Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc. v. Jeremy Watkins
Plaintiff: Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.
Defendant: Jeremy Watkins
Case Number: 5:2019cv00985
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Referring Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Petitioner Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Hernandez, Natalie)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (DOC. NO. 10) by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: The Court, having considered the response by Petitioner, (Doc. No. 12), hereby finds good cause exists and DISCHARGES the Order to Show Cause, (Doc. No. 10). Upon service on Respondent of the Petition for an Order Compelling Arbitration, (Doc. No. 1, "Petition"), Petitioner is hereby ORDERED to set its Petition for hearing in accordance with Local Rule 6-1 governing duly noticed motions. (bm)
June 14, 2019 Filing 13 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Response to the Court's Order to Show Cause Regarding Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Petitioner Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc. re: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, #10 (Hernandez, Natalie)
June 14, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE filed by Petitioner Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.to Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, #10 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peter M. Dobelbower, #2 Declaration of Natalie Hernandez)(Hernandez, Natalie)
June 11, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Petitioner Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc., upon Respondent Jeremy Watkins served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Respondent Jeremy Watkins in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Hernandez, Natalie)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: JURISDICTION by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: Accordingly, given the Court's independent obligation to assess its subject matter jurisdiction, the Court ORDERS Petitioner to show cause in writing no later than June 14, 2019, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (see document for further details) (bm)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (vv)
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Respondent Jeremy Watkins. (et)
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (et)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Related Case(s) #3 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 filed by Petitioner Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.. (Hernandez, Natalie)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc. (Hernandez, Natalie)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Petitioner Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.. (Hernandez, Natalie)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.. (Hernandez, Natalie)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION For Order Compelling Arbitration and Stay of State Court Proceeding Purusant to Federal Arbitration Act [9 USC 1-4 and 28 USC 2283] Receipt No: 0973-23820760 - Fee: $400, filed by Petitioner Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Attorney Natalie Hernandez added to party Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.(pty:pla))(Hernandez, Natalie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc. v. Jeremy Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Natalie Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?