Roberto Santa Cruz v. Nancy A. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Roberto Santa Cruz
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security and Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 5:2019cv00873
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick for all further proceedings. Please use the case number EDCV19-873 E on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
June 14, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attorney Marla K Letellier added to party Nancy A. Berryhill(pty:dft))(Letellier, Marla)
May 29, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), (Perales, Monica)
May 29, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Roberto Santa Cruz, upon Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 5/24/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Perales, Monica)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. Plaintiff shall promptly serve the Summons and Complaint on defendant (on the United States Attorney, or his or her authorized agent, by certified or registered mail, or in the alternative, personally at Room 7516, Federal Building, 300 North Los Angeles Street, Los Angeles, California 90012, and by certified or registered mail on the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration and the Attorney General, as required by law), and shall file a proof of such service within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. (See document for details.) (sbou)
May 10, 2019 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant. (sp)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Re Request to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick: granting #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support. (sp)
May 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and referred to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (et)
May 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Roberto Santa Cruz, (Perales, Monica)
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Roberto Santa Cruz. (Perales, Monica)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Roberto Santa Cruz. (Perales, Monica)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Roberto Santa Cruz. (Perales, Monica)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Roberto Santa Cruz. (Attorney Monica Perales added to party Roberto Santa Cruz(pty:pla))(Perales, Monica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberto Santa Cruz v. Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Marla K Letellier
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Santa Cruz
Represented By: Monica Perales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?