Kwadwo Hwenso Asare-Antwi v. Wells Fargo, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Kwadwo Hwenso Asare-Antwi
Defendant: Affinia Default Services, Wells Fargo, N.A., DOES 1 through 5 inclusive herein and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00928
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen E Scott
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion filed by Plaintiff Kwadwo Hwenso Asare-Antwi. Motion set for hearing on 8/12/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Proposed Order) (Freshman, Ronald)
July 11, 2019 Filing 26 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Remand Case to State Court, #22 filed by Plaintiff Kwadwo Hwenso Asare-Antwi. (Freshman, Ronald)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, counsel for KWADWO HWENSO ASARE-ANTWI may attend the hearings scheduled for July 15, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. by telephone on the condition that Counsel provide a direct dial number to the Clerk at JVS_chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov #24 (es)
July 10, 2019 Filing 24 REQUEST for Leave of Ronald H. Freshman to Appear for Scheduling Conference Telephonically filed by Plaintiff Kwadwo Hwenso Asare-Antwi. Request set for hearing on 7/15/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Freshman, Ronald)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, GRANTING #21 REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE. The Court, having reviewed and considered the request by counsel for defendant AFFINIA DEFAULT SERVICES, LLC ("Affinia") to appear via telephone at the Scheduling Conference [Dkt. 16], scheduled for July 15, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 10D of the above-captioned Court. The Court GRANTS the request. Counsel may appear by telephone at the July 15, 2019 Scheduling Conference by providing a direct dial phone number to the CRD at JVS_chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. (es)
July 9, 2019 Filing 22 [PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO REMAND filed as] NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion filed by Plaintiff Kwadwo Hwenso Asare-Antwi. Motion set for hearing on 8/5/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kwadwo Hwenso Asare-Antwi, #2 Declaration of Kimberly Cromwell, #3 Proposed Order) (Freshman, Ronald) Modified on 7/10/2019 (es).
July 9, 2019 Filing 21 REQUEST for Leave of Nabeel M. Zuberi to Appear for Scheduling Conference Telephonically filed by Defendant Affinia Default Services. Request set for hearing on 7/15/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Zuberi, Nabeel)
July 8, 2019 Filing 20 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 2 -7 days, filed by Plaintiff Kwadwo Hwenso Asare-Antwi.. (Freshman, Ronald)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION RE: SCHEDULING OF MOTION TO DISMISS, MOTION TO STRIKE, AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION #18 by Judge James V. Selna. 1. The initial scheduling conference (Dkt. 16) remains on calendar for July 15, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. 2. The hearings on Wells Fargos motion to dismiss the first amended complaint (Dkt. 13) and motion strike (Dkt. 15) are continued from July 15, 2019 to August 5, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. 3. Plaintiff shall file and serve a regularly noticed motion for a preliminary injunction, which shall be set for hearing on August 5, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. 4. Wells Fargo shall postpone the trustees sale of the property described in the first amended complaint to no earlier than August 19, 2019. (es)
June 17, 2019 Filing 18 Joint STIPULATION for Hearing re Re Scheduling of Motion to Dismiss, Motion to Strike and Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Curran, Leigh)
June 14, 2019 Filing 17 JOINDER filed by Defendant Affinia Default Services joining in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case First Amended Complaint #13 . (Zuberi, Nabeel)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 7/15/2019 at 1:30 pm before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 7/8/2019. (lb)
June 13, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Portions of First Amended Complaint filed by defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Motion set for hearing on 7/15/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Curran, Leigh)
June 13, 2019 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case First Amended Complaint #13 filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-K to RJN iso MTD FAC, #2 Exhibits L-N to RJN iso MTD FAC)(Curran, Leigh)
June 13, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case First Amended Complaint filed by defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Motion set for hearing on 7/15/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Curran, Leigh)
June 10, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE To District Court That State Court Has Received Notice of Removal filed by defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Curran, Leigh)
May 23, 2019 Filing 11 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:19-cv-00887 JVS(KESx). Case transferred from Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym to Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:19-cv-00928 JVS(KESx). Signed by Judge James V. Selna (rn)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
May 21, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., re Notice of Reassignment of Eastern Division Removal Case (CV-106) - optional html form, #5 , Joinder (non-motion) #4 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #6 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 OF REMOVAL-RELATED DOCUMENTS served on May 20, 2019. (Curran, Leigh)
May 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Related Case(s): 8:19-cv-00887-JVS-KES (Curran, Leigh)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 19-03, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:19-cv-00928 AB (SPx). (esa)
May 17, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Affinia Default Services, Does, Wells Fargo, N.A., filed by plaintiff Kwadwo Hwenso Asare-Antwi. (Filed in state court 4/18/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 JOINDER filed by Defendant Affinia Default Services joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . (Curran, Leigh)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Wells Fargo, N.A., identifying Wells Fargo & Co.. (Curran, Leigh)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Wells Fargo, N.A.. (Curran, Leigh)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside County Superior Court, case number RIC1902495 Receipt No: 0973-23761856 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant Wells Fargo, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibits D-G to Notice of Removal) (Attorney Leigh O Curran added to party Wells Fargo, N.A.(pty:dft))(Curran, Leigh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kwadwo Hwenso Asare-Antwi v. Wells Fargo, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kwadwo Hwenso Asare-Antwi
Represented By: Ronald H Freshman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Affinia Default Services
Represented By: Nabeel M Zuberi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo, N.A.
Represented By: Leigh O Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 5 inclusive herein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Leigh O Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?