In Re Pacific Mortgage Exchange, Inc. et al
Not Yet Classified: Pacific Mortgage Exchange, Inc.
Appellee: PME Mortgage Fund, Inc., Nicholas Rubin and U.S. Trustee
Appellant: Terry R. Mathis
Case Number: 5:2019cv00804
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: R Gary Klausner
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE RE: BANKRUPTCY RECORD COMPLETE. Please note, pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8010(b)(3), this Court has received from the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court either the record for the above-captioned appeal or notice that the record is available electronically. The parties are responsible for reading and complying with all requirements, including briefing, provided in this notice. Appellant must serve and file a brief by 7/24/2019. (jp)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability re Certificate of Readiness and Completion of Record on Appeal #1 . (jp)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:18-cv-01458 RGK. Case transferred from Judge Percy Anderson to Judge R. Gary Klausner for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:19-cv-00804 RGK. Signed by Judge R. Gary Klausner (rn)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (mrgo)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SELF-REPRESENTATION ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. (See document for details) (mrgo)
April 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
April 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REFERRAL OF APPEAL (ADVERSARY) prepared by the United States Bankruptcy Court on 4/29/2019. (ghap)
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The appeal has been assigned to Judge Percy Anderson. Refer to the Notice for specifics. (ghap)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL AND STATEMENT OF ELECTION: Re: Order on Objection to Claims entered on 4/19/2019 by Bankruptcy Judge Scott H Yun, filed in the Bankruptcy Court on 4/26/2019. Bankruptcy Court case number: 6:17-bk-15082-SY, Adversary number: N/A, BAP case number: N/A., filed by appellant Terry R. Mathis. (Attachments: #1 BK Court Docket Sheets) (ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re Pacific Mortgage Exchange, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Pacific Mortgage Exchange, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: PME Mortgage Fund, Inc.
Represented By: Derrick M Talerico
Represented By: David B Zolkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Nicholas Rubin
Represented By: Derrick M Talerico
Represented By: David B Zolkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: U.S. Trustee
Represented By: Everett L Green
Represented By: Abram Feuerstein
Represented By: Abram Stuart Feuerstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Terry R. Mathis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?