Maria Del Rosario Elizarraraz v. Nancy A. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Maria Del Rosario Elizarraraz
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Nancy A. Berryhill and Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 5:2019cv00982
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen E Scott
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott for all further proceedings. Please use the case number EDCV19-982 KES on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attorney Timothy R Bolin added to party Nancy A. Berryhill(pty:dft))(Bolin, Timothy)
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Maria Del Rosario Elizarraraz, upon Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 6/12/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Leidner, Joel)
June 11, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by plaintiff Maria Del Rosario Elizarraraz. (Leidner, Joel)
June 5, 2019 Filing 10 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (dv)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER RE PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (dv)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL (JOINT SUBMISSION FORMAT) by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (dv)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott: granting #5 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (dv)
May 31, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (et)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Maria Del Rosario Elizarraraz. (Leidner, Joel)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Maria Del Rosario Elizarraraz. (Leidner, Joel)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Maria Del Rosario Elizarraraz, (Leidner, Joel)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Maria Del Rosario Elizarraraz. (Leidner, Joel)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by plaintiff Maria Del Rosario Elizarraraz. (Attorney Joel D Leidner added to party Maria Del Rosario Elizarraraz(pty:pla))(Leidner, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maria Del Rosario Elizarraraz v. Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Timothy R Bolin
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Del Rosario Elizarraraz
Represented By: Joel D Leidner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?