Lisa M. Lee v. Nancy A. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Lisa M. Lee
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Nancy A. Berryhill and Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 5:2019cv00896
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Lisa M. Lee. (Krank, Laura)
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lisa M. Lee, upon Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 6/24/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with statute not specified. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Krank, Laura)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER [Social Security] by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. THE COURT'S CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER HAS BEEN REVISED EFFECTIVE JANUARY 2016. PLEASE REVIEW THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. In accordance with General Order 05-01, this case is designated for electronic filing. A chambers copy is required only for the joint stipulation and the certified administrative record. In order to facilitate the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of this case, the parties shall comply with the following instructions. (See Order for Further Details) (kl)
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (hr)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg: granting #5 APPLICATION to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (hr)
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (car)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Lisa M. Lee. (Krank, Laura)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Lisa M. Lee, (Krank, Laura)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Lisa M. Lee. (Krank, Laura)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Lisa M. Lee. (Krank, Laura)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Lisa M. Lee. (Attorney Laura E Krank added to party Lisa M. Lee (pty:pla))(Krank, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lisa M. Lee v. Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa M. Lee
Represented By: Laura E Krank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?