTECTIVE ORDER)(Backlar, Roger)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for May 13, 2019 at 11:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by May 6, 2019. (lb)
March 21, 2019 Filing 12 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiff Danielle Mackey.. (King, Tessa)
March 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Danielle Mackey, (King, Tessa)
March 20, 2019 Filing 10 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:19-cv-00491 JVS(SHKx). (rn)
March 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
March 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 19-03, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Christina A. Snyder. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:19-cv-00491 CAS (SHKx). (esa)
March 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Eastern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Jesus G. Bernal for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Shashi H. Kewalramani. New Case Number 5:19-cv-00491 JGB (SHKx). (esa)
March 18, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants Does 1 through 100, inclusive, Highland Lowe s 27847 Greenspot Road, Lowe s Companies, Inc. amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by plaintiff Danielle Mackey (Filed in state court 2/13/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 6)(esa)
March 18, 2019 COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned executed filed by Plaintiff Danielle Mackey, upon Defendant Lowe s Home Centers LLC acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 1/16/2019. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Roger Backler, Counsel. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 5) (esa)
March 18, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does 1 through 100, inclusive, Highland Lowe s 27847 Greenspot Road, Lowe s Companies, Inc. Jury Demand., filed by plaintiff Danielle Mackey. (Filed in state court 6/11/18, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa)
March 18, 2019 Filing 5 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 served on March 18, 2019. (Forman, Stephanie)
March 18, 2019 Filing 4 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Lowe's Home Centers, LLC.. (Forman, Stephanie)
March 18, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant All Defendants, (Forman, Stephanie)
March 18, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Forman, Stephanie)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court, San Bernardino, case number CIVDS1814427 Receipt No: 0973-23391114 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B", #3 Exhibit "C", #4 Exhibit "D", #5 Exhibit "E", #6 Exhibit "F", #7 Exhibit "G", #8 Exhibit "H") (Attorney Stephanie Forman added to party Lowe's Home Centers, LLC(pty:dft))(Forman, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Danielle Mackey v. Lowe s Companies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe s Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe s Home Centers LLC
Represented By: Roger Willner Backlar
Represented By: Charles D May, Jr
Represented By: Stephanie Forman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highland Lowe s 27847 Greenspot Road
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Mackey
Represented By: Adam J Reisner
Represented By: Tessa King
Represented By: Leona Bahnam
Represented By: Jared Maxwell Irmas
Represented By: Lauren Ashley Falk
Represented By: Leona Heidi Bahnam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?