Beverly Rosales v. Amazon Fulfillment Services et al
Plaintiff: Beverly Rosales
Defendant: Amazon Fulfillment Services, Does 2 through 100, Inclusive, Amazon.com Services, Inc. and Golden State FC, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00537
Filed: March 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
2 Judge: Christina A Snyder
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2019 Filing 25 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) DISCLOSURE TO THE PARTIES by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Court believes that disqualification is neither necessary nor desirable. The Court was unaware of the purchase of the share when it occurred. The case was remanded prior to the Court's knowledge of the Amazon stock. The share was divested under 455(f). The Court does not view this single matter as plausibly affecting the market price of Amazon stock. (iv)
May 30, 2019 Filing 24 Receipt of Acknowledgment of remand documents by Superior Court of California, case no. RIC1900658. (lom)
May 10, 2019 Filing 23 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court of Riverside. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court of Riverside. (iv)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO REMAND REMOVED ACTION #21 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED the above-captioned action be remanded to the Superior Court of the State of California, County of Riverside. Each party shall bear its own fees and costs attributable to removal, Plaintiff's remand motion, and the remand of this action. Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (iv)
May 8, 2019 Filing 21 STIPULATION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Defendant Amazon.com Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re Stipulation to Remand Removed Action)(Dexter, Douglas)
May 6, 2019 Filing 20 MINUTES OF MOTION TO REMAND #12 before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Case called, and counsel make their appearance. The Court invites counsel to present their oral arguments. Arguments by counsel are heard. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court will continue the matter to a later date. An order will issue. Court Reporter: Amy Diaz. (iv)
May 6, 2019 Filing 19 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed by Defendant Amazon.com Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Request for Judicial Notice)(Andrade, Chandra)
April 30, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Unavailability of Counsel filed by Defendant Amazon.com Services, Inc.. (Dexter, Douglas)
April 25, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY in further support of Request for Judicial Notice filed by Defendant Amazon.com Services, Inc.. (Andrade, Chandra)
April 25, 2019 Filing 16 PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT AMAZON.COM SERVICE, INC.'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to RIVERSIDE SUPERIOR COURT #12 filed by Plaintiff Beverly Rosales. (Kassel, Sanford)
April 23, 2019 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE in Support of #13 Defendant Amazon.com Services, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Defendant Amazon.com Services, Inc.. (Andrade, Chandra)
April 16, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY OPPOSITION NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to RIVERSIDE SUPERIOR COURT #12 filed by Plaintiff Beverly Rosales. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF GAVIN P. KASSEL IN SUPPORT)(Kassel, Sanford)
April 15, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to RIVERSIDE SUPERIOR COURT #12 filed by Defendant Amazon.com Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Chandra S. Andrade, #2 Declaration of Suki Singh, #3 Proposed Order)(Andrade, Chandra)
April 2, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to RIVERSIDE SUPERIOR COURT filed by PLAINTIFF Beverly Rosales. Motion set for hearing on 5/6/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Declaration IN SUPPORT OF MOTION, #2 Proposed Order GRANTING REMAND) (Kassel, Sanford)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:19-cv-00537 MWF(SHKx). (rn)
March 29, 2019 Filing 10 Defendant's Amended Corporate Disclosure Statement and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Amazon.com Services, Inc., identifying Amazon.com, Inc.. (Dexter, Douglas)
March 27, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Plaintiff Beverly Rosales (Kassel, Sanford)
March 27, 2019 Filing 8 DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Beverly Rosales (Kassel, Sanford)
March 26, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Amazon.com Services, Inc. identifying Amazon.com, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Dexter, Douglas)
March 26, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Amazon.com Services, Inc.. (Dexter, Douglas)
March 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (car)
March 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
March 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 19-03, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Christina A. Snyder. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:19-cv-00537 CAS (SHKx). (car)
March 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of New Case Number and Judge Assignment by Clerk. This case is hereby converted from case type MC to case type CV because the incorrect case type was used at case opening. A new case number has therefore been assigned to this case. District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani are assigned to this new case number. All future documents must be filed under the new case number, which is 5:19-cv-00537-JGB-SHKx. The previous case number, 5:19-mc-00006, is hereby terminated. (car)
March 25, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL filed by plaintiff Beverly Rosales pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Golden State FC, LLC. Filed in State Court on 2/22/19 Submitted with Attachment 3 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
March 25, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT - (Discovery) Upon filing the complaint plaintiff being ignorant of the true name of the defendant and having designated the defendant in the complaint by the fictitious name of DOE 1 and having discovered the true name of the defendant to be Amazon.com Services, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Beverly Rosales. Filed in State Court on 2/19/19 Submitted with attachment 2 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
March 25, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Amazon Fulfillment Services, Does 1 through 100, Inclusive, Golden State FC, LLC, filed by plaintiff Beverly Rosales. Filed in State Court on 1/11/2019 Submitted with Attachment 1 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
March 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, case number RIC1900658 Receipt No: 0973-23435467 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Amazon.com Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Amendment to Complaint, #3 Exhibit C-Dismissal Form, #4 Exhibit D-SOS Washington Annual Report) (Attorney Douglas Evans Dexter added to party Amazon.com Services, Inc.(pty:dft))(Dexter, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beverly Rosales v. Amazon Fulfillment Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Fulfillment Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 2 through 100, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Services, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Evans Dexter
Represented By: Chandra S Andrade
Represented By: Jaya Bajaj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden State FC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Rosales
Represented By: Gavin P Kassel
Represented By: Sanford Alan Kassel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?