Ruben De Vera v. Donna Campagnolo
Plaintiff: Ruben De Vera
Defendant: LA District Director Donna Campagnolo and Donna Campagnolo
Case Number: 5:2019cv00651
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Ruben De Vera. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Sturman, David)
May 29, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Donna Campagnolo answer now due 7/16/2019, filed by defendant Donna Campagnolo.(Attorney Hillary Morgan Burrelle added to party Donna Campagnolo(pty:dft))(Burrelle, Hillary)
April 24, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ruben De Vera, upon Defendant Donna Campagnolo served on 4/17/2019, answer due 6/17/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Flabia De La Rosa. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to A, Owens. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to M. Michelle. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Proof of Service on Attorney General, #2 Supplement Proof of Service on Defendant)(Sturman, David)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (lom)
April 12, 2019 Filing 6 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Donna Campagnolo. (jtil)
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (jtil)
April 10, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Ruben De Vera. (Sturman, David)
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Ruben De Vera, (Sturman, David)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ruben De Vera. (Sturman, David)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23532106 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Ruben De Vera. (Attorney David M Sturman added to party Ruben De Vera(pty:pla))(Sturman, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruben De Vera v. Donna Campagnolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LA District Director Donna Campagnolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Campagnolo
Represented By: Hillary Morgan Burrelle
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben De Vera
Represented By: David M Sturman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?