Debra Jean Allen v. Nancy A. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Debra Jean Allen
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security and Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 5:2019cv00688
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge John D. Early for all further proceedings. Please use the case number EDCV19-688 JDE on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
May 17, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attorney Amanda Schapel added to party Nancy A. Berryhill(pty:dft))(Schapel, Amanda)
May 3, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), (Rohlfing, Lawrence)
May 3, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Debra Jean Allen, upon Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 4/29/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Rohlfing, Lawrence)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge John D. Early, re Procedures in Social Security Appeal. (mba)
April 17, 2019 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (mba)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge John D. Early, GRANTING #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (mba)
April 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and referred to Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (esa)
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Debra Jean Allen, (Rohlfing, Lawrence)
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Debra Jean Allen. (Rohlfing, Lawrence)
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Debra Jean Allen. (Rohlfing, Lawrence)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Debra Jean Allen. (Rohlfing, Lawrence)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Debra Jean Allen. (Attorney Lawrence D Rohlfing added to party Debra Jean Allen(pty:pla))(Rohlfing, Lawrence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Debra Jean Allen v. Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Amanda Schapel
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Jean Allen
Represented By: Lawrence D Rohlfing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?