Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 76.174.162.43
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 76.174.162.43
Case Number: 5:2019cv00924
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Terry J Hatter
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE EARLY DISCOVERY #9 by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym: The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs Application for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference (docket no. 9) with respect to John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 76.174.162.43 as follows: 1. Plaintiff may immediately serve a Rule 45 subpoena on Spectrum to obtain the Doe defendants true name and address. The subpoena must include a copy of this order. 2. Spectrum will have 30 days from the date of service upon it to serve the Doe defendant with a copy of the subpoena and a copy of this order. Spectrum may serve defendant using any reasonable means, including written notice sent to his or her last known address, transmitted either by first-class mail or via overnight service. 3. The Doe defendant will have 30 days from the date of service upon him or her to file any motions contesting the subpoena (including a motion to quash or modify the subpoena) with this court, as well as any request to litigate the subpoena anonymously. Spectrum may not turn over the Doe defendants identifying information to plaintiff before the expiration of this 30-day period. If the Doe defendant files a motion to quash the subpoena or to proceed anonymously, he or she shall at the same time as the filing serve Spectrum with a copy, as well as plaintiff. If such motion is filed, Spectrum may not turn over any information to plaintiff until the court rules on the motion or otherwise issues an order instructing it to proceed. 4. If the 30-day period lapses without the Doe defendant contesting the subpoena, this limited protective order will expire and Spectrum shall have 10 days to produce the information responsive to the subpoena to plaintiff. 5. Spectrum shall preserve any subpoenaed information upon receipt of the subpoena, and pending the resolution of any timely-filed motion to quash. 6. Any information disclosed to plaintiff in response to the subpoena may be used by plaintiff solely for the purpose of protecting and enforcing its rights as set forth in the Complaint. (shb)
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) -NEW CASE BEFORE JUDGE HATTER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr:This action has been assigned to the calendar of the HONORABLE TERRY J. HATTER, JR., United States District Judge. Please include the initials TJH in all documents pertaining to this case, as documents are routed using the judges initials, it is imperative that the correct initials TJH be used on all subsequent filings to prevent any delays in the processing of documents.Judge Hatter's Courtroom Deputy Clerk is Yolanda Skipper. She can be reached at (213) 894-5276. Counsel shall not attempt to contact the Court or its chambersstaff by telephone or by any other ex parte means, although counsel may contact the Courtroom Deputy, Yolanda Skipper, at: yolanda_skipper@cacd.uscourts.gov, with appropriate inquiries. Judge Hatters courtroom is located on the 9th Floor, at 350 W. 1st Street, United States Courthouse, Courtroom No. 9B.Additional information about Judge Hatters procedures and schedules can be found on the courts website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall immediately serve the complaint in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 on all parties, including this Order on any new parties to the action and file the proofs of service pursuant to Local Rule 5-3.1 with the Court. See order for details. (shb)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:18-cv-00787 TJH (SPx). Case transferred from Judge Andre Birotte Jr to Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:19-cv-00924 TJH (SPx). Signed by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr (esa)
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 EX PARTE APPLICATION to For Leave To Serve A Third Party Subpoena Prior To A Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support, #2 Exhibit A-E Declarations In Support, #3 Proposed Order) (Bandlow, Lincoln)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (ghap)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying General Media Systems, LLC as Corporate Parent. (Bandlow, Lincoln)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC, identifying General Media Systems, LLC (Corporate Parent) And John Doe (Defendant). (Bandlow, Lincoln)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23755731 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Lincoln D Bandlow added to party Strike 3 Holdings, LLC(pty:pla))(Bandlow, Lincoln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 76.174.162.43
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 76.174.162.43
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Lincoln D Bandlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?