United States of America v. 80 Acres of Land, More or Less Situate in San Bernardino County et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, and United States of America
Defendant: San Bernardino County Auditor-Controller Treasurer Tax Collector, Michael T Henn, 80 Acres of Land, More or Less, Situate in San Bernardino County, State of California and Nancy E Henn
Case Number: 5:2019cv00639
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Sheri Pym
Referring Judge: Manuel L Real
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1358
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff United States of Americato Order to Show Cause #13 (Hansen, Eugene)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Manuel L. Real. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 6/21/2019. See Order for details. (cch)
April 23, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff United States of America. upon Nancy E Henn waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/11/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Nancy E. Henn. (Hansen, Eugene)
April 23, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff United States of America. upon Michael T Henn waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/11/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Michael T. Henn. (Hansen, Eugene)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER PERMITTING DEPOSIT OF ESTIMATE OF JUST COMPENSATION INTO AN INTEREST HEARING ACCOUNT IN THE COURT'S REGISTRY by Judge Manuel L. Real: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Application is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court shall accept the deposit of thirty thousand dollars and no cents ($30,000.00) tendered by the United States, including by wire transfer or check, and shall deposit these funds into an interest-bearing account under the terms and conditions of Fed. R. Civ. P. 67 and Local Civil Rule 67. IT IS SO ORDERED. granting #7 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Deposit Funds (yl)
April 17, 2019 Filing 9 DISCLAIMER filed by Defendant San Bernardino County Auditor-Controller Treasurer Tax Collector to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . (Norton, Mitchell)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Manuel L. Real. READ CAREFULLY - FAILURE TO COMPLY MAY LEAD TO SANCTIONS. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (cch)
April 15, 2019 Filing 7 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Deposit Funds filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hansen, Eugene)
April 15, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff United States of America. upon San Bernardino County Auditor-Controller Treasurer Tax Collector waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/11/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Mitchell L. Norton. (Hansen, Eugene)
April 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Manuel L. Real and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (et)
April 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Condemnation filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule A, #2 Exhibit Schedule B, #3 Exhibit Schedule C, #4 Exhibit Schedule D, #5 Exhibit Schedule E, #6 Exhibit Schedule F, #7 Exhibit Schedule G)(Hansen, Eugene)
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Taking filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule A, #2 Exhibit Schedule B, #3 Exhibit Schedule C, #4 Exhibit Schedule D, #5 Exhibit Schedule E, #6 Exhibit Schedule F, #7 Exhibit Schedule G)(Hansen, Eugene)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,. (Hansen, Eugene)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule A, #2 Exhibit Schedule B, #3 Exhibit Schedule C, #4 Exhibit Schedule D, #5 Exhibit Schedule E, #6 Exhibit Schedule F, #7 Exhibit Schedule G) (Attorney Eugene N Hansen added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,(pty:pla))(Hansen, Eugene)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 80 Acres of Land, More or Less Situate in San Bernardino County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Bernardino County Auditor-Controller Treasurer Tax Collector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael T Henn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 80 Acres of Land, More or Less, Situate in San Bernardino County, State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy E Henn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,
Represented By: Eugene N Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Eugene N Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?