Suzette McKenzie v. Walmart, Inc., et al

Plaintiff: Suzette McKenzie
Defendant: Walmart, Inc. and Does 1 to 10
Case Number: 5:2019cv00927
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 6-16-20. Counsel are directed to contact the private mediator of their choice to arrange a date and time for the mediation. Joint status report re settlement due by: 6-23-20. (lom)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE JURY TRIAL by Judge Dolly M. Gee. The Court deems a Scheduling Conference unnecessary and hereby vacates the hearing. Amended Pleadings due by 10/11/2019. Discovery cut-off 4/7/2020. Exhibit List due by 6/23/2020. Motions in Limine to be filed by 6/23/2020. Motions due by 4/17/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/23/2020. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 6/16/2020. Status Report due by 6/23/2020. Witness List due by 6/23/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/14/2020 02:00 PM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. Jury Trial set for 8/11/2020 08:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 SCHEDULE OF PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES JURY TRIAL) (lom) Modified on 7/11/2019 (lom).
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 8-10, filed by Plaintiff Suzette McKenzie.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Lyon, Geoffrey)
May 22, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Suzette McKenzie, identifying Walmart, Inc.. (Lyon, Geoffrey)
May 21, 2019 Filing 8 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, 26(f)] by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/28/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 7/12/2019 at 9:30 a.m. (See order for details.) (kti)
May 21, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Complaint - (Discovery) JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendant Walmart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Posting Jury Fees, #2 Proof of Service)(Hall, Kathleen)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Walmart, Inc., identifying Walmart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties)(Hall, Kathleen)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (esa)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 19-03, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Dolly M. Gee. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:19-cv-00927 DMG (SHKx). (esa)
May 17, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Walmart, Inc., Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Suzette McKenzie. (Filed in state court 4/17/19, submitted as document 1, p. 5) (esa)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino, case number CIVDS1911577 Receipt No: 0973-23757447 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Walmart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet) (Attorney Kathleen J Hall added to party Walmart, Inc.(pty:dft))(Hall, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Suzette McKenzie v. Walmart, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Kathleen J Hall
Represented By: Gregory L Spallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzette McKenzie
Represented By: Geoffrey C Lyon
Represented By: Alexis Reiko Sadakane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?