Helen Estrada v. Amazon, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Helen Estrada
Defendant: Golden State FC, LLC, Amazon, Inc. and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2019cv00954
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Suzanne H Segal
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 Receipt of Order of Remand filed. (mrgo)
June 4, 2019 Filing 10 TRANSMITTAL of documents to San Bernardino County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to San Bernardino County Superior Court. (mrgo)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson remanding case to San Bernardino County Superior Court, Case number CIV DS 1911979. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (mrgo)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 19-03, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Percy Anderson. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:19-cv-00954 PA (SSx). (ghap)
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to filed by Defendants Golden State FC, LLC, Amazon, Inc..(Smith, Katherine)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing of Notice of Removal With the Superior Court filed by Defendants Amazon, Inc., Golden State FC, LLC. (Smith, Katherine)
May 22, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Helen Estrada, upon Defendant Amazon, Inc. served on 4/22/2019, answer due 5/13/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC Lawyers Registered Agent by leaving with Becky DeGeorge Person Authorized to Accept in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 5/1/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT G PAGE 43) (ghap)
May 22, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Helen Estrada, upon Defendant Golden State FC, LLC served on 4/22/2019, answer due 5/13/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC Lawyers Registered Agent by leaving with Becky DeGeorge Person Authorized to Accept in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 5/1/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED 5/1/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT F PAGE 39) (ghap)
May 22, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Amazon, Inc., Does 1 through 10, inclusive, Golden State FC, LLC. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Helen Estrada. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/18/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B PAGE 6) (ghap)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Amazon, Inc., Golden State FC, LLC (Smith, Katherine)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Amazon, Inc., Golden State FC, LLC, (Smith, Katherine)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Amazon, Inc., Golden State FC, LLC. (Smith, Katherine)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino Superior Court, case number CIV DS 1911979 Receipt No: 0973-23785216 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Golden State FC, LLC, Amazon, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Denicia "JP" Prather, #2 Declaration of Katherine V.A. Smith, #3 Exhibit A to Smith Declaration (Summons), #4 Exhibit B to Smith Declaration (Complaint), #5 Exhibit C to Smith Declaration (Civil Cover Sheet), #6 Exhibit D to Smith Declaration (Notice of Trial Setting Conference), #7 Exhibit E to Smith Declaration (Certificate of Assignment), #8 Exhibit F to Smith Declaration (Proof of Summons on Golden State), #9 Exhibit G to Smith Declaration (Proof of Summons on Amazon), #10 Proof of Service) (Attorney Katherine V A Smith added to party Amazon, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine V A Smith added to party Golden State FC, LLC(pty:dft))(Smith, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Helen Estrada v. Amazon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden State FC, LLC
Represented By: Katherine V A Smith
Represented By: Michele L Maryott
Represented By: Lauren M Blas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine V A Smith
Represented By: Michele L Maryott
Represented By: Lauren M Blas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Estrada
Represented By: Shoham J Solouki
Represented By: Grant Joseph Savoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?