Annie Li v. Apple Medical Center and Urgent Care, Inc.
Plaintiff: Annie Li
Defendant: Apple Medical Center and Urgent Care, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv01020
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Scheduling Conference set for 8/26/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (iva)
July 2, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Apple Medical Center and Urgent Care, Inc., identifying None. (Kent, Jonathan)
July 2, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Apple Medical Center and Urgent Care, Inc..(Attorney Jonathan Kent added to party Apple Medical Center and Urgent Care, Inc.(pty:dft))(Kent, Jonathan)
June 21, 2019 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Annie Li, upon Defendant Apple Medical Center and Urgent Care, Inc. served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jessica Ornelas, Person in Charge in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Lapuyade, Jean-Claude)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Granting Non-Resident Attorney Kevin J. Stoops APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Annie Li, Plaintiff, designating Jean-Claude Lapuyade as local counsel #13 #15 . (twdb)
June 14, 2019 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kevin J. Stoops to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Annie Li (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 6/11/2019, Receipt No. 26I2R66O) filed by Plaintiff Annie Li. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Lapuyade, Jean-Claude)
June 11, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kevin J. Stoops to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Annie Li (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23897658) #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. (lt)
June 11, 2019 Filing 13 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kevin J. Stoops to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Annie Li (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23897658) filed by Plaintiff Annie Li. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Lapuyade, Jean-Claude)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Granting #9 Non-Resident Attorney Charles R. Ash IV APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Annie Li, Plaintiff, designating Jean-Claude Lapuyade as local counsel. (twdb)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
June 10, 2019 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendant Apple Medical Center and Urgent Care, Inc.. (twdb)
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Charles R. Ash, IV to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Annie Li (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23881381) filed by Plaintiff Annie Li. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Lapuyade, Jean-Claude)
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Annie Li. (Lapuyade, Jean-Claude)
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Annie Li, (Lapuyade, Jean-Claude)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh)
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Kevin Stoops. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (lh)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Annie Li. (Lapuyade, Jean-Claude)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23858764 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Annie Li. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Employment Contract, #2 Exhibit B - Consent to Join, #3 Exhibit C - Pay Stubs) (Attorney Jean-Claude Lapuyade added to party Annie Li(pty:pla))(Lapuyade, Jean-Claude)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Annie Li v. Apple Medical Center and Urgent Care, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Medical Center and Urgent Care, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Kent
Represented By: Michael A Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annie Li
Represented By: Jean-Claude Lapuyade
Represented By: Kevin J Stoops
Represented By: Charles R Ash, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?