Brenda Jean Eisele v. Nancy A. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Brenda Jean Eisele
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill and Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 5:2019cv00880
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero for all further proceedings. Please use the case number EDCV19-880 MAA on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
June 14, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attorney Jennifer A Kenney added to party Nancy A. Berryhill(pty:dft))(Kenney, Jennifer)
June 4, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), (Rosales, Steven)
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brenda Jean Eisele, upon Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 5/30/2019, answer due 9/27/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Rosales, Steven)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER REGARDING PROCEDURES IN SOC SECURITY APPEALS by Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. Plaintiff shall serve the summons and complaint on the government promptly in accordance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 4(i) and 20 C.F.R. 423.1. Plaintiff shall file an appropriate proof of service within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. [See document for details.] (et)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (et)
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Brenda Jean Eisele. (Rosales, Steven)
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and referred to Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (lh)
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Brenda Jean Eisele, (Rosales, Steven)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Brenda Jean Eisele. (Rosales, Steven)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Brenda Jean Eisele. (Rosales, Steven)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23709604 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Brenda Jean Eisele. (Attorney Steven G Rosales added to party Brenda Jean Eisele(pty:pla))(Rosales, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brenda Jean Eisele v. Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Jean Eisele
Represented By: Steven G Rosales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Jennifer A Kenney
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?