United States of America v. 10 Acres of Land, More or Less, Situate in San Bernardino County, California et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 10 Acres of Land, More or Less, Situate in San Bernardino County, California, San Bernardino County Auditor-Controller/Treasurer/Tax Collector, Luis A. Omana (A/K/A Emmanuel Omana) and Virginia P. Omana, Trustees of the Omana Revocable Trust dated September 5, 2006, Luis A. Omana and Virginia P. Omana
Case Number: 5:2019cv00811
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1358
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 DISCLAIMER filed by Defendant San Bernardino County Auditor-Controller/Treasurer/Tax Collector. (Norton, Mitchell)
May 21, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff United States of America. upon San Bernardino County Auditor-Controller/Treasurer/Tax Collector waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/2/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Mitchell Norton. (Grillot, Benjamin)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Granting #7 EX PARTE APPLICATION PERMITTING DEPOSIT OF ESTIMATE OF JUST COMPENSATION INTO AN INTEREST BEARING ACCOUNT IN THE COURT'S REGISTRY. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
May 6, 2019 Filing 7 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Deposit Funds filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Grillot, Benjamin)
May 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
May 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (jtil)
April 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Condemnation filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule A, #2 Exhibit Schedule B, #3 Exhibit Schedule C, #4 Exhibit Schedule D, #5 Exhibit Schedule E, #6 Exhibit Schedule F, #7 Exhibit Schedule G)(Grillot, Benjamin)
April 30, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Taking filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule A, #2 Exhibit Schedule B, #3 Exhibit Schedule C, #4 Exhibit Schedule D, #5 Exhibit Schedule E, #6 Exhibit Schedule F, #7 Exhibit Schedule G)(Grillot, Benjamin)
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Grillot, Benjamin)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule A, #2 Exhibit Schedule B, #3 Exhibit Schedule C, #4 Exhibit Schedule D, #5 Exhibit Schedule E, #6 Exhibit Schedule F, #7 Exhibit Schedule G) (Attorney Benjamin James Grillot added to party United States of America(pty:pla))(Grillot, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 10 Acres of Land, More or Less, Situate in San Bernardino County, California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 10 Acres of Land, More or Less, Situate in San Bernardino County, California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Bernardino County Auditor-Controller/Treasurer/Tax Collector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis A. Omana (A/K/A Emmanuel Omana) and Virginia P. Omana, Trustees of the Omana Revocable Trust dated September 5, 2006
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis A. Omana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia P. Omana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Benjamin James Grillot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?