Emerita Corado-Cortez v. XPO Logistics, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Emerita Corado-Cortez
Defendant: XPO Logistics, Freight, Inc., XPO Logistics Supply Chain Inc., XPO Logistics, Inc., XPO Logistics Supply Chain Corporate Services, Inc., XPO Logistics, Worldwide, Inc. and Does 1-50, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2019cv00670
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION for Relief from LOCAL RULE 23-3 TO FILE CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTION filed by Plaintiff Emerita Corado-Cortez. (Attachments: #1 [PROPOSED] ORDER RE RELIEF FROM LOCAL RULE 23-3 TO FILE CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTION)(Mauro, Gregory)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 7/26/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 19-03, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:19-cv-00670 AB (SHKx). (esa)
April 12, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendants XPO Logistics Supply Chain Corporate Services, Inc., XPO Logistics Supply Chain Inc., XPO Logistics, Freight, Inc., XPO Logistics, Inc., XPO Logistics, Worldwide, Inc. (Filed in state court 4/11/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 4)(esa) Modified on 4/15/2019 (esa).
April 12, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does 1-50, inclusive, XPO Logistics Supply Chain Corporate Services, Inc., XPO Logistics Supply Chain Inc., XPO Logistics, Freight, Inc., XPO Logistics, Inc., XPO Logistics, Worldwide, Inc., Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Emerita Corado-Cortez. (Filed in state court 1/15/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p. 15) (esa)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by defendant XPO Logistics Supply Chain Corporate Services, Inc., XPO Logistics Supply Chain Inc., XPO Logistics, Freight, Inc., XPO Logistics, Inc., XPO Logistics, Worldwide, Inc., (Skeen, Spencer)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants XPO Logistics Supply Chain Corporate Services, Inc., XPO Logistics Supply Chain Inc., XPO Logistics, Freight, Inc., XPO Logistics, Inc., XPO Logistics, Worldwide, Inc.. (Skeen, Spencer)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino Superior Court, case number CIVDS1901162 Receipt No: 0973-23545338 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant XPO Logistics, Worldwide, Inc., XPO Logistics Supply Chain Corporate Services, Inc., XPO Logistics, Freight, Inc., XPO Logistics, Inc., XPO Logistics Supply Chain Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Declaration of Jesse C. Ferrantella, #6 Declaration of Debra Myers) (Attorney Spencer C Skeen added to party XPO Logistics Supply Chain Corporate Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Spencer C Skeen added to party XPO Logistics Supply Chain Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Spencer C Skeen added to party XPO Logistics, Freight, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Spencer C Skeen added to party XPO Logistics, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Spencer C Skeen added to party XPO Logistics, Worldwide, Inc.(pty:dft))(Skeen, Spencer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emerita Corado-Cortez v. XPO Logistics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XPO Logistics, Freight, Inc.
Represented By: Spencer C Skeen
Represented By: Timothy L Johnson
Represented By: Jesse C Ferrantella
Represented By: Nikolas T Djordjevski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XPO Logistics Supply Chain Inc.
Represented By: Spencer C Skeen
Represented By: Timothy L Johnson
Represented By: Jesse C Ferrantella
Represented By: Nikolas T Djordjevski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XPO Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Spencer C Skeen
Represented By: Timothy L Johnson
Represented By: Jesse C Ferrantella
Represented By: Nikolas T Djordjevski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XPO Logistics Supply Chain Corporate Services, Inc.
Represented By: Spencer C Skeen
Represented By: Timothy L Johnson
Represented By: Jesse C Ferrantella
Represented By: Nikolas T Djordjevski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XPO Logistics, Worldwide, Inc.
Represented By: Spencer C Skeen
Represented By: Timothy L Johnson
Represented By: Jesse C Ferrantella
Represented By: Nikolas T Djordjevski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emerita Corado-Cortez
Represented By: Gregory E. Mauro
Represented By: Michael J S Calvo
Represented By: James R Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?