Jose Luis Ledesma v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Jose Luis Ledesma
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 5:2019cv00946
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jose Luis Ledesma, upon Defendant Commissioner of Social Security served on 6/3/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to R. Oliver. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to front desk. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to E. Anderson. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 summons executed with proof of service)(Ortega, Omar)
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Attorney Timothy R Bolin added to party Commissioner of Social Security(pty:dft))(Bolin, Timothy)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL (JOINT SUBMISSION FORMAT) by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (see document for details) (hr)
May 29, 2019 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (hr)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson: granting #5 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (hr)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (esa)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Jose Luis Ledesma. (Ortega, Omar)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Jose Luis Ledesma, (Ortega, Omar)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Jose Luis Ledesma. (Ortega, Omar)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jose Luis Ledesma. (Ortega, Omar)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by plaintiff Jose Luis Ledesma. (Attorney Omar Ortega added to party Jose Luis Ledesma(pty:pla))(Ortega, Omar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jose Luis Ledesma v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Luis Ledesma
Represented By: Omar Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Timothy R Bolin
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?